Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County on 02/09/2020 at 22:09:45 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK -VS- BAHN, CHANG S

Case Summary

On 05/21/2018 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BAHN, CHANG S. This case was filed in Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1658

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

BAHN, CHANG S

Gainesville, FL 32609

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ZEIGERMAN ESQ, MICHAEL JONATHAN

10751 Deerwood Park Blvd Ste 100

Jacksonville, FL 32256

BROWN ESQ, NATAIJA J

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

Attorney At Law, 10751 Deerwood Park Blvd, Suite 100

Jacksonville, FL 32256

Defendant Attorney

RUIZCALDERON ESQ, DANIEL G

240 Nw 76 Dr Ste D

Gainesville, FL 32607

 

Court Documents

SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY FILED (CLOSES)

03/18/2019: SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY FILED (CLOSES)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

03/18/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

RETURN OF SERVICE ON WRIT OF GARNISHMENT (STRAIGHT WRIT) SERVED 3/1/19 BANK OF AMERICA

03/12/2019: RETURN OF SERVICE ON WRIT OF GARNISHMENT (STRAIGHT WRIT) SERVED 3/1/19 BANK OF AMERICA

NOTICE TO DEFENDANT AND INTERESTED PARTIES AND CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT AND INTERESTED PARTIES

03/08/2019: NOTICE TO DEFENDANT AND INTERESTED PARTIES AND CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT AND INTERESTED PARTIES

NOTICE TO INDIVIDUAL DEFENDANT PURSUANT TO FLORIDA STATUTE 77.041(1)(2)

03/07/2019: NOTICE TO INDIVIDUAL DEFENDANT PURSUANT TO FLORIDA STATUTE 77.041(1)(2)

ANSWER OF GARNISHEE AND DEMAND TO PLAINTIFF FOR PAYMENT OF ATTORNEY'S FEES; (BANK OF AMERICA, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION; GARNISHEE #1)

03/05/2019: ANSWER OF GARNISHEE AND DEMAND TO PLAINTIFF FOR PAYMENT OF ATTORNEY'S FEES; (BANK OF AMERICA, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION; GARNISHEE #1)

DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT(CLOSES)

12/19/2018: DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT(CLOSES)

ORDER GRANTING TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

11/13/2018: ORDER GRANTING TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

MOTION TO APPEAR BY PHONE

11/08/2018: MOTION TO APPEAR BY PHONE

ORDER SETTING HEARING ON PLAINITFFS MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

11/07/2018: ORDER SETTING HEARING ON PLAINITFFS MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

09/06/2018: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

08/02/2018: NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

08/02/2018: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

(UNSIGNED) SHERIFF'S RETURN ON 20-DAY SUMMONS - SERVED 6/15/2018; CHANG S BAHN (DEFENDANT);

06/22/2018: (UNSIGNED) SHERIFF'S RETURN ON 20-DAY SUMMONS - SERVED 6/15/2018; CHANG S BAHN (DEFENDANT);

SHERIFF'S RETURN ON 20-DAY SUMMONS - SERVED 6/15/2018; CHANG S BAHN (DEFENDANT);

06/18/2018: SHERIFF'S RETURN ON 20-DAY SUMMONS - SERVED 6/15/2018; CHANG S BAHN (DEFENDANT);

SUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 419547 Date: 05/22/2018; CHANG S BAHN (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

05/21/2018: SUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 419547 Date: 05/22/2018; CHANG S BAHN (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

MOTION TO APPOINT ELISOR

05/21/2018: MOTION TO APPOINT ELISOR

COMPLAINT Receipt: 419547 Date: 05/22/2018; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $0.00

05/21/2018: COMPLAINT Receipt: 419547 Date: 05/22/2018; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $0.00

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISMISSAL OF GARNISHEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • DocketALERT ISSUED; SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY FILED issued on: 03/18/2019 ; For: BAHN, CHANG S ; Bond Amt: ; Bond Type:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY FILED (CLOSES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON WRIT OF GARNISHMENT (STRAIGHT WRIT) SERVED 3/1/19 BANK OF AMERICA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO DEFENDANT AND INTERESTED PARTIES AND CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT AND INTERESTED PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO INDIVIDUAL DEFENDANT PURSUANT TO FLORIDA STATUTE 77.041(1)(2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER OF GARNISHEE AND DEMAND TO PLAINTIFF FOR PAYMENT OF ATTORNEY'S FEES; (BANK OF AMERICA, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION; GARNISHEE #1)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • DispositionCONTRACT AND INDEBTEDNESS; Status: 99 CLOSED; Status Date: 02/25/2019; Disposition: 99CLOSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • FinancialReceipt # 433920; Paid: $85.00; Applied: $85.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATION OF PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(UNSIGNED) SHERIFF'S RETURN ON 20-DAY SUMMONS - SERVED 6/15/2018; CHANG S BAHN (DEFENDANT);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN ON 20-DAY SUMMONS - SERVED 6/15/2018; CHANG S BAHN (DEFENDANT);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • FinancialReceipt # 419547; Paid: $410.00; Applied: $410.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $495.00; Total Fee Paid: $495.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 419547 Date: 05/22/2018; CHANG S BAHN (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT ELISOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT Receipt: 419547 Date: 05/22/2018; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DISCOVER BANK is a litigant