This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 02/03/2023 at 09:51:03 (UTC).

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AS TRUSTEE - VS - PRICE, LEO et al

Case Summary

On 11/10/2022 DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AS TRUSTEE - filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against - PRICE, LEO. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FLOYD, KATHERINE L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3577

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FLOYD, KATHERINE L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AS TRUSTEE

Defendants

PEOPLES JR, GEORGE A

Gainesville, FL 32601

PRICE, LEO

Crawfordville, FL 32327

PEOPLES, ALPHONSO

RICHARDSON, KASHELA

Gainesville, FL 32601

BURLEY, SHEDRICK

Gainesville, FL 32608

RICHARDSON, KATARA

Gainesville, FL 32601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STEIN ESQ, CRAIG BRETT

3222 Commerce Place, Suite A

West Palm Beach, FL 33407

Defendant Attorney

CASE ESQ, KENNETH

2727 Ulmerton Rd, Suite 270

Clearwater, FL 33762

 

Court Documents

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING AS TO NOTICE OF ACTION; SHEDRICK BURLEY (DEFENDANT); KATARA RICHARDSON (DEFENDANT);

02/02/2023: CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING AS TO NOTICE OF ACTION; SHEDRICK BURLEY (DEFENDANT); KATARA RICHARDSON (DEFENDANT);

NOTICE OF SERVICE

02/01/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE

COVER LETTER (CLERKS NOTE: CLERK DOES NOT SEND NOTICE OF ACTION TO PUBLICATION)

01/26/2023: COVER LETTER (CLERKS NOTE: CLERK DOES NOT SEND NOTICE OF ACTION TO PUBLICATION)

NOTICE OF ACTION - ISSUED 02022023 MT; SHEDRICK BURLEY (DEFENDANT); KATARA RICHARDSON (DEFENDANT);

01/04/2023: NOTICE OF ACTION - ISSUED 02022023 MT; SHEDRICK BURLEY (DEFENDANT); KATARA RICHARDSON (DEFENDANT);

MAIL RETURNED AS TO KATARA RICHARDSON (DEFENDANT);

01/27/2023: MAIL RETURNED AS TO KATARA RICHARDSON (DEFENDANT);

MAIL RETURNED AS TO KASHELA RICHARDSON (DEFENDANT);

01/27/2023: MAIL RETURNED AS TO KASHELA RICHARDSON (DEFENDANT);

ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE, ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, AND HEARING ON PENDING MOTIONS, AND REQUIRING SERVICE OR DISMISSAL GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

01/18/2023: ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE, ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, AND HEARING ON PENDING MOTIONS, AND REQUIRING SERVICE OR DISMISSAL GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

AFFIDAVIT OF DUE DILIGENCE AND ATTEMPTED SERVICE; KATARA RICHARDSON (DEFENDANT);

12/28/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF DUE DILIGENCE AND ATTEMPTED SERVICE; KATARA RICHARDSON (DEFENDANT);

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

12/29/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (REOPEN)

12/29/2022: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (REOPEN)

AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR CONSTRUCTIVE SERVICE BY PUBLICATION

12/28/2022: AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR CONSTRUCTIVE SERVICE BY PUBLICATION

PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY AFFIDAVIT IN COMPLIANCE WITH 49.031, FLORIDA STATUTES

12/28/2022: PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY AFFIDAVIT IN COMPLIANCE WITH 49.031, FLORIDA STATUTES

AFFIDAVIT OF DUE DILIGENCE AND ATTEMPTED SERVICE

12/28/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF DUE DILIGENCE AND ATTEMPTED SERVICE

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE UNSERVED 12/14/2022; KATARA RICHARDSON (DEFENDANT);

12/27/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE UNSERVED 12/14/2022; KATARA RICHARDSON (DEFENDANT);

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE UNSERVED 12/16/2022; SHEDRICK BURLEY (DEFENDANT);

12/27/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE UNSERVED 12/16/2022; SHEDRICK BURLEY (DEFENDANT);

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE UNSERVED 12/14/2022; KATARA RICHARDSON (DEFENDANT);

12/27/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE UNSERVED 12/14/2022; KATARA RICHARDSON (DEFENDANT);

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2023
  • HearingFORECLOSURE HEARING GM; Judge: FLOYD, KATHERINE L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING AS TO NOTICE OF ACTION; SHEDRICK BURLEY (DEFENDANT); KATARA RICHARDSON (DEFENDANT);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMAIL RETURNED AS TO KATARA RICHARDSON (DEFENDANT);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMAIL RETURNED AS TO KASHELA RICHARDSON (DEFENDANT);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER LETTER (CLERKS NOTE: CLERK DOES NOT SEND NOTICE OF ACTION TO PUBLICATION)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET - (NO IMAGE AVAILABLE); Event: FORECLOSURE HEARING GM ; Date: 03/24/2023 Time: 9:00 am ; Judge: FLOYD, KATHERINE L Location: COURTROOM 3-C

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE, ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, AND HEARING ON PENDING MOTIONS, AND REQUIRING SERVICE OR DISMISSAL GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ACTION - ISSUED 02022023 MT; SHEDRICK BURLEY (DEFENDANT); KATARA RICHARDSON (DEFENDANT);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE AS THERE IS A BALANCE DUE OF $1.00 FOR INDEXING PURPOSES. ALSO, DUE TO A RECENT CHANGE IN THE REQUIRED SUPREME COURT APPROVED SUMMONS FOR AN INDIVIDUAL, WHICH NOW MUST INCLUDE A CREOLE TRANSLATION OF THE SUMMONS & OUR CURRENT ADA LANGUAGE, THE CLERK IS UNABLE TO ISSUE THE SUMMONS. FOR CORRECT SUMMONS GO TO CLERKS WEBSITE, CLICK ON FORMS, THEN CIVIL FORMS WHERE YOU WILL FIND THE SUMMONS FOR AN INDIVIDUAL. WHEN SUBMITTING CORRECTED SUMMONS ON E-PORTAL CHOOSE DOCUMENT TYPE CORRECTED SUMMONS AS THE $10 FEE HAS ALREADY BEEN PAID CMW 11/10/2022); ; Receipt: 493247 Date: 11/10/2022; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR ; MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketRECORDING FEE - FIRST PAGE OF LIS PENDENS ; Receipt: 493247 Date: 11/10/2022; Amount: $5.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketINDEX FEE FOR LIS PENDENS OVER 4 PARTIES ; Receipt: 493247 Date: 11/10/2022 Receipt: 493319 Date: 11/14/2022; Amount: $5.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketJUDICIAL SALE FEE ; Receipt: 493247 Date: 11/10/2022; Amount: $70.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER PER A.O. 3.09

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE OF MORTGAGE; Receipt: 493247 Date: 11/10/2022; Amount: $905.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee, in Trust for Registered Holders of Long Beach Mortgage Loan Trust 2006-6, Asset-backed Certificates, Series 2006-6 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stein, Craig Brett