This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 03/14/2023 at 07:22:41 (UTC).

FIRST GUARANTY MORTGAGE CORPORATION - VS - YOUNG SR., THEODORE G et al

Case Summary

On 06/21/2022 FIRST GUARANTY MORTGAGE CORPORATION - filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against - YOUNG SR , THEODORE G. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FLOYD, KATHERINE L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1872

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FLOYD, KATHERINE L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FIRST GUARANTY MORTGAGE CORPORATION

Defendants

YOUNG SR., THEODORE G

Gainesville, FL 32609

YOUNG, THEODORE

YOUNG SR, THEODORE

GAINESVILLE FLORIDA THE CITY OF

200 East University Avenue

Gainesville, FL 32601

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

C/O Midland Credit Management Inc Registered Agent, 13008 Telecom Drive Suite 350

Tampa, FL 33637

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WATSON ESQ, BENNDRICK C

Attorney at MCCABE, WEISBERG & CONWAY, LLC

Mccabe, Weisberg & Conway, Llc, 3222 Commerce Place Ste A

West Palm Beach, FL 33407

Defendant Attorney

WHITTEN ESQ, NILES B

1031 Nw 6Th Street F-3

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF TRIAL READINESS

03/06/2023: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF TRIAL READINESS

PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

03/02/2023: PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

03/02/2023: PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

03/02/2023: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

HEARING DISPOSITION FORM

02/14/2023: HEARING DISPOSITION FORM

PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF DEFENDANT, THEODORE G. YOUNG, SR. A/K/A THEODORE YOUNG SR. A/K/A THEODORE YOUNG

02/07/2023: PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF DEFENDANT, THEODORE G. YOUNG, SR. A/K/A THEODORE YOUNG SR. A/K/A THEODORE YOUNG

REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE GENERAL MAGISTRATE, SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

02/03/2023: REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE GENERAL MAGISTRATE, SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

DEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND DEFENSES

01/30/2023: DEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND DEFENSES

ORDER DENYING EXCEPTIONS AND ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE GENERAL MAGISTRATE

01/24/2023: ORDER DENYING EXCEPTIONS AND ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE GENERAL MAGISTRATE

ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT, THEODORE G. YOUNG, SR'S MOTION TO DISMISS, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO ABATE PROCEEDINGS

01/09/2023: ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT, THEODORE G. YOUNG, SR'S MOTION TO DISMISS, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO ABATE PROCEEDINGS

HEARING DISPOSITION FORM

12/28/2022: HEARING DISPOSITION FORM

REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE GENERAL MAGISTRATE, SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

12/27/2022: REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE GENERAL MAGISTRATE, SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

ORDER SETTING HEARING ON EXCEPTIONS ; JANUARY 9, 2023 @ 1:30PM ;

12/07/2022: ORDER SETTING HEARING ON EXCEPTIONS ; JANUARY 9, 2023 @ 1:30PM ;

EXCEPTIONS

11/17/2022: EXCEPTIONS

HEARING DISPOSITION FORM

11/09/2022: HEARING DISPOSITION FORM

REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE GENERAL MAGISTRATE RECOMMENDING DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - 12/9/2022 @ 9:00 AM

11/04/2022: REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE GENERAL MAGISTRATE RECOMMENDING DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - 12/9/2022 @ 9:00 AM

MOTION TO DISMISS, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO ABATE PROCEEDINGS

10/25/2022: MOTION TO DISMISS, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO ABATE PROCEEDINGS

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2023
  • HearingFORECLOSURE HEARING GM; Judge: FLOYD, KATHERINE L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF TRIAL READINESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHEARING DISPOSITION FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF DEFENDANT, THEODORE G. YOUNG, SR. A/K/A THEODORE YOUNG SR. A/K/A THEODORE YOUNG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET - (NO IMAGE AVAILABLE); Event: FORECLOSURE HEARING GM ; Date: 03/24/2023 Time: 9:00 am ; Judge: FLOYD, KATHERINE L Location: COURTROOM 3-C

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE GENERAL MAGISTRATE, SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND DEFENSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketJUDICIAL SALE FEE Receipt: 486891 Date: 06/22/2022; Amount: $70.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketINDEX FEE FOR LIS PENDENS OVER 4 PARTIES Receipt: 486891 Date: 06/22/2022; Amount: $2.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketRECORDING FEE - FIRST PAGE OF LIS PENDENS Receipt: 486891 Date: 06/22/2022; Amount: $5.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER PER A.O. 3.09

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE (>$50,000.01 < $250.000.) Receipt: 486891 Date: 06/22/2022; Amount: $905.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less