Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 02/09/2020 at 20:20:55 (UTC).

FREDERICK BUILDERS LLC A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY -VS- HARDEN, MATTHEW

Case Summary

On 05/15/2018 FREDERICK BUILDERS LLC A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HARDEN, MATTHEW. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RAWLS, MESHON T. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1655

  • Filing Date:

    05/15/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RAWLS, MESHON T

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FREDERICK BUILDERS LLC A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY

Defendant

HARDEN, MATTHEW

Starke, FL 32091

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

IVEY ESQ., RAYMOND M

2234 Nw 40Th Terrace Ste B

Gainesville, FL 32606

 

Court Documents

FINAL JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT, MATTHEW HARDEN (SC) (CLOSES)

12/18/2018: FINAL JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT, MATTHEW HARDEN (SC) (CLOSES)

AFFIDAVIT OF NONCOMPLIANCE

12/07/2018: AFFIDAVIT OF NONCOMPLIANCE

RESULTS OF MEDIATION- SETTLEMENT (CLOSES)

10/15/2018: RESULTS OF MEDIATION- SETTLEMENT (CLOSES)

PRETRIAL RESULTS - ALL PARTIES PRESENT - MEDIATOR ASSIGNED

10/12/2018: PRETRIAL RESULTS - ALL PARTIES PRESENT - MEDIATOR ASSIGNED

CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT - CLAIMED

08/10/2018: CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT - CLAIMED

PRETRIAL SET FOR - (ISSUED) ALIAS SUMMONS

08/01/2018: PRETRIAL SET FOR - (ISSUED) ALIAS SUMMONS

COVER LETTER; (PER PLAINTIFF SUMMONS ISSUED ON 05/30/2018 WAS NOT SUBMITTED FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS)

08/01/2018: COVER LETTER; (PER PLAINTIFF SUMMONS ISSUED ON 05/30/2018 WAS NOT SUBMITTED FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS)

(UNISSUED)SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL -WITH FEE (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE: CORRECT SUMMONS / NOTICE TO APPEAR CAN BE FOUND ON THE CLERK'S WEBSITE UNDER THE SMALL CLAIMS FORM SECTION; SUBMIT SUMMONS AS A ; CORRECTED SUMMONS AS THE FEE HAS ALREADY BEEN PAID; ALSO THE RETURN OF SERVICE HAS NOT BEEN RECEIVED ON THE SUMMONS ISSUED 5/30/18 - MJP 7/30/18) Receipt: 423404 Date: 07/30/2018; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

07/30/2018: (UNISSUED)SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL -WITH FEE (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE: CORRECT SUMMONS / NOTICE TO APPEAR CAN BE FOUND ON THE CLERK'S WEBSITE UNDER THE SMALL CLAIMS FORM SECTION; SUBMIT SUMMONS AS A ; CORRECTED SUMMONS AS THE FEE HAS ALREADY BEEN PAID; ALSO THE RETURN OF SERVICE HAS NOT BEEN RECEIVED ON THE SUMMONS ISSUED 5/30/18 - MJP 7/30/18) Receipt: 423404 Date: 07/30/2018; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SERVE OR DISMISS AND ORDER SETTING CASE FOR CONTINUED PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

07/27/2018: ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SERVE OR DISMISS AND ORDER SETTING CASE FOR CONTINUED PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

PRETRIAL RESULTS -PLAINTIFF PRESENT/DEFENDANT(S) NO SHOW / CONT FOR SERVICE ON LOS DOCKET - 10/12/2018 @ 9:30 A.M.

07/27/2018: PRETRIAL RESULTS -PLAINTIFF PRESENT/DEFENDANT(S) NO SHOW / CONT FOR SERVICE ON LOS DOCKET - 10/12/2018 @ 9:30 A.M.

(ISSUED)SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL - NO FEE

05/30/2018: (ISSUED)SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL - NO FEE

(UNISSUED)SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL - NO FEE (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE: DEF'S NAME IN THE BODY OF THE SUMMONS DOES NOT MATCH THE DEF'S NAME IN THE COMPLIANT - MJP 05/18/2018)

05/17/2018: (UNISSUED)SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL - NO FEE (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE: DEF'S NAME IN THE BODY OF THE SUMMONS DOES NOT MATCH THE DEF'S NAME IN THE COMPLIANT - MJP 05/18/2018)

SUMMONS (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE AS SUMMONS PROVIDED IS NOT A SMALL CLAIMS / NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL; GO TO CLERK'S WEBSITE; CLICK ON "FORMS"; THEN CLICK ON "SMALL CLAIMS INFORMATION & FORMS"; THEN CLICK ON "SMALL CLAIMS SUMMONS / NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL"; WHEN RESUBMITTING ON PORTAL CHOOSE "CORRECTED SUMMONS" AS FEE HAS ALREADY BEEN PAID -CMW 5/16/2018); Receipt: 419226 Date: 05/15/2018; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

05/15/2018: SUMMONS (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE AS SUMMONS PROVIDED IS NOT A SMALL CLAIMS / NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL; GO TO CLERK'S WEBSITE; CLICK ON "FORMS"; THEN CLICK ON "SMALL CLAIMS INFORMATION & FORMS"; THEN CLICK ON "SMALL CLAIMS SUMMONS / NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL"; WHEN RESUBMITTING ON PORTAL CHOOSE "CORRECTED SUMMONS" AS FEE HAS ALREADY BEEN PAID -CMW 5/16/2018); Receipt: 419226 Date: 05/15/2018; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC MAIL

05/15/2018: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC MAIL

STATEMENT OF CLAIM ($500.01 - $2500.00) ; Receipt: 419226 Date: 05/15/2018; Amount: $175.00; Amount Due: $0.00

05/15/2018: STATEMENT OF CLAIM ($500.01 - $2500.00) ; Receipt: 419226 Date: 05/15/2018; Amount: $175.00; Amount Due: $0.00

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2018
  • DispositionCONTRACT AND INDEBTEDNESS $500.01 TO $2500.00; Status: 99 CLOSED; Status Date: 12/07/2018; Disposition: 99CLOSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • Docket99 CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT, MATTHEW HARDEN (SC) (CLOSES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NONCOMPLIANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • DocketCase Reopened this date

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • DispositionCONTRACT AND INDEBTEDNESS $500.01 TO $2500.00; Status: CLOSED; Status Date: 05/15/2018; Disposition: BH01- BEFORE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESULTS OF MEDIATION- SETTLEMENT (CLOSES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • HearingLACK OF SERVICE / RESERVICE; Judge: RAWLS, MESHON T

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • HearingPRETRIAL/LACK OF SERVICE; Judge: RAWLS, MESHON T; Result: RESCHEDULED

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 07/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SERVE OR DISMISS AND ORDER SETTING CASE FOR CONTINUED PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL RESULTS -PLAINTIFF PRESENT/DEFENDANT(S) NO SHOW / CONT FOR SERVICE ON LOS DOCKET - 10/12/2018 @ 9:30 A.M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET - (NO IMAGE AVAILABLE); Event: SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIALS - NO IMAGE ; Date: 07/27/2018 Time: 9:00 am ; Judge: FERRERO - DIV IV, DENISE R Location: COURTROOM 2-B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(ISSUED)SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL - NO FEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(UNISSUED)SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL - NO FEE (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE: DEF'S NAME IN THE BODY OF THE SUMMONS DOES NOT MATCH THE DEF'S NAME IN THE COMPLIANT - MJP 05/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $201.67; Total Fee Paid: $201.67; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • FinancialReceipt # 419226; Paid: $185.00; Applied: $185.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE AS SUMMONS PROVIDED IS NOT A SMALL CLAIMS / NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL; GO TO CLERK'S WEBSITE; CLICK ON "FORMS"; THEN CLICK ON "SMALL CLAIMS INFORMATION & FORMS"; THEN CLICK ON "SMALL CLAIMS SUMMONS / NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL"; WHEN RESUBMITTING ON PORTAL CHOOSE "CORRECTED SUMMONS" AS FEE HAS ALREADY BEEN PAID -CMW 5/16/2018); Receipt: 419226 Date: 05/15/2018; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM ($500.01 - $2500.00) ; Receipt: 419226 Date: 05/15/2018; Amount: $175.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less