This case was last updated from Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County on 02/02/2020 at 15:37:17 (UTC).

FLOYD, MELINDA -VS- SIDNEY KRISER TRUST et al

Case Summary

On 03/13/2017 FLOYD, MELINDA filed an Other lawsuit against SIDNEY KRISER TRUST. This case was filed in Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0910

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FLOYD, MELINDA

Defendants

SIDNEY KRISER TRUST

C/O Deborah E Berdy Ra, 13420 Progress Blvd Suite 200

Alachua, FL 32615

LAKEWOOD VILLAS APARTMENTS

C/O Deborah E Berdy Ra, 13420 Progress Blvd Suite 200

Alachua, FL 32615

CONTEMPORARY MANAGEMENT CONCEPTS LLLP

C/O Deborah E Berdy Ra, 13420 Progress Blvd Suite 200

Alachua, FL 32615

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HUMPHRIES ESQ, JEFFREY J

76 South Laura Street Suite 1100

Jacksonville, FL 32202

VAZQUEZ ESQ, A DANIEL

76 S Laura St Ste 1100

Jacksonville, FL 32202

 

Court Documents

MEDIATION DISPOSITION REPORT - FULL SETTLEMENT

03/12/2018: MEDIATION DISPOSITION REPORT - FULL SETTLEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS/DISPOSITION MEMO

01/18/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS/DISPOSITION MEMO

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

01/16/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

AMENDED NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESSES

01/12/2018: AMENDED NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESSES

ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING SUBMISSION OF CASE MANAGMENT STATEMENT ; JANUARY 17, 2018 AT 10:00AM

12/11/2017: ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING SUBMISSION OF CASE MANAGMENT STATEMENT ; JANUARY 17, 2018 AT 10:00AM

AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES; A DANIEL VAZQUEZ ESQ (Attorney) on behalf of MELINDA FLOYD (PLAINTIFF)

12/07/2017: AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES; A DANIEL VAZQUEZ ESQ (Attorney) on behalf of MELINDA FLOYD (PLAINTIFF)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DEISGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

12/06/2017: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DEISGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT SIDNEY KRISER TRUSTS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

08/14/2017: PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT SIDNEY KRISER TRUSTS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY

07/31/2017: DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY

DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF

07/24/2017: DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF

DEFENDANT CONTEMPORARY MANAGEMENT CONCEPTS, LLLP'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

05/16/2017: DEFENDANT CONTEMPORARY MANAGEMENT CONCEPTS, LLLP'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

DEFENDANT SIDNEY KRISER TRUST'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

05/16/2017: DEFENDANT SIDNEY KRISER TRUST'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT SIDNEY KRISER TRUST'S ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFFS' INTERROGATORIES

05/16/2017: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT SIDNEY KRISER TRUST'S ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFFS' INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT CONTEMPORARY MANAGEMENT CONCEPTS, LLLP'S ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFFS' INTERROGATORIES

05/16/2017: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT CONTEMPORARY MANAGEMENT CONCEPTS, LLLP'S ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFFS' INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

05/09/2017: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

SHERIFF'S RETURN SERVED 3/30/17

03/31/2017: SHERIFF'S RETURN SERVED 3/30/17

PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT CONTEMPORARY MANAGEMENT CONCEPTS LLLP

03/17/2017: PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT CONTEMPORARY MANAGEMENT CONCEPTS LLLP

PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES DEFENDANT CONTEMPORARY MANAGEMENT CONCEPTS LLLP

03/17/2017: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES DEFENDANT CONTEMPORARY MANAGEMENT CONCEPTS LLLP

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (CLOSES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DispositionNEG. - PREMISES LIABILITY RESIDENTIAL; Status: CLOSED; Status Date: 03/13/2017; Disposition: DJ01 - JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL (CLOSES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEDIATION DISPOSITION REPORT - FULL SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANTS' UPDATE REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS/DISPOSITION MEMO

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 03/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES DEFENDANT SIDNEY KRISER TRUST DBA LAKEWOOD VILLAS APARTMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT CONTEMPORARY MANAGEMENT CONCEPTS LLLP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT CONTEMPORARY MANAGEMENT CONCEPTS LLLP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES DEFENDANT CONTEMPORARY MANAGEMENT CONCEPTS LLLP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • FinancialReceipt # 398806; Paid: $420.00; Applied: $420.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $420.00; Total Fee Paid: $420.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS (20 DAY) ISSUED - AS TO: CONTEMPORARY MANAGEMENT CONCEPTS LLLP (DEFENDANT);; WITH FEE Receipt: 398806 Date: 03/14/2017; ; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS (20 DAY) ISSUED - AS TO: SIDNEY KRISER TRUST D/B/A LAKEWOOD VILLAS APARTMENTS (DEFENDANT);; WITH FEE Receipt: 398806 Date: 03/14/2017; ; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR NEGLIGENCE Receipt: 398806 Date: 03/14/2017; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CONTEMPORARY MANAGEMENT CONCEPTS LLLP FOR AFFINITY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer A DANIEL VAZQUEZ

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Humphries, Jeffrey James