This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 02/10/2020 at 14:08:14 (UTC).

GAINESVILLE HOUSING AUTHORITY -vs- BROWN, FELICIA M

Case Summary

On 06/15/2018 GAINESVILLE HOUSING AUTHORITY filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against BROWN, FELICIA M. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2089

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GAINESVILLE HOUSING AUTHORITY

Defendant

BROWN, FELICIA M

Gainesville, FL 32641

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DECOPAIN ESQ, SUZANNE J

201 E Kennedy Blvd, Ste 600

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION AND BACK RENT - UP TO $2,500.00 Receipt: 420940 Date: 06/15/2018; Amount: $185.00; Amount Due: $0.00

06/15/2018: COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION AND BACK RENT - UP TO $2,500.00 Receipt: 420940 Date: 06/15/2018; Amount: $185.00; Amount Due: $0.00

CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

06/15/2018: CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

5/20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED WITH FEE Receipt: 420940 Date: 06/15/2018; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

06/15/2018: 5/20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED WITH FEE Receipt: 420940 Date: 06/15/2018; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING AS TO FELICIA M. BROWN

06/21/2018: CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING AS TO FELICIA M. BROWN

SHERIFF'S RETURN ON 5/20 SUMMONS- SERVED 6/22/2018

06/22/2018: SHERIFF'S RETURN ON 5/20 SUMMONS- SERVED 6/22/2018

MOTION FOR/TO MORE TIME MOTION GRANTING MORE TIME; (EMAILED J.A. 6/28/2018/CMW); FELICIA M BROWN (DEFENDANT);

06/28/2018: MOTION FOR/TO MORE TIME MOTION GRANTING MORE TIME; (EMAILED J.A. 6/28/2018/CMW); FELICIA M BROWN (DEFENDANT);

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION

07/10/2018: MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION

FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION (CLOSES)

07/18/2018: FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION (CLOSES)

JOINT STIPULATION BETWEEN PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT AND STIPULATION TO RELEASE FUNDS IN COURT REGISTRY TO PLAINTIFF (CLOSES)

07/27/2018: JOINT STIPULATION BETWEEN PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT AND STIPULATION TO RELEASE FUNDS IN COURT REGISTRY TO PLAINTIFF (CLOSES)

ORDER APPROVING AND ENTERING JOINT STIPULATION AND RELEASE OF FUNDS

08/03/2018: ORDER APPROVING AND ENTERING JOINT STIPULATION AND RELEASE OF FUNDS

CHECK REQUEST PROCESSED BY CLERK; PAYEE NAME: GAINESVILLE HOUSING AUTHORITY; AMOUNT: $400.00

08/07/2018: CHECK REQUEST PROCESSED BY CLERK; PAYEE NAME: GAINESVILLE HOUSING AUTHORITY; AMOUNT: $400.00

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/14/2018
  • DocketPayments from Registry; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCHECK REQUEST PROCESSED BY CLERK; PAYEE NAME: GAINESVILLE HOUSING AUTHORITY; AMOUNT: $400.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • DocketUNSIGNED PROPOSED DOCUMENT; ; CHECK REQUEST - REGISTRY OF COURT; Sent on: 08/07/2018 10:11:02.17

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPROVING AND ENTERING JOINT STIPULATION AND RELEASE OF FUNDS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJOINT STIPULATION BETWEEN PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT AND STIPULATION TO RELEASE FUNDS IN COURT REGISTRY TO PLAINTIFF (CLOSES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • DispositionEVICTION WITH MONEY DAMAGES OF $2,500.00 OR LESS; Status: CLOSED; Status Date: 06/15/2018; Disposition: DJ01 - JUDGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION (CLOSES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • FinancialReceipt # 422204; Paid: $420.00; Applied: $412.00; Refunded: $8.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/10/2018
  • DocketREGISTRY OF COURT SERVICE FEE; FELICIA M BROWN (DEFENDANT); Receipt: 422204 Date: 07/10/2018; Amount: $12.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • DocketREGISTRY OF COURT DEPOSIT; FELICIA M BROWN (DEFENDANT); Receipt: 422204 Date: 07/10/2018; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR/TO MORE TIME MOTION GRANTING MORE TIME; (EMAILED J.A. 6/28/2018/CMW); FELICIA M BROWN (DEFENDANT);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN ON 5/20 SUMMONS- SERVED 6/22/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING AS TO FELICIA M. BROWN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $607.00; Total Fee Paid: $607.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • FinancialReceipt # 420940; Paid: $195.00; Applied: $195.00; Refunded: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket5/20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED WITH FEE Receipt: 420940 Date: 06/15/2018; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR EVICTION AND BACK RENT - UP TO $2,500.00 Receipt: 420940 Date: 06/15/2018; Amount: $185.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GAINESVILLE HOUSING AUTHORITY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SUZANNE J DECOPAIN, ESQ