Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County on 03/25/2021 at 16:15:26 (UTC).

FANUELSON, CRYSTAL OCTAVIA -VS- HOWELL, RICHARD WAYNE et al

Case Summary

On 02/25/2021 FANUELSON, CRYSTAL OCTAVIA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against HOWELL, RICHARD WAYNE. This case was filed in Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0532

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FANUELSON, CRYSTAL OCTAVIA

Defendants

HOWELL, RICHARD WAYNE

Gainesville, FL 32653

LYFT FLORIDA INC

Ct Corporation System, 1200 South Pine Island

Plantation, FL 33324

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ALI ESQ, AFFAN

1511 Nw 6 Street

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANT LYFT FLORIDA, INC. (CLOSES)

03/12/2021: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANT LYFT FLORIDA, INC. (CLOSES)

SHERIFF'S RETURN ON SUMMONS - UNSERVED; RICHARD WAYNE HOWELL (DEFENDANT);

03/11/2021: SHERIFF'S RETURN ON SUMMONS - UNSERVED; RICHARD WAYNE HOWELL (DEFENDANT);

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED ON 3/5/21 - CT CORPORATION SYSTEM

03/09/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED ON 3/5/21 - CT CORPORATION SYSTEM

SUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 466660 Date: 02/25/2021; LYFT FLORIDA INC (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

02/25/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 466660 Date: 02/25/2021; LYFT FLORIDA INC (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

SUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 466660 Date: 02/25/2021; RICHARD WAYNE HOWELL (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

02/25/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 466660 Date: 02/25/2021; RICHARD WAYNE HOWELL (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO LYFT FLORIDA INC

02/25/2021: PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO LYFT FLORIDA INC

PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO RICHARD WAYNE HOWEL

02/25/2021: PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO RICHARD WAYNE HOWEL

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO LYFT FLORIDA INC

02/25/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO LYFT FLORIDA INC

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO RICHARD WAYNE HOWELL

02/25/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO RICHARD WAYNE HOWELL

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO LYFT FLORIDA INC

02/25/2021: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO LYFT FLORIDA INC

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT RICHARD WAYNE HOWELL

02/25/2021: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT RICHARD WAYNE HOWELL

CIVIL COVER SHEET - JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

02/25/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET - JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL Receipt: 466660 Date: 02/25/2021; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $0.00

02/25/2021: COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL Receipt: 466660 Date: 02/25/2021; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $0.00

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANT LYFT FLORIDA, INC. (CLOSES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN ON SUMMONS - UNSERVED; RICHARD WAYNE HOWELL (DEFENDANT);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED ON 3/5/21 - CT CORPORATION SYSTEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $420.00; Total Fee Paid: $420.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • FinancialReceipt # 466660; Paid: $420.00; Applied: $420.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 466660 Date: 02/25/2021; LYFT FLORIDA INC (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 466660 Date: 02/25/2021; RICHARD WAYNE HOWELL (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO LYFT FLORIDA INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO RICHARD WAYNE HOWEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO LYFT FLORIDA INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO RICHARD WAYNE HOWELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO LYFT FLORIDA INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT RICHARD WAYNE HOWELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL Receipt: 466660 Date: 02/25/2021; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lyft Florida, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ALI, AFFAN