Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County on 02/13/2020 at 19:51:00 (UTC).

GREGORY, NORA F et al -VS- SHELL, WAGNER L et al

Case Summary

On 12/20/2018 GREGORY, NORA F filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against SHELL, WAGNER L. This case was filed in Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************4238

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NORA F GREGORY, SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THE ALACHUA

GREGORY, NORA F

Defendants

PHASE III BUILDING SUPPLIES, INC

Wagner L Shell, 3116 Needels Drive

Orlando, FL 32810

UNKNOWN PERSON IN POSSESSION

Gainesville, FL 32641

SHELL, ROSALIND F

Gainesville, FL 32641

SHELL, WAGNER L

Gainesville, FL 32641

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCGRATH ESQ, PETER R

801 North Magnolia Ave Ste 317

Orlando, FL 32803

Defendant Attorney

BRASHEAR ESQ, BRUCE

925 Nw 56 Terr Ste C

Gainesville, FL 32605

 

Court Documents

ORDER (FREE TEXT)

02/13/2020: ORDER (FREE TEXT)

DEFENDANT PAHASE III BULDING SUPPLIES, INC.- MOTION TO REQUIRE MEDIATION

02/10/2020: DEFENDANT PAHASE III BULDING SUPPLIES, INC.- MOTION TO REQUIRE MEDIATION

AFFIDAVIT OF WAGNER LIN SHELL

02/05/2020: AFFIDAVIT OF WAGNER LIN SHELL

PROMISSORY NOTE - PAPER-INK VERSION; NOTICE OF FILING ; 1. ORIGINAL MORTGAGE ; 2. ORIGINAL NOTE

01/06/2020: PROMISSORY NOTE - PAPER-INK VERSION; NOTICE OF FILING ; 1. ORIGINAL MORTGAGE ; 2. ORIGINAL NOTE

MOTION FOR FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE

01/03/2020: MOTION FOR FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE

ANSWER OF PHASE III BUILDING SUPPLIES, INC.

11/25/2019: ANSWER OF PHASE III BUILDING SUPPLIES, INC.

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

11/25/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY DEFENDANT; UNKNOWN PERSON IN POSSESSION (DEFENDANT);

11/15/2019: NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY DEFENDANT; UNKNOWN PERSON IN POSSESSION (DEFENDANT);

AMENDED RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE OF MORTGAGE

11/05/2019: AMENDED RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE OF MORTGAGE

PLAINTIFF'S CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

11/04/2019: PLAINTIFF'S CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CLERK'S DEFAULT - ENTERED; ROSALIND F SHELL (DEFENDANT);

10/29/2019: CLERK'S DEFAULT - ENTERED; ROSALIND F SHELL (DEFENDANT);

PROOF OF PUBLICATION - NOTICE OF ACTION

10/29/2019: PROOF OF PUBLICATION - NOTICE OF ACTION

RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE OF MORTGAGE; WAGNER L SHELL (DEFENDANT);

07/24/2019: RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE OF MORTGAGE; WAGNER L SHELL (DEFENDANT);

ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

05/20/2019: ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

HEARING DISPOSITION FORM

04/22/2019: HEARING DISPOSITION FORM

ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE, ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND HEARING ON PENDING MOTIONS

03/01/2019: ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE, ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND HEARING ON PENDING MOTIONS

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

02/06/2019: NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE OF MORTGAGE (>$50,000.01 < $250.000.) Receipt: 430496 Date: 12/20/2018; Amount: $905.00; Amount Due: $0.00

12/20/2018: COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE OF MORTGAGE (>$50,000.01 < $250.000.) Receipt: 430496 Date: 12/20/2018; Amount: $905.00; Amount Due: $0.00

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER DENYING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, GRANTING MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE AND GRANTING MOTION TO REQUIRE MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT PAHASE III BULDING SUPPLIES, INC.- MOTION TO REQUIRE MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF WAGNER LIN SHELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING-02/11/2020 @11:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; -AFFIDAVIT AS TO REASONABLENESS OF ATTORNEY FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE FOR TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; -AFFIDAVIT AS TO REASONABLENESS OF ATTORNEY FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING - 2/11/2020 @ 11:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROMISSORY NOTE - PAPER-INK VERSION; NOTICE OF FILING ; 1. ORIGINAL MORTGAGE ; 2. ORIGINAL NOTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING NOTE AND MORTGAGE-EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 12/20/2018
  • DocketINDEX FEE FOR LIS PENDENS OVER 4 PARTIES Receipt: 430496 Date: 12/20/2018; Amount: $2.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • DocketRECORDING FEE - FIRST PAGE OF LIS PENDENS Receipt: 430496 Date: 12/20/2018; Amount: $5.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • DocketELECTRONIC SALE FEE- NO IMAGE Receipt: 430496 Date: 12/20/2018; Amount: $70.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS UNISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 430496 Date: 12/20/2018; CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE NO NAME ON SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 430496 Date: 12/20/2018; PHASE III BUILDING SUPPLIES, INC (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 430496 Date: 12/20/2018; ROSALIND F SHELL (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 430496 Date: 12/20/2018; ; WAGNER L SHELL (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE OF MORTGAGE (>$50,000.01 < $250.000.) Receipt: 430496 Date: 12/20/2018; Amount: $905.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCGRATH ESQ, PETER R