Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County on 03/25/2021 at 16:15:05 (UTC).

GOMEZ, ALEX et al -VS- TOWER HILL PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/25/2021 GOMEZ, ALEX filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against TOWER HILL PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0534

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GOMEZ, JENNIFER

GOMEZ, ALEX

Defendant

TOWER HILL PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY

C/O Florida Chief Financial Officser As Ra, 200 East Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PAYNE ESQ, CALEB E

2600 E Robinson St

Orlando, FL 32803

Defendant Attorney

KOVECSES JR, JOSEPH A

485 N Keller Road 401

Maitland, FL 32751

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD AND DIRECTIONS TO CLERK TO UPDATE ATTORNEY INFORMATION

03/23/2021: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD AND DIRECTIONS TO CLERK TO UPDATE ATTORNEY INFORMATION

AGREED ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

03/22/2021: AGREED ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

SHERIFF'S RETURN SUMMONS - SERVED 03/04/2021; TOWER HILL PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY (DEFENDANT);

03/18/2021: SHERIFF'S RETURN SUMMONS - SERVED 03/04/2021; TOWER HILL PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY (DEFENDANT);

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

03/10/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

COPY OF ISSUED SUMMONS TO TOWER HILL PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY

03/02/2021: COPY OF ISSUED SUMMONS TO TOWER HILL PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

03/02/2021: NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

SUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 466688 Date: 02/26/2021; TOWER HILL PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

02/25/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 466688 Date: 02/26/2021; TOWER HILL PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT

02/25/2021: PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT

PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

02/25/2021: PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

02/25/2021: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

COMPLAINT Receipt: 466688 Date: 02/26/2021; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $0.00

02/25/2021: COMPLAINT Receipt: 466688 Date: 02/26/2021; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $0.00

CIVIL COVER SHEET - JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

02/25/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET - JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD AND DIRECTIONS TO CLERK TO UPDATE ATTORNEY INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAGREED ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN SUMMONS - SERVED 03/04/2021; TOWER HILL PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY (DEFENDANT);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOPY OF ISSUED SUMMONS TO TOWER HILL PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • FinancialReceipt # 466688; Paid: $410.00; Applied: $410.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $410.00; Total Fee Paid: $410.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 466688 Date: 02/26/2021; TOWER HILL PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT Receipt: 466688 Date: 02/26/2021; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Tower Hill Preferred Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JOSEPH KOVECSES