This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 08/25/2021 at 05:27:59 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK -vs- LIN, XIANG F

Case Summary

On 04/15/2021 DISCOVER BANK filed an Other lawsuit against LIN, XIANG F. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1316

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

LIN, XIANG F

Gainesville, FL 32607

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TEAL ESQ, BROOKE E

P.O. Box 23200

Louisville, KY 40223

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT ; Receipt: 468649 Date: 04/15/2021; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $0.00

04/14/2021: COMPLAINT ; Receipt: 468649 Date: 04/15/2021; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $0.00

CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

04/14/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED TO XIANG F LIN; Receipt: 468649 Date: 04/15/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

04/14/2021: 20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED TO XIANG F LIN; Receipt: 468649 Date: 04/15/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION AND ORDER; TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

04/14/2021: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION AND ORDER; TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

04/20/2021: ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED 4/22/2021; XIANG F LIN (DEFENDANT);

04/22/2021: RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED 4/22/2021; XIANG F LIN (DEFENDANT);

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

07/19/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

07/19/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

07/19/2021: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

MOTION FOR DEFAULT & DEFAULT ; ENTERED 7/20/2021 AS TO XIANG F LIN / CMW

07/19/2021: MOTION FOR DEFAULT & DEFAULT ; ENTERED 7/20/2021 AS TO XIANG F LIN / CMW

MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

07/19/2021: MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT (CLOSES)

08/02/2021: DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT (CLOSES)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2021
  • DispositionCOUNTY MONEY DAMAGES CLAIM $15,001 TO $30,000; Status: CLOSED; Status Date: 04/15/2021; Disposition: DE03 - DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT (CLOSES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT & DEFAULT ; ENTERED 7/20/2021 AS TO XIANG F LIN / CMW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED 4/22/2021; XIANG F LIN (DEFENDANT);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $410.00; Total Fee Paid: $410.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • FinancialReceipt # 468649; Paid: $410.00; Applied: $410.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S MOTION AND ORDER; TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED TO XIANG F LIN; Receipt: 468649 Date: 04/15/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ; Receipt: 468649 Date: 04/15/2021; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DISCOVER BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TEAL, BROOKE ELIZABETH