Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 02/13/2020 at 12:12:21 (UTC).

FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE OBO et al -VS- BETHEA, DIONDRA DSHAWN

Case Summary

On 11/21/2018 FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE OBO filed a Family - Child Support lawsuit against BETHEA, DIONDRA DSHAWN. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is STAFFORD, SAMUEL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3895

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Child Support

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

STAFFORD, SAMUEL

 

Party Details

Petitioners

DURR, RAHEEN JAMELL

High Springs, FL 32643

FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE OBO

Pam Schneider, 2041 Se 1St Street

Gainesville, FL 32601

Respondent

BETHEA, DIONDRA DSHAWN

High Springs, FL 32643

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketNOTICE TO CLERK OF COURT OF REQUIREMENT FOR COLLECTION OF ARREARS UPON EMANCIPATION OF MINOR CHILD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • Disposition(DOR IV-D) SUPPORT; Status: CLOSED; Status Date: 11/21/2018; Disposition: NJ01 - NON-JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • DocketORDER FOR CHILD SUPPORT (CLOSES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • DocketINCOME WITHHOLDING ORDER FOR SUPPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • DocketCHILD SUPPORT GUIDELINE CALCULATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • HearingCHILD SUPPORT ENFORCEMENT (DOR); Judge: STAFFORD, SAMUEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING - NO IMAGE; Event: CHILD SUPPORT ENFORCEMENT (DOR) ; Date: 02/04/2019 Time: 8:30 am ; Judge: STAFFORD, SAMUEL Location: COURTROOM 2-C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN ON 20-DAY SUMMONS - SERVED AS TO DIONDRA DSHAWN BETHEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $410.00; Total Fee Paid: $0.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $410.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AS TO DIONDRA DSHAEN BETHEA; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • DocketFAMILY COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • DocketE-MAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • DocketFAMILY COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • DocketPETITION FOR SUPPORT AND OTHER RELIEF; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • DocketDEMOGRAPHIC INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVE is a litigant