Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County on 02/02/2020 at 13:36:01 (UTC).

FRIEDMAN, ROBERTA -VS- SHANDS TEACHING HOSPITAL AND CLINICS

Case Summary

On 03/06/2017 FRIEDMAN, ROBERTA filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against SHANDS TEACHING HOSPITAL AND CLINICS. This case was filed in Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0776

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FRIEDMAN, ROBERTA

Defendant

SHANDS TEACHING HOSPITAL AND CLINICS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BACHARACH JR ESQ, N. ALBERT

4128 Nw 13Th Street

Gainesville, FL 32609

Defendant Attorney

D'ALESIO ESQ, DANIEL J

Po Box 112735

Gainesville, FL 32611

 

Court Documents

EXHIBITS

11/30/2017: EXHIBITS

EVIDENCE WORKSHEET - EXHIBITS HOUSED IN VAULT

11/30/2017: EVIDENCE WORKSHEET - EXHIBITS HOUSED IN VAULT

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS/DISPOSITION MEMO

11/06/2017: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS/DISPOSITION MEMO

NOTICE OF HEARING -

11/03/2017: NOTICE OF HEARING -

ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE

10/04/2017: ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE

SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT SHANDS TEACHING HOSPITAL AND CLINICS INCS MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF PROCESS AND TO DISMISS PROCEEDINGS

09/19/2017: SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT SHANDS TEACHING HOSPITAL AND CLINICS INCS MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF PROCESS AND TO DISMISS PROCEEDINGS

SHERIFF'S RETURN ON 20-DAY SUMMONS - SERVED

09/06/2017: SHERIFF'S RETURN ON 20-DAY SUMMONS - SERVED

NOTICE OF APPEAL TRANSMITTAL FORM

08/08/2017: NOTICE OF APPEAL TRANSMITTAL FORM

NOTICE OF APPEAL

08/07/2017: NOTICE OF APPEAL

ORDER DENYING AMENDED MOTION

07/31/2017: ORDER DENYING AMENDED MOTION

PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED OUT OF TIME EX PARTE MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE COMPLAINT UPON DEFENDANT SHANDS TEACHING HOSPITAL AND CLINICS

07/27/2017: PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED OUT OF TIME EX PARTE MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE COMPLAINT UPON DEFENDANT SHANDS TEACHING HOSPITAL AND CLINICS

PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE MOTION TO APPOINT SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER TO SERVICE PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT UPON DEFENDANT SHANDS TEACHING HOSPITAL AND CLINICS

07/26/2017: PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE MOTION TO APPOINT SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER TO SERVICE PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT UPON DEFENDANT SHANDS TEACHING HOSPITAL AND CLINICS

SUMMONS UNISSUED - (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE AS IS NOT A NAMED PARTY TO THE CASE) SCS; WITH FEE Receipt: 404895 Date: 07/18/2017; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

07/18/2017: SUMMONS UNISSUED - (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE AS IS NOT A NAMED PARTY TO THE CASE) SCS; WITH FEE Receipt: 404895 Date: 07/18/2017; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

SUMMONS (40 DAY) ISSUED - AS TO: FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF FINANCIALSERVICES; WITH FEE Receipt: 404895 Date: 07/18/2017; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

07/18/2017: SUMMONS (40 DAY) ISSUED - AS TO: FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF FINANCIALSERVICES; WITH FEE Receipt: 404895 Date: 07/18/2017; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

SUMMONS (30 DAY) ISSUED - AS TO: DEPARTMENT OF INSURANCE; WITH FEE Receipt: 404895 Date: 07/18/2017; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

07/18/2017: SUMMONS (30 DAY) ISSUED - AS TO: DEPARTMENT OF INSURANCE; WITH FEE Receipt: 404895 Date: 07/18/2017; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

PLAINTIFFS OUT OF TIME EX PARTE MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE COMPLAINT UPON DEFENDANT SHANDS TEACHING HOSPITAL AND CLINICS

07/07/2017: PLAINTIFFS OUT OF TIME EX PARTE MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE COMPLAINT UPON DEFENDANT SHANDS TEACHING HOSPITAL AND CLINICS

CIVIL COVER SHEET - JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

03/06/2017: CIVIL COVER SHEET - JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

COMPLAINT FOR PROFESSIONAL MALPRACTICE Receipt: 398347 Date: 03/06/2017; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $0.00

03/06/2017: COMPLAINT FOR PROFESSIONAL MALPRACTICE Receipt: 398347 Date: 03/06/2017; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $0.00

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2018
  • DocketCASE/PARTY FORWARDED TO COLLECTION AGENCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • FinancialReceipt # 412917; Paid: $38.50; Applied: $38.50; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURTESY LETTER ADVISING OF CASE BEING SENT TO COLLECTIONS - FRIEDMAN, ROBERTA (PLAINTIFF)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • DispositionPROF. MALPRACTICE - MEDICAL; Status: CLOSED; Status Date: 03/06/2017; Disposition: OT01 - OTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF PROCESS AND TO DISMISS PROCEEDINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHEARING DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBITS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEVIDENCE WORKSHEET - EXHIBITS HOUSED IN VAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS/DISPOSITION MEMO

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 07/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS (30 DAY) ISSUED- AS TO: UNIVERSITY OF FLORIDA BOARD OF TRUSTEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • FinancialReceipt # 404895; Paid: $30.00; Applied: $30.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS UNISSUED - (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE AS IS NOT A NAMED PARTY TO THE CASE) SCS; WITH FEE Receipt: 404895 Date: 07/18/2017; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS (40 DAY) ISSUED - AS TO: FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF FINANCIALSERVICES; WITH FEE Receipt: 404895 Date: 07/18/2017; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS (30 DAY) ISSUED - AS TO: DEPARTMENT OF INSURANCE; WITH FEE Receipt: 404895 Date: 07/18/2017; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS OUT OF TIME EX PARTE MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE COMPLAINT UPON DEFENDANT SHANDS TEACHING HOSPITAL AND CLINICS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $568.50; Total Fee Paid: $568.50; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • FinancialReceipt # 398347; Paid: $400.00; Applied: $400.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR PROFESSIONAL MALPRACTICE Receipt: 398347 Date: 03/06/2017; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Shands Teaching Hospital & Clinics Inc is a litigant