This case was last updated from Alachua County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court on 03/15/2023 at 07:11:17 (UTC).

FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY -VS- DOE, JOHN et al

Case Summary

On 08/31/2022 FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against DOE, JOHN. This case was filed in Alachua County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2711

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

DOE, JOHN

CLARK, ROY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OSTROVSKY ESQ, ALEXANDER

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

08/31/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

COMPLAINT Receipt: 490195 Date: 09/02/2022; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $0.00

08/31/2022: COMPLAINT Receipt: 490195 Date: 09/02/2022; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $0.00

STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER PER A.O. 3.09

08/31/2022: STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER PER A.O. 3.09

NOTICE OF INTENT TO SERVE NON-PARTY SUBPOENA

09/02/2022: NOTICE OF INTENT TO SERVE NON-PARTY SUBPOENA

SUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 495455 Date: 01/06/2023; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

01/05/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 495455 Date: 01/06/2023; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

AMENDED COMPLAINT

01/05/2023: AMENDED COMPLAINT

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS - SUBSTITUTE SERVED ON 1/23/23 AS TO ROY CLARK (DEFENDANT);

01/30/2023: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS - SUBSTITUTE SERVED ON 1/23/23 AS TO ROY CLARK (DEFENDANT);

MOTION FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT AND DEFAULT ON DEFENDANT ROY CLARK (DEFAULT ISSUED AS TO AMENDED COMPLAINT AS TO ROY CLARK 02/16/2023 - KAH)

02/15/2023: MOTION FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT AND DEFAULT ON DEFENDANT ROY CLARK (DEFAULT ISSUED AS TO AMENDED COMPLAINT AS TO ROY CLARK 02/16/2023 - KAH)

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT FOR ROY CLARK

02/15/2023: NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT FOR ROY CLARK

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT FOR ROY CLARK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT AND DEFAULT ON DEFENDANT ROY CLARK (DEFAULT ISSUED AS TO AMENDED COMPLAINT AS TO ROY CLARK 02/16/2023 - KAH)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS - SUBSTITUTE SERVED ON 1/23/23 AS TO ROY CLARK (DEFENDANT);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • FinancialReceipt #: 495455; Paid: 495455; Applied: $10.00; Refunded: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 495455 Date: 01/06/2023; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • FinancialReceipt #: 490195; Paid: 490195; Applied: $400.00; Refunded: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF INTENT TO SERVE NON-PARTY SUBPOENA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $410.00; Total Fee Paid: $410.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER PER A.O. 3.09

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT Receipt: 490195 Date: 09/02/2022; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less