This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 01/06/2023 at 07:34:46 (UTC).

HORIZON SUNSET APARTMENTS LLC -vs- GREEN, TRANICIA

Case Summary

On 11/10/2022 HORIZON SUNSET APARTMENTS LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against GREEN, TRANICIA. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************4207

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HORIZON SUNSET APARTMENTS LLC

Defendant

GREEN, TRANICIA

Gainesville, FL 32601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RUSE JR., CHARLES

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

Attorney At Law, 500 N.E. 8Th Avenue

Ocala, FL 34470

Defendant Attorney

MCNAMARA ESQ, STEVEN

1000 Ne 16Th Ave, Building 1

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION - NO MONEY CLAIM Receipt: 493260 Date: 11/10/2022; Amount: $185.00; Amount Due: $0.00

11/10/2022: COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION - NO MONEY CLAIM Receipt: 493260 Date: 11/10/2022; Amount: $185.00; Amount Due: $0.00

CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

11/10/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

SUMMONS ISSUED WITH FEE Receipt: 493260 Date: 11/10/2022; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

11/10/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED WITH FEE Receipt: 493260 Date: 11/10/2022; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

SHERIFF'S RETURN SUMMONS - SERVED 11/15/2022; TRANICIA GREEN (DEFENDANT);

11/18/2022: SHERIFF'S RETURN SUMMONS - SERVED 11/15/2022; TRANICIA GREEN (DEFENDANT);

EVICTION ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND MOTION TO DETERMINE RENT; STEVEN MCNAMARA ESQ (Attorney) on behalf of TRANICIA GREEN (DEFENDANT)

11/22/2022: EVICTION ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND MOTION TO DETERMINE RENT; STEVEN MCNAMARA ESQ (Attorney) on behalf of TRANICIA GREEN (DEFENDANT)

ORDER SETTING REMOTE HEARING - 12/15/2022 @ 4:00 PM; ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DETERMINE RENT

12/07/2022: ORDER SETTING REMOTE HEARING - 12/15/2022 @ 4:00 PM; ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DETERMINE RENT

EVIDENCE SUBMITTED FOR HEARING

12/12/2022: EVIDENCE SUBMITTED FOR HEARING

EVIDENCE SUBMITTED FOR HEARING

12/12/2022: EVIDENCE SUBMITTED FOR HEARING

EVIDENCE SUBMITTED FOR HEARING

12/12/2022: EVIDENCE SUBMITTED FOR HEARING

EVIDENCE SUBMITTED FOR HEARING

12/12/2022: EVIDENCE SUBMITTED FOR HEARING

EXHIBITS

12/15/2022: EXHIBITS

ORDER REQUIRING DEPOSIT OF RENT

12/22/2022: ORDER REQUIRING DEPOSIT OF RENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER REQUIRING DEPOSIT OF RENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBITS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEVIDENCE SUBMITTED FOR HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEVIDENCE SUBMITTED FOR HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEVIDENCE SUBMITTED FOR HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEVIDENCE SUBMITTED FOR HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SETTING REMOTE HEARING - 12/15/2022 @ 4:00 PM; ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DETERMINE RENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEVICTION ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND MOTION TO DETERMINE RENT; STEVEN MCNAMARA ESQ (Attorney) on behalf of TRANICIA GREEN (DEFENDANT)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN SUMMONS - SERVED 11/15/2022; TRANICIA GREEN (DEFENDANT);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $195.00; Total Fee Paid: $195.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • FinancialReceipt #: 493260; Paid: 493260; Applied: $195.00; Refunded: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED WITH FEE Receipt: 493260 Date: 11/10/2022; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR EVICTION - NO MONEY CLAIM Receipt: 493260 Date: 11/10/2022; Amount: $185.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HORIZON SUNSET APARTMENTS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCNAMARA ESQ, STEVEN