Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 02/11/2020 at 13:44:59 (UTC).

FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE THE OBO et al -VS- CLINTON, MICHAEL LEE

Case Summary

On 08/07/2018 FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE THE OBO filed a Family - Child Support lawsuit against CLINTON, MICHAEL LEE. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is STAFFORD, SAMUEL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2583

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Child Support

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

STAFFORD, SAMUEL

 

Party Details

Petitioners

RAYE, LATANYA DENISE

Gainesville, FL 32641

FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE THE OBO

5719 Nw 13Th Street

Gainesville, FL 32653

Respondent

CLINTON, MICHAEL LEE

Ocala, FL 34470

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SCHNEIDER ESQ, PAMELA A

208 Se 1 St

Gainesville, FL 32601

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketCHILD SUPPORT GUIDELINE CALCULATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • Disposition(DOR IV-D) SUPPORT; Status: CLOSED; Status Date: 08/07/2018; Disposition: NJ01 - NON-JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • DocketINCOME WITHHOLDING FOR SUPPORT ORDER AND FLORIDA ADDENDUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • DocketORDER FOR CHILD SUPPORT (CLOSES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • HearingCHILD SUPPORT ENFORCEMENT (DOR); Judge: STAFFORD, SAMUEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING - NO IMAGE; Event: CHILD SUPPORT ENFORCEMENT (DOR) ; Date: 01/14/2019 Time: 12:30 pm ; Judge: STAFFORD, SAMUEL Location: COURTROOM 2-C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • DocketANSWER FILED BY MICHAEL LEE CLINTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN ON 20-DAY SUMMONS - SERVED AS TO MICHAEL LEE CLINTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • DocketDEMOGRAPHIC INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS 20 DAYS ISSUED; MICHAEL LEE CLINTON (RESPONDENT);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • DocketPETITION FOR SUPPORT AND OTHER RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • DocketFAMILY COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • DocketFAMILY COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • DocketE-MAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHNEIDER, PAMELA A