Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County on 03/25/2021 at 16:17:59 (UTC).

FLEETWOOD, TYRUS A -VS- ROBERTS, STEPHEN J et al

Case Summary

On 02/25/2021 FLEETWOOD, TYRUS A filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ROBERTS, STEPHEN J. This case was filed in Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0525

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FLEETWOOD, TYRUS A

Gainesville, FL 32601

Defendants

SECURITY DEVELOPMENT GROUP LLC

C/O Milam Howard Nicandri Gillam & Renner Pa Ra, 14 East Bay Street

Jacksonville, FL 32202

S3 SECURITY

Jacksonville, FL 32202

ROBERTS, STEPHEN J

Gainesville, FL 32608

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BIGGART II ESQ, JAMES G

104 N Main Street Ste 500

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY NAME AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC MAIL

03/24/2021: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY NAME AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC MAIL

SHERIFF'S RETURN SUMMONS - SERVED 03/18/2021; STEPHEN J ROBERTS (DEFENDANT);

03/22/2021: SHERIFF'S RETURN SUMMONS - SERVED 03/18/2021; STEPHEN J ROBERTS (DEFENDANT);

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF CORPORATE PROCESS SERVED ON 3/15/21; SECURITY DEVELOPMENT GROUP LLC (DEFENDANT);

03/17/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF CORPORATE PROCESS SERVED ON 3/15/21; SECURITY DEVELOPMENT GROUP LLC (DEFENDANT);

20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE; STEPHEN J ROBERTS (DEFENDANT); Receipt: 466641 Date: 02/25/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

02/25/2021: 20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE; STEPHEN J ROBERTS (DEFENDANT); Receipt: 466641 Date: 02/25/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE; SECURITY DEVELOPMENT GROUP LLC (DEFENDANT); Receipt: 466641 Date: 02/25/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

02/25/2021: 20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE; SECURITY DEVELOPMENT GROUP LLC (DEFENDANT); Receipt: 466641 Date: 02/25/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANTS

02/25/2021: REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANTS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANTS

02/25/2021: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANTS

CERTIFICATE OFSERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT STEPHEN J ROBERTS

02/25/2021: CERTIFICATE OFSERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT STEPHEN J ROBERTS

CERTIFICATE OFSERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT SECURITY DEVELOPMENT GROUP LLC D/B/A S3 SECURITY

02/25/2021: CERTIFICATE OFSERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT SECURITY DEVELOPMENT GROUP LLC D/B/A S3 SECURITY

CIVIL COVER SHEET - JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

02/25/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET - JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

COMPLAINT Receipt: 466641 Date: 02/25/2021; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $0.00

02/25/2021: COMPLAINT Receipt: 466641 Date: 02/25/2021; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $0.00

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY NAME AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN SUMMONS - SERVED 03/18/2021; STEPHEN J ROBERTS (DEFENDANT);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF CORPORATE PROCESS SERVED ON 3/15/21; SECURITY DEVELOPMENT GROUP LLC (DEFENDANT);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $420.00; Total Fee Paid: $420.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • FinancialReceipt # 466641; Paid: $420.00; Applied: $420.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE; STEPHEN J ROBERTS (DEFENDANT); Receipt: 466641 Date: 02/25/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE; SECURITY DEVELOPMENT GROUP LLC (DEFENDANT); Receipt: 466641 Date: 02/25/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OFSERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT STEPHEN J ROBERTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OFSERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT SECURITY DEVELOPMENT GROUP LLC D/B/A S3 SECURITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT Receipt: 466641 Date: 02/25/2021; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BIGGART II ESQ, JAMES G