This case was last updated from Alachua County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court on 02/03/2022 at 21:57:08 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK -VS- PEYER, MELISSA SHELL

Case Summary

On 05/27/2021 DISCOVER BANK filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PEYER, MELISSA SHELL. This case was filed in Alachua County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is VAN VORST, KRISTINE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1833

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Judge Details

Judge

VAN VORST, KRISTINE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

PEYER, MELISSA SHELL

Gainesville, FL 32607

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TEKELL ESQ, JONATHAN RICHARD

10751 Deerwood Park Blvd Ste 100

Jacksonville, FL 32256

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

05/27/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

STATEMENT OF CLAIM ($2500.01 - $8000) Receipt: 470451 Date: 06/01/2021; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

05/27/2021: STATEMENT OF CLAIM ($2500.01 - $8000) Receipt: 470451 Date: 06/01/2021; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER PER A.O. 3.09

05/27/2021: STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER PER A.O. 3.09

(ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL; Receipt: 470451 Date: 06/01/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

05/27/2021: (ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL; Receipt: 470451 Date: 06/01/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

05/27/2021: MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

SHERIFF'S RETURN (SC) - SERVED 6/30/2021

06/30/2021: SHERIFF'S RETURN (SC) - SERVED 6/30/2021

SHERIFF'S RETURN (SC) - SERVED 6/30/2021

07/22/2021: SHERIFF'S RETURN (SC) - SERVED 6/30/2021

PRETRIAL RESULTS - ALL PARTIES PRESENT. CONT FOR STIPULATION/SETTLEMENT - FRIDAY, OCTOBER 1, 2021 AT 9:30 A.M.

08/02/2021: PRETRIAL RESULTS - ALL PARTIES PRESENT. CONT FOR STIPULATION/SETTLEMENT - FRIDAY, OCTOBER 1, 2021 AT 9:30 A.M.

PRETRIAL SET FOR - (ISSUED) ALIAS SUMMONS; MAILED TO PL'S ATTY/DEFENDANT 8/03/2021-MJP

08/03/2021: PRETRIAL SET FOR - (ISSUED) ALIAS SUMMONS; MAILED TO PL'S ATTY/DEFENDANT 8/03/2021-MJP

PRETRIAL RESULTS - ALL PARTIES PRESENT. CONT FOR STIPULATION/SETTLEMENT - FRIDAY, NOVEMBER 12, 2021 AT 9:30 A.M.

10/01/2021: PRETRIAL RESULTS - ALL PARTIES PRESENT. CONT FOR STIPULATION/SETTLEMENT - FRIDAY, NOVEMBER 12, 2021 AT 9:30 A.M.

PRETRIAL SET FOR - (ISSUED) ALIAS SUMMONS; MAILED TO PL'S ATTY/DEF 10/5/2021 MJP

10/04/2021: PRETRIAL SET FOR - (ISSUED) ALIAS SUMMONS; MAILED TO PL'S ATTY/DEF 10/5/2021 MJP

STIPULATION

10/04/2021: STIPULATION

ORDER ADOPTING STIPULATION AND DISMISSING ACTION (CLOSED)

10/07/2021: ORDER ADOPTING STIPULATION AND DISMISSING ACTION (CLOSED)

MOTION FOR JUDGMENT (REOPEN)

01/04/2022: MOTION FOR JUDGMENT (REOPEN)

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-PAYMENT

01/04/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-PAYMENT

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

01/04/2022: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

FINAL JUDGMENT (SC) (CLOSES)

01/06/2022: FINAL JUDGMENT (SC) (CLOSES)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2022
  • DispositionSMALL CLAIM $2,500.01 TO 5,000.00; Status: 99 CLOSED; Status Date: 01/04/2022; Disposition: 99CLOSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT (SC) (CLOSES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-PAYMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR JUDGMENT (REOPEN)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketCase Reopened this date 1/4/2022; (AS TO MOTION FOR JUDGMENT)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • HearingSMALL CLAIMS PRETRIALS - NO IMAGE; Judge: VAN VORST, KRISTINE; Result: EVENT CANCELLED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DispositionSMALL CLAIM $2,500.01 TO 5,000.00; Status: CLOSED; Status Date: 05/27/2021; Disposition: HH01 - AFTER HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ADOPTING STIPULATION AND DISMISSING ACTION (CLOSED)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN (SC) - SERVED 6/30/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN (SC) - SERVED 6/30/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET - (NO IMAGE AVAILABLE); Event: SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIALS - NO IMAGE ; Date: 07/30/2021 Time: 9:30 am ; Judge: VAN VORST - DIV V, KRISTINE Location: COURTROOM 2-B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • FinancialReceipt # 470451; Paid: $310.00; Applied: $310.00; Refunded: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $310.00; Total Fee Paid: $310.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL; Receipt: 470451 Date: 06/01/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER PER A.O. 3.09

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM ($2500.01 - $8000) Receipt: 470451 Date: 06/01/2021; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DISCOVER BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TEKELL, JONATHAN RICHARD