Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 02/12/2020 at 15:45:29 (UTC).

FLORIDA CREDIT UNION -VS- CRIDER, RACHEL P

Case Summary

On 10/12/2018 FLORIDA CREDIT UNION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CRIDER, RACHEL P. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RAWLS, MESHON T. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3777

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RAWLS, MESHON T

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FLORIDA CREDIT UNION

Defendant

CRIDER, RACHEL P

Keystone Heights, FL 32656

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL (CLOSES)

01/08/2019: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL (CLOSES)

SHERIFF'S RETURN (SC) - SERVED 10/24/2018

11/01/2018: SHERIFF'S RETURN (SC) - SERVED 10/24/2018

(ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL -WITH FEE Receipt: 427230 Date: 10/15/2018; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

10/11/2018: (ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL -WITH FEE Receipt: 427230 Date: 10/15/2018; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

CORPORATE AUTHORIZATION - SCR 7.050 (A) (2) - AUTHORIZING VICKI MARTELLO, JOEY THOMAS, CHAITANYA NITAI STALKER, MONICIA WHITE, AND WESLEY COLSON

10/11/2018: CORPORATE AUTHORIZATION - SCR 7.050 (A) (2) - AUTHORIZING VICKI MARTELLO, JOEY THOMAS, CHAITANYA NITAI STALKER, MONICIA WHITE, AND WESLEY COLSON

PERMISSION TO USE EMAIL

10/11/2018: PERMISSION TO USE EMAIL

STATEMENT OF CLAIM ($100.01 - $500.00) Receipt: 427230 Date: 10/15/2018; Amount: $80.00; Amount Due: $0.00

10/11/2018: STATEMENT OF CLAIM ($100.01 - $500.00) Receipt: 427230 Date: 10/15/2018; Amount: $80.00; Amount Due: $0.00

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2019
  • HearingSMALL CLAIMS PRETRIALS - NO IMAGE; Judge: RAWLS, MESHON T; Result: DISMISSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • DispositionCONTRACT AND INDEBTEDNESS $100.01 TO $500.00; Status: CLOSED; Status Date: 10/12/2018; Disposition: BH01- BEFORE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISMISSAL (CLOSES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN (SC) - SERVED 10/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • FinancialReceipt # 427230; Paid: $90.00; Applied: $90.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET - (NO IMAGE AVAILABLE); Event: SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIALS - NO IMAGE ; Date: 01/11/2019 Time: 10:00 am ; Judge: FERRERO - DIV IV, DENISE R Location: COURTROOM 2-B; ; Result: DISMISSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $90.00; Total Fee Paid: $90.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL -WITH FEE Receipt: 427230 Date: 10/15/2018; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORPORATE AUTHORIZATION - SCR 7.050 (A) (2) - AUTHORIZING VICKI MARTELLO, JOEY THOMAS, CHAITANYA NITAI STALKER, MONICIA WHITE, AND WESLEY COLSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPERMISSION TO USE EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM ($100.01 - $500.00) Receipt: 427230 Date: 10/15/2018; Amount: $80.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FLORIDA CREDIT UNION is a litigant