Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 02/05/2020 at 15:04:43 (UTC).

FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC -vs- EVANS, REGINALD L

Case Summary

On 08/30/2017 FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against EVANS, REGINALD L. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2776

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC

Defendant

EVANS, REGINALD L

Reddick, FL 32686

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SOLOMON ESQ, MARVIN

Po Box 3275

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

SHERIFF'S RETURN ON CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT- SERVED 5/9/2018; (SKEETER'S TRUCKING, LLC; GARNISHEE #1)

05/15/2018: SHERIFF'S RETURN ON CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT- SERVED 5/9/2018; (SKEETER'S TRUCKING, LLC; GARNISHEE #1)

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF NOTICE TO DEFENDANT OF RIGHT AGAINST GARNISHMENT OF WAGES, MONEY, AND OTHER PROPERTY PURSUANT TO 77.041(2), FLORIDA STATUTES (SKEETER'S TRUCKING, LLC; GARNISHEE #1)

04/24/2018: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF NOTICE TO DEFENDANT OF RIGHT AGAINST GARNISHMENT OF WAGES, MONEY, AND OTHER PROPERTY PURSUANT TO 77.041(2), FLORIDA STATUTES (SKEETER'S TRUCKING, LLC; GARNISHEE #1)

CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AGAINST SALARY OR WAGES OF DEFENDANT REGINALD L EVANS PURSUANT TO \u00a777.0305, FLROIDA STATUTES (2015) WITH ATTACHED NOTICE TO DEF. & CLAIM OF EXEMPTION (SKEETER'S TRUCKING, LLC; GARNISHEE #1)

04/16/2018: CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AGAINST SALARY OR WAGES OF DEFENDANT REGINALD L EVANS PURSUANT TO \u00a777.0305, FLROIDA STATUTES (2015) WITH ATTACHED NOTICE TO DEF. & CLAIM OF EXEMPTION (SKEETER'S TRUCKING, LLC; GARNISHEE #1)

COVER LETTER

04/02/2018: COVER LETTER

MOTION FOR CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AGAINST SALARY OR WAGES AGAINST DEFENDANT REGINALD L EVANS PURSUANT TO \u00a777.0305, FLORIDA STATUTES (2015) (REOPEN) (SKEETER'S TRUCKING, LLC; GARNISHEE #1); Receipt: 416842 Date: 03/30/2018; Amount: $85.00; Amount Due: $0.00

03/30/2018: MOTION FOR CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AGAINST SALARY OR WAGES AGAINST DEFENDANT REGINALD L EVANS PURSUANT TO \u00a777.0305, FLORIDA STATUTES (2015) (REOPEN) (SKEETER'S TRUCKING, LLC; GARNISHEE #1); Receipt: 416842 Date: 03/30/2018; Amount: $85.00; Amount Due: $0.00

FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT (CLOSES)

01/05/2018: FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT (CLOSES)

MOTION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT

12/12/2017: MOTION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT

AFFIDAVIT IN PROOF OF CLAIM

12/08/2017: AFFIDAVIT IN PROOF OF CLAIM

AFFIDAVIT RE ATTORNEY'S FEES

12/04/2017: AFFIDAVIT RE ATTORNEY'S FEES

MOTION FOR DEFAULT & DEFAULT ENTERED 11/15/2017/CMW ; AS TO: REGINALD L EVANS

11/14/2017: MOTION FOR DEFAULT & DEFAULT ENTERED 11/15/2017/CMW ; AS TO: REGINALD L EVANS

AFFIDAVIT OF COUNSEL OF RECORD

11/14/2017: AFFIDAVIT OF COUNSEL OF RECORD

AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS AND INTEREST

11/14/2017: AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS AND INTEREST

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

11/14/2017: NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

SHERIFF'S RETURN ON 20 DAY SUMMONS - SERVED 10/10/2017; (NO SUMMONS ATTACHED)

10/17/2017: SHERIFF'S RETURN ON 20 DAY SUMMONS - SERVED 10/10/2017; (NO SUMMONS ATTACHED)

20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED; REGINALD L EVANS (DEFENDANT);

09/25/2017: 20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED; REGINALD L EVANS (DEFENDANT);

(UNISSUED) SUMMONS WITH FEE; (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE AS THE FRENCH AND SPANISH PAGE NOT ATTACHED TO THE INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS) Receipt: 407024 Date: 08/31/2017; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

08/30/2017: (UNISSUED) SUMMONS WITH FEE; (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE AS THE FRENCH AND SPANISH PAGE NOT ATTACHED TO THE INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS) Receipt: 407024 Date: 08/31/2017; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

08/30/2017: CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

COMPLAINT FOR CONTRACT & INDEBTEDNESS Receipt: 407024 Date: 08/31/2017; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

08/30/2017: COMPLAINT FOR CONTRACT & INDEBTEDNESS Receipt: 407024 Date: 08/31/2017; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF WRIT OF GARNISHMENT (99 CLOSE); (SKEETER'S TRUCKING, LLC; GARNISHEE #1)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN ON CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT- SERVED 5/9/2018; (SKEETER'S TRUCKING, LLC; GARNISHEE #1)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF NOTICE TO DEFENDANT OF RIGHT AGAINST GARNISHMENT OF WAGES, MONEY, AND OTHER PROPERTY PURSUANT TO 77.041(2), FLORIDA STATUTES (SKEETER'S TRUCKING, LLC; GARNISHEE #1)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • DispositionCONTRACT AND INDEBTEDNESS $5,000.01 TO $15,000.00; Status: 99 CLOSED; Status Date: 03/30/2018; Disposition: 99CLOSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • Docket99 CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AGAINST SALARY OR WAGES OF DEFENDANT REGINALD L EVANS PURSUANT TO \u00a777.0305, FLROIDA STATUTES (2015) WITH ATTACHED NOTICE TO DEF. & CLAIM OF EXEMPTION (SKEETER'S TRUCKING, LLC; GARNISHEE #1)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER LETTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2018
  • FinancialReceipt # 416842; Paid: $85.00; Applied: $85.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AGAINST SALARY OR WAGES AGAINST DEFENDANT REGINALD L EVANS PURSUANT TO \u00a777.0305, FLORIDA STATUTES (2015) (REOPEN) (SKEETER'S TRUCKING, LLC; GARNISHEE #1); Receipt: 416842 Date: 03/30/2018; Amount: $85.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2018
  • DocketCase Reopened this date

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 11/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF COUNSEL OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS AND INTEREST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN ON 20 DAY SUMMONS - SERVED 10/10/2017; (NO SUMMONS ATTACHED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED; REGINALD L EVANS (DEFENDANT);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • FinancialReceipt # 407024; Paid: $310.00; Applied: $310.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $395.00; Total Fee Paid: $395.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(UNISSUED) SUMMONS WITH FEE; (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE AS THE FRENCH AND SPANISH PAGE NOT ATTACHED TO THE INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS) Receipt: 407024 Date: 08/31/2017; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR CONTRACT & INDEBTEDNESS Receipt: 407024 Date: 08/31/2017; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARVIN SOLOMON