Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 02/05/2020 at 15:22:34 (UTC).

FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE OBO et al -VS- OLIVER, MAURICE ANTONIO

Case Summary

On 09/01/2017 FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE OBO filed a Family - Child Support lawsuit against OLIVER, MAURICE ANTONIO. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is STAFFORD, SAMUEL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3015

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Child Support

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

STAFFORD, SAMUEL

 

Party Details

Petitioners

FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE OBO

HOLLRIEGEL, TAMMIE LEE

Williston, FL 32696

Respondent

OLIVER, MAURICE ANTONIO

Cedar Key, FL 32625

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SCHNEIDER ESQUIRE, PAMELA A

3 Se 1 Avenue

Gainesville, FL 32601

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT ENFORCING ADMINISTRATIVE SUPPORT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketSTATE DEPARTMENT CHANGED ADDRESS REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • HearingCHILD SUPPORT ENFORCEMENT (DOR); Judge: STAFFORD, SAMUEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketALACHUA COUNTY FAMILY LAW CASE HISTORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING - NO IMAGE; Event: CHILD SUPPORT ENFORCEMENT (DOR) ; Date: 01/13/2020 Time: 12:30 pm ; Judge: STAFFORD, SAMUEL Location: COURTROOM 2-C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN ON 20-DAY SUMMONS - SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketE-MAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketFAMILY COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS 20 DAYS ISSUED; MAURICE ANTONIO OLIVER (RESPONDENT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 10/23/2017
  • DocketDEMOGRAPHIC INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • DocketCLERK OF COURT ACTION REQUEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • DispositionADMINISTRATIVE SUPPORT ORDER - F.S.; Status: CLOSED; Status Date: 09/01/2017; Disposition: OT01 - OTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $10.00; Total Fee Paid: $0.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $10.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF PROCEEDING TO ESTABLISH ADMINISTRATIVE SUPPORT ORDER PER F.S. 409.2563

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • DocketDEMOGRAPHIC INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • DocketDEMOGRAPHIC INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • DocketCLERK OF COURT ACTION REQUEST

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHNEIDER, PAMELA A