Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 02/04/2020 at 21:46:57 (UTC).

FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE THE OBO et al -VS- WEEKS, NICHOLOS EMANUEL

Case Summary

On 05/30/2017 FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE THE OBO filed a Family - Child Support lawsuit against WEEKS, NICHOLOS EMANUEL. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is STAFFORD, SAMUEL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1903

  • Filing Date:

    05/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Child Support

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

STAFFORD, SAMUEL

 

Party Details

Petitioners

RUISE, KHALEEDAH MAJIED

White Springs, FL 32096

FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE THE OBO

5719 Nw 13Th Street

Gainesville, FL 32653

Respondent

WEEKS, NICHOLOS EMANUEL

Wildwood, FL 34785

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SCHNEIDER, PAMELA A.

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

Attorney At Law, 208 Se 1St St

Gainesville, FL 32601

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2019
  • Disposition(DOR IV-D) SUPPORT; Status: 99 CLOSED; Status Date: 11/30/2018; Disposition: 99CLOSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • Docket99 CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • DocketORDER GRANTING CONTEMPT MOTION AND ORDER ADJUDICATING ARREARS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketCHILD SUPPORT PAYMENT NOTICE/ MEMO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • HearingCHILD SUPPORT ENFORCEMENT (DOR); Judge: STAFFORD, SAMUEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • DocketALACHUA COUNTY FAMILY LAW CASE HISTORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • DocketMOTION FOR CONTEMPT(REOPEN)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • DocketE-MAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • DocketFAMILY COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING - NO IMAGE; Event: CHILD SUPPORT ENFORCEMENT (DOR) ; Date: 01/14/2019 Time: 12:30 pm ; Judge: STAFFORD, SAMUEL Location: COURTROOM 2-C

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 06/15/2017
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN ON 20-DAY SUMMONS - SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $410.00; Total Fee Paid: $0.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $410.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • DocketDEMOGRAPHIC INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AS TO NICHOLOS EMANUEL WEEKS; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • DocketPETITION FOR SUPPORT AND OTHER RELIEF; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • DocketFAMILY COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • DocketE-MAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • DocketFAMILY COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHNEIDER, PAMELA A