This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 02/02/2020 at 19:36:54 (UTC).

FLORIDA HOMES 6 LLC et al -vs- EDWARDS, BERTHA

Case Summary

On 03/23/2017 FLORIDA HOMES 6 LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against EDWARDS, BERTHA. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0997

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ONE FLORIDA REALTY-GRANADA

FLORIDA HOMES 6 LLC

Defendant

EDWARDS, BERTHA

Gainesville, FL 32609

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KELLEY ESQ, JERRON

399 Nw 2 Ave, Ste 222

Boca Raton, FL 33432

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION; Receipt: 399328 Date: 03/23/2017; Amount: $185.00; Amount Due: $0.00

03/23/2017: COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION; Receipt: 399328 Date: 03/23/2017; Amount: $185.00; Amount Due: $0.00

CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

03/23/2017: CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

5/20 SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO: BERTHA EDWARDS; Receipt: 399328 Date: 03/23/2017; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

03/23/2017: 5/20 SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO: BERTHA EDWARDS; Receipt: 399328 Date: 03/23/2017; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

COVER LETTER

03/28/2017: COVER LETTER

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; (SUMMONS & COMPLAINT);

03/28/2017: CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; (SUMMONS & COMPLAINT);

SHERIFF'S RETURN ON 5/20 SUMMONS - POSTED 3/27/2017; BERTHA EDWARDS

03/30/2017: SHERIFF'S RETURN ON 5/20 SUMMONS - POSTED 3/27/2017; BERTHA EDWARDS

AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY STATUS

04/06/2017: AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY STATUS

MOTION FOR DEFAULT & CLERK'S DEFAULT (CLERK UNABLE TO ENTER AS RETURN OF SERVICE FROM SHERIFF HAS NOT BEEN; RECEIVED SHOWING DEFENDANT WAS SERVED OR SUMMONS WAS POSTED; PLAINTIFF MAY HAVE PROPER PAPERWORK SUBMITTED AND REFILE FOR DEFAULT AT LATER DAT

04/06/2017: MOTION FOR DEFAULT & CLERK'S DEFAULT (CLERK UNABLE TO ENTER AS RETURN OF SERVICE FROM SHERIFF HAS NOT BEEN; RECEIVED SHOWING DEFENDANT WAS SERVED OR SUMMONS WAS POSTED; PLAINTIFF MAY HAVE PROPER PAPERWORK SUBMITTED AND REFILE FOR DEFAULT AT LATER DATE OR MOTION COURT FOR DEFAULT - CMW 4/6/2017)

(UNSIGNED) SHERIFF'S RETURN ON 5/20 SUMMONS - POSTED 3/29/2017; BERTHA EDWARDS

04/07/2017: (UNSIGNED) SHERIFF'S RETURN ON 5/20 SUMMONS - POSTED 3/29/2017; BERTHA EDWARDS

(DUPLICATE) SHERIFF'S RETURN ON 5/20 SUMMONS - POSTED 3/29/2017 (NO SUMMONS ATTACHED); BERTHA EDWARDS

04/07/2017: (DUPLICATE) SHERIFF'S RETURN ON 5/20 SUMMONS - POSTED 3/29/2017 (NO SUMMONS ATTACHED); BERTHA EDWARDS

AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY STATUS

04/10/2017: AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY STATUS

MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND CLERK'S DEFAULT (COUNT I ONLY) ENTERED 4/10/2017/CMW AS TO: BERTHA EDWARDS

04/10/2017: MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND CLERK'S DEFAULT (COUNT I ONLY) ENTERED 4/10/2017/CMW AS TO: BERTHA EDWARDS

FINAL JUDGMENT AS TO COUNT I ONLY FOR POSSESSION (CLOSES)

04/13/2017: FINAL JUDGMENT AS TO COUNT I ONLY FOR POSSESSION (CLOSES)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2017
  • DispositionEVICTION DELINQUENT TENANT; Status: CLOSED; Status Date: 03/23/2017; Disposition: DE03 - DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT AS TO COUNT I ONLY FOR POSSESSION (CLOSES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT AND CLERK'S DEFAULT (COUNT I ONLY) ENTERED 4/10/2017/CMW AS TO: BERTHA EDWARDS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY STATUS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(DUPLICATE) SHERIFF'S RETURN ON 5/20 SUMMONS - POSTED 3/29/2017 (NO SUMMONS ATTACHED); BERTHA EDWARDS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(UNSIGNED) SHERIFF'S RETURN ON 5/20 SUMMONS - POSTED 3/29/2017; BERTHA EDWARDS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT & CLERK'S DEFAULT (CLERK UNABLE TO ENTER AS RETURN OF SERVICE FROM SHERIFF HAS NOT BEEN; RECEIVED SHOWING DEFENDANT WAS SERVED OR SUMMONS WAS POSTED; PLAINTIFF MAY HAVE PROPER PAPERWORK SUBMITTED AND REFILE FOR DEFAULT AT LATER DATE OR MOTION COURT FOR DEFAULT - CMW 4/6/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY STATUS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN ON 5/20 SUMMONS - POSTED 3/27/2017; BERTHA EDWARDS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; (SUMMONS & COMPLAINT);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER LETTER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $195.00; Total Fee Paid: $195.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • FinancialReceipt # 399328; Paid: $195.00; Applied: $195.00; Refunded: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket5/20 SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO: BERTHA EDWARDS; Receipt: 399328 Date: 03/23/2017; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION; Receipt: 399328 Date: 03/23/2017; Amount: $185.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FLORIDA HOMES 6 LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JERRON KELLEY