Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County on 02/06/2020 at 18:54:24 (UTC).

HARRIS, JUSTIN TYLER -VS- HARDER, KIMBERLY SUE

Case Summary

On 11/15/2017 HARRIS, JUSTIN TYLER filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against HARDER, KIMBERLY SUE. This case was filed in Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3803

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HARRIS, JUSTIN TYLER

Gainesville, FL 32609

Defendant

HARDER, KIMBERLY SUE

Gainesville, FL 32605

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

MILLER, JULIA G.

200 West Forsyth St Ste 1420

Jacksonville, FL 32202

 

Court Documents

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS/DISPOSITION MEMO

07/18/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS/DISPOSITION MEMO

ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AT STATUS CONFERENCE

07/17/2018: ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AT STATUS CONFERENCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF JUSTIN HARRIS

06/13/2018: REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF JUSTIN HARRIS

DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

06/13/2018: DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF JUSTIN HARRIS

06/13/2018: NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF JUSTIN HARRIS

ORDER GRANTING AMENDED MOTION TO WITHDRAW

05/10/2018: ORDER GRANTING AMENDED MOTION TO WITHDRAW

UNOPPOSED MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL

05/08/2018: UNOPPOSED MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL

MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY

04/27/2018: MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF VERIFIED ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

02/13/2018: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF VERIFIED ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

02/13/2018: RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF JUSTIN HARRIS

01/03/2018: REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF JUSTIN HARRIS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE PURSUANT TO RULE 4-7.10(G)(3) OF THE FLORIDA RULES OF PROFESSIONAL CONDUCT

01/03/2018: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE PURSUANT TO RULE 4-7.10(G)(3) OF THE FLORIDA RULES OF PROFESSIONAL CONDUCT

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE

01/03/2018: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE

MOTION TO APPOINT ELISOR

11/30/2017: MOTION TO APPOINT ELISOR

SUMMONS (20 DAY) ISSUED - AS TO: KIMBERLY SUE HARDER (DEFENDANT);; WITH FEE Receipt: 410412 Date: 11/16/2017; ; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

11/15/2017: SUMMONS (20 DAY) ISSUED - AS TO: KIMBERLY SUE HARDER (DEFENDANT);; WITH FEE Receipt: 410412 Date: 11/16/2017; ; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

11/15/2017: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516 OF THE FLORIDA RULES OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION

11/15/2017: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516 OF THE FLORIDA RULES OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION

PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT

11/15/2017: PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMAIL RETURNED ON 10/22/2018; JUSTIN TYLER HARRIS (PLAINTIFF);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS/DISPOSITION MEMO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • DispositionAUTO NEGLIGENCE; Status: CLOSED; Status Date: 11/15/2017; Disposition: DJ01 - JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AT STATUS CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF JUSTIN HARRIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF JUSTIN HARRIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING AMENDED MOTION TO WITHDRAW

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 11/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT ELISOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • FinancialReceipt # 410412; Paid: $410.00; Applied: $410.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $410.00; Total Fee Paid: $410.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS (20 DAY) ISSUED - AS TO: KIMBERLY SUE HARDER (DEFENDANT);; WITH FEE Receipt: 410412 Date: 11/16/2017; ; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516 OF THE FLORIDA RULES OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT Receipt: 410412 Date: 11/16/2017; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Miller, Julia Greene