Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 03/25/2021 at 16:26:06 (UTC).

ENLOE ROXANNE SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THE JORDAN -vs- EMMONS, DIANE et al

Case Summary

On 02/25/2021 ENLOE ROXANNE SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THE JORDAN filed an Other lawsuit against EMMONS, DIANE. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0693

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ENLOE ROXANNE SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THE JORDAN

Defendants

EMMONS, DIANE

Gainesville, FL 32608

EMMONS, BRANDY

Gainesville, FL 32608

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WARD, TERESA COOPER

Po Box 358

Monticello, FL 32345

 

Court Documents

5/20 SUMMONS ISSUED TO BRANDY EMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

03/01/2021: 5/20 SUMMONS ISSUED TO BRANDY EMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

5/20 SUMMONS ISSUED TO DIANE EMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

03/01/2021: 5/20 SUMMONS ISSUED TO DIANE EMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

SUMMONS (5/20 DAY) UNISSUED; (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE/ PLAINTIFF NAME IN STYLE DOES NOT MATCH NAME ON COMPLAINT); BRANDY EMMONS (DEFENDANT);

02/25/2021: SUMMONS (5/20 DAY) UNISSUED; (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE/ PLAINTIFF NAME IN STYLE DOES NOT MATCH NAME ON COMPLAINT); BRANDY EMMONS (DEFENDANT);

SUMMONS (5/20 DAY) UNISSUED; (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE/PLAINTIFF NAME IN STYLE DOES NOT MATCH NAME ON COMPLAINT); DIANE EMMONS (DEFENDANT);

02/25/2021: SUMMONS (5/20 DAY) UNISSUED; (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE/PLAINTIFF NAME IN STYLE DOES NOT MATCH NAME ON COMPLAINT); DIANE EMMONS (DEFENDANT);

COMPLAINT FOR DISTRESS OR DETAINER-UP TO $15,000.00 Receipt: 466687 Date: 02/26/2021; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

02/25/2021: COMPLAINT FOR DISTRESS OR DETAINER-UP TO $15,000.00 Receipt: 466687 Date: 02/26/2021; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

02/25/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT COURTVIEW CIVIL OVERPAYMENT>$10.00 / RECEIPT # 466761; Amount: $20.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • FinancialReceipt # 466761; Paid: $20.00; Applied: $20.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket5/20 SUMMONS ISSUED TO BRANDY EMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket5/20 SUMMONS ISSUED TO DIANE EMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCOURTVIEW CIVIL OVERPAYMENT>$10.00 Receipt: 466761 Date: 03/01/2021; Amount: $20.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • FinancialReceipt # 466687; Paid: $320.00; Applied: $320.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $360.00; Total Fee Paid: $340.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $20.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS (5/20 DAY) UNISSUED; (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE/ PLAINTIFF NAME IN STYLE DOES NOT MATCH NAME ON COMPLAINT); BRANDY EMMONS (DEFENDANT);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS (5/20 DAY) UNISSUED; (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE/PLAINTIFF NAME IN STYLE DOES NOT MATCH NAME ON COMPLAINT); DIANE EMMONS (DEFENDANT);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS FEE (34.041(1)(d) COUNTY CIVIL) Receipt: 466687 Date: 02/26/2021; Amount: $20.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DISTRESS OR DETAINER-UP TO $15,000.00 Receipt: 466687 Date: 02/26/2021; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Jordan is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WARD , TERESA COOPER