Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County on 02/09/2020 at 15:13:29 (UTC).

FLAGG, WILLIAM TYBIROUS et al -VS- HABERLAND, SEAN KURT

Case Summary

On 04/26/2018 FLAGG, WILLIAM TYBIROUS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against HABERLAND, SEAN KURT. This case was filed in Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1319

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FLAGG, WILLIAM TYBIROUS

FLAGG, STANARIA TALISA RICHARDSON

Defendant

HABERLAND, SEAN KURT

Alachua, FL 32615

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DONSKY ESQ, MICHAEL

Dan Newlin & Partners, 7335 W Sand Lake Road, Ste 300

Orlando, FL 32819

HERMAN ESQ, JASON P

7335 W Sand Lake Rd, Suite 300

Orlando, FL 32819

Defendant Attorneys

GAFFNEY, BROOKE M

Po Box 15200

Daytona Beach, FL 32115

BIGMAN ESQ, JEFFREY E

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

Attorney At Law, P O Box 15200

Daytona Beach, FL 32115

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL INTERROGATORY TO PLAINTIFF, STANARIA TALISA RICHARDSON FLAGG

07/26/2019: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL INTERROGATORY TO PLAINTIFF, STANARIA TALISA RICHARDSON FLAGG

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL INTERROGATORY TO PLAINTIFF, WILLIAM TYBIROUS FLAGG

07/26/2019: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL INTERROGATORY TO PLAINTIFF, WILLIAM TYBIROUS FLAGG

CERTIFICATE OF NO OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF NON-PARTY PRODUCTINO OF DOCUMENTS AND THINGS WITHOUT DEPOSITION

07/22/2019: CERTIFICATE OF NO OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF NON-PARTY PRODUCTINO OF DOCUMENTS AND THINGS WITHOUT DEPOSITION

CERTIFICATE OF NO OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF NON-PARTY PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS & THINGS WITHOUT DEPOSITION

07/02/2019: CERTIFICATE OF NO OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF NON-PARTY PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS & THINGS WITHOUT DEPOSITION

DEFENDANTS EXPERT REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF'S WILLIAM TYBIROUS FLAGG AND STANARIA TALISA RICHARDSON FLAGG

06/27/2019: DEFENDANTS EXPERT REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF'S WILLIAM TYBIROUS FLAGG AND STANARIA TALISA RICHARDSON FLAGG

CERTIFICATE OF NO OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF NON-PARTY PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS & THINGS WITHOUT DEPOSITION

06/27/2019: CERTIFICATE OF NO OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF NON-PARTY PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS & THINGS WITHOUT DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND THINGS WITHOUT DEPOSITION UNDER RULE 1.351 FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

06/24/2019: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND THINGS WITHOUT DEPOSITION UNDER RULE 1.351 FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - SERVED

06/05/2019: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - SERVED

CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF NON-PARTY PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS & THINGS WITHOUT DEPOSITION

06/03/2019: CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF NON-PARTY PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS & THINGS WITHOUT DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF MEGAN SLAYTON

04/29/2019: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF MEGAN SLAYTON

NOTICE OF CONFLICT

03/29/2019: NOTICE OF CONFLICT

CERTIFICATE OF NO OBJECTION TO TO NOTICE OF NON-PARTY PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS & THINGS WITHOUT DEPOSITION

03/14/2019: CERTIFICATE OF NO OBJECTION TO TO NOTICE OF NON-PARTY PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS & THINGS WITHOUT DEPOSITION

PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR COPIES

03/08/2019: PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR COPIES

NOTICE OF HEARING -

02/01/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING -

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

02/01/2019: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

CERTIFICATE OF NO OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF NON-PARTY PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS & THINGS WITHOUT DEPOSITION

11/21/2018: CERTIFICATE OF NO OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF NON-PARTY PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS & THINGS WITHOUT DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT SEAN KURT HABERLAND'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF WILLIAM TYBIROUS FLAGG

08/27/2018: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT SEAN KURT HABERLAND'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF WILLIAM TYBIROUS FLAGG

ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

07/27/2018: ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

92 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DispositionAUTO NEGLIGENCE; Status: CLOSED; Status Date: 04/26/2018; Disposition: B. HRG/SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL (CLOSES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S SECOND AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF CORPORAL G.S. KEYES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT SECOND AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF CORPORAL W.G. SMITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDNAT, SEAN KURT HABERLSAND'S MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S EXPERTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL INTERROGATORY TO PLAINTIFF, STANARIA TALISA RICHARDSON FLAGG

    Read MoreRead Less
88 More Docket Entries
  • 07/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $410.00; Total Fee Paid: $410.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • FinancialReceipt # 418211; Paid: $410.00; Applied: $410.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 418211 Date: 04/26/2018; SEAN KURT HABERLAND (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT SEAN KURT HABERLAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT SEAN KURT HABERLAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT SEAN KURT HABERLAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT Receipt: 418211 Date: 04/26/2018; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BROOKE GAFFNEY

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bigman, Jeffrey Errol