Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 02/08/2020 at 22:48:45 (UTC).

FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE THE OBO et al -VS- MURRAY, LUCAS SAMEDWARD

Case Summary

On 03/27/2018 FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE THE OBO filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against MURRAY, LUCAS SAMEDWARD. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is STAFFORD, SAMUEL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1003

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

STAFFORD, SAMUEL

 

Party Details

Petitioners

FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE THE OBO

5719 Nw 13Th Street

Gainesville, FL 32653

WILLIAMS, SHAMON VANDRELL

Gainesville, FL 32609

Respondent

MURRAY, LUCAS SAMEDWARD

Gainesville, FL 32608

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SCHNEIDER, PAMELA A.

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

Attorney At Law, 208 Se 1St St

Gainesville, FL 32601

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2019
  • Disposition(DOR-IV-D) PATERNITY; Status: 99 CLOSED; Status Date: 09/23/2019; Disposition: 99CLOSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • Docket99 CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketORDER ON MOTION TO ENFORCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • HearingCHILD SUPPORT ENFORCEMENT (DOR); Judge: STAFFORD, SAMUEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketALACHUA COUNTY FAMILY LAW CASE HISTORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING - NO IMAGE; Event: CHILD SUPPORT ENFORCEMENT (DOR) ; Date: 10/07/2019 Time: 12:30 pm ; Judge: STAFFORD, SAMUEL Location: COURTROOM 2-C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketE-MAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketFAMILY COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENFORCEMENT(REOPEN)

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 03/27/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AS TO LUCAS SAMEDWARD MURRAY; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • DocketPATERNITY DECLARATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • DocketPETITION TO DETERMINE PATERNITY FOR SUPPORT AND OTHER RELIEF; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • DocketFAMILY COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • DocketDEMOGRAPHIC INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • DocketFAMILY COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF PATERNITY ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • DocketE-MAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHNEIDER, PAMELA A