This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 10/14/2022 at 07:16:22 (UTC).

GORDON, JENNIFER -VS- STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 08/23/2022 GORDON, JENNIFER filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2568

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GORDON, JENNIFER

Defendant

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Via Fl Chief Financial Officer As R A, 200 E Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BARROW ESQ, JACOB B

104 North Main Street, Suite 500

Gainesville, FL 32601

Defendant Attorney

BOWEN-HENTGES, JESSICA

2868 Remington Green Circle S-A

Tallahassee, FL 32308

 

Court Documents

NOTICE

10/12/2022: NOTICE

DEFENDANT'S STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUETS TO PRODUCE

10/10/2022: DEFENDANT'S STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUETS TO PRODUCE

DEFENDANT'S STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

10/10/2022: DEFENDANT'S STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

09/27/2022: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

REQUEST FOR COPIES

09/26/2022: REQUEST FOR COPIES

DEFENDANT'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF

09/16/2022: DEFENDANT'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

09/16/2022: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

09/16/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

E-MAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516; JESSICA BOWEN-HENTGES (Attorney) on behalf of STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (DEFENDANT)

08/31/2022: E-MAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516; JESSICA BOWEN-HENTGES (Attorney) on behalf of STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (DEFENDANT)

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

08/26/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT

08/19/2022: PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAILADDRESS

08/19/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAILADDRESS

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

08/19/2022: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

08/19/2022: PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED TO; STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY; Receipt: 489687 Date: 08/23/2022; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

08/19/2022: 20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED TO; STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY; Receipt: 489687 Date: 08/23/2022; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER PER A.O. 3.09

08/19/2022: STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER PER A.O. 3.09

CIVIL COVER SHEET - JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

08/19/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET - JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUETS TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-MAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516; JESSICA BOWEN-HENTGES (Attorney) on behalf of STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (DEFENDANT)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $410.00; Total Fee Paid: $410.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • FinancialReceipt #: 489687; Paid: 489687; Applied: $410.00; Refunded: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAILADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED TO; STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY; Receipt: 489687 Date: 08/23/2022; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER PER A.O. 3.09

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR AUTO NEGLIGENCE Receipt: 489687 Date: 08/23/2022; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JESSICA M BOWEN-HENTGES