This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 02/09/2020 at 02:24:04 (UTC).

GAINESVILLE HOUSING AUTHORITY -vs- WALKER, ADRIAN M

Case Summary

On 04/11/2018 GAINESVILLE HOUSING AUTHORITY filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against WALKER, ADRIAN M. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1175

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GAINESVILLE HOUSING AUTHORITY

Defendant

WALKER, ADRIAN M

Gainesville, FL 32641

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STRINGER ESQ, RHONDA E

C/O Gainesville Housing Authority, 201 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 600

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

SHERIFF'S RETURN ON WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED EXECUTED

11/27/2018: SHERIFF'S RETURN ON WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED EXECUTED

ORDER DENYING MOTION TO STAY WRIT OF POSSESSION

11/19/2018: ORDER DENYING MOTION TO STAY WRIT OF POSSESSION

EMERGENCY MOTION FOR STAY OR SET ASIDE JUDGMENT; ADRIAN M WALKER (DEFENDANT);; (EMAILED TO COUNTY EMERGENCY GROUP, JUDGE, AND JA 11/19/2018 -SNB) (EMAILED TO COUNTY \u2013 11/19/2018- CAC)

11/19/2018: EMERGENCY MOTION FOR STAY OR SET ASIDE JUDGMENT; ADRIAN M WALKER (DEFENDANT);; (EMAILED TO COUNTY EMERGENCY GROUP, JUDGE, AND JA 11/19/2018 -SNB) (EMAILED TO COUNTY \u2013 11/19/2018- CAC)

EMERGENCY MOTION FOR STAY OR SET ASIDE JUDGMENT; ADRIAN M WALKER (DEFENDANT);; (EMAILED TO COUNTY EMERGENCY GROUP, JUDGE, & JA 11/19/2018 -SNB) (EMAILED TO COUNTY \u2013 11/19/2018- CAC)

11/19/2018: EMERGENCY MOTION FOR STAY OR SET ASIDE JUDGMENT; ADRIAN M WALKER (DEFENDANT);; (EMAILED TO COUNTY EMERGENCY GROUP, JUDGE, & JA 11/19/2018 -SNB) (EMAILED TO COUNTY \u2013 11/19/2018- CAC)

COPY OF EMAIL BETWEEN ADRIAN M WALKER & JUDICIAL ASSISTANT

11/14/2018: COPY OF EMAIL BETWEEN ADRIAN M WALKER & JUDICIAL ASSISTANT

COPY OF EMAIL BETWEEN ADRIAN M WALKER & JUDICIAL ASSISTANT

11/14/2018: COPY OF EMAIL BETWEEN ADRIAN M WALKER & JUDICIAL ASSISTANT

WRIT OF POSSESSION - ISSUED 11/8/2018 / CMW

11/08/2018: WRIT OF POSSESSION - ISSUED 11/8/2018 / CMW

FINAL JUDGMENT FOR COUNT I POSSESSION (CLOSES)

11/08/2018: FINAL JUDGMENT FOR COUNT I POSSESSION (CLOSES)

EVIDENCE CONTROL FORM - EXHIBITS HOUSED IN VAULT

11/07/2018: EVIDENCE CONTROL FORM - EXHIBITS HOUSED IN VAULT

JUDGES NOTES FILED

11/01/2018: JUDGES NOTES FILED

ORDER SCHEDULING FINAL HEARING- TUESDAY, OCTOBER 30, 2018 @ 10:00 A.M.

09/26/2018: ORDER SCHEDULING FINAL HEARING- TUESDAY, OCTOBER 30, 2018 @ 10:00 A.M.

SHERIFF'S RETURN ON WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED UNEXECUTED

08/07/2018: SHERIFF'S RETURN ON WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED UNEXECUTED

FAX CONFIRMATION OF ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO STAY FAXED OVER TO ASO RECORDS

08/06/2018: FAX CONFIRMATION OF ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO STAY FAXED OVER TO ASO RECORDS

ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO STAY WITH DIRECTIONS TO SHERIFF

08/06/2018: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO STAY WITH DIRECTIONS TO SHERIFF

EMERGENCY MOTION TO STAY; (EMAILED TO COUNTY-EMER.MOTIONS; JUDGE & J.A 8/6/2018/CMW)

08/06/2018: EMERGENCY MOTION TO STAY; (EMAILED TO COUNTY-EMER.MOTIONS; JUDGE & J.A 8/6/2018/CMW)

COPY OF EMAIL BETWEEN DEFENDANT AND JUDICIAL ASSISTANT

08/06/2018: COPY OF EMAIL BETWEEN DEFENDANT AND JUDICIAL ASSISTANT

COPY OF EMAIL BETWEEN DEFENDANT AND JUDICIAL ASSISTANT

08/06/2018: COPY OF EMAIL BETWEEN DEFENDANT AND JUDICIAL ASSISTANT

WRIT OF POSSESSION - ISSUED 7/30/2018

07/30/2018: WRIT OF POSSESSION - ISSUED 7/30/2018

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN ON WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED EXECUTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • DispositionEVICTION WITH MONEY DAMAGES OF $2,500.00 OR LESS; Status: 99 CLOSED; Status Date: 11/19/2018; Disposition: 99CLOSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • Docket99 CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER DENYING MOTION TO STAY WRIT OF POSSESSION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMERGENCY MOTION FOR STAY OR SET ASIDE JUDGMENT; ADRIAN M WALKER (DEFENDANT);; (EMAILED TO COUNTY EMERGENCY GROUP, JUDGE, AND JA 11/19/2018 -SNB) (EMAILED TO COUNTY \u2013 11/19/2018- CAC)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMERGENCY MOTION FOR STAY OR SET ASIDE JUDGMENT; ADRIAN M WALKER (DEFENDANT);; (EMAILED TO COUNTY EMERGENCY GROUP, JUDGE, & JA 11/19/2018 -SNB) (EMAILED TO COUNTY \u2013 11/19/2018- CAC)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • DocketCase Reopened this date

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOPY OF EMAIL BETWEEN ADRIAN M WALKER & JUDICIAL ASSISTANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOPY OF EMAIL BETWEEN ADRIAN M WALKER & JUDICIAL ASSISTANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • DispositionEVICTION WITH MONEY DAMAGES OF $2,500.00 OR LESS; Status: 99 CLOSED; Status Date: 08/06/2018; Disposition: 99CLOSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 05/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING - 7/24/2018 @ 10:00 AM; ROOM 200; FINAL HEARING FOR POSSESSION COUNT I AND DAMAGES COUNT II

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND NOTICE OF NO RENT DUE; ADRIAN M WALKER (DEFENDANT);; (PLAINTIFF HAS ATTORNEY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN ON 5/20 SUMMONS - POSTED 4/17/2018; ADRIAN M WALKER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; (SUMMONS & COMPLAINT)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER LETTER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $195.00; Total Fee Paid: $195.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • FinancialReceipt # 417402; Paid: $195.00; Applied: $195.00; Refunded: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket5/20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED WITH FEE Receipt: 417402 Date: 04/11/2018; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR EVICTION AND BACK RENT - UP TO $2,500.00 Receipt: 417402 Date: 04/11/2018; Amount: $185.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GAINESVILLE HOUSING AUTHORITY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STRINGER , RHONDA ELIZABETH