Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County on 02/12/2020 at 12:50:19 (UTC).

CURRY, VICKY L -VS- SMITH, BRANDEN ALENE et al

Case Summary

On 10/01/2018 CURRY, VICKY L filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SMITH, BRANDEN ALENE. This case was filed in Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3273

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CURRY, VICKY L

Defendants

JOUVENAS, DESTINY ALENE

Gainesville, FL 32607

SMITH, BRANDEN ALENE

Gainesville, FL 32607

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COOK ESQ, ROB T

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

Attorney At Law, 904 Anastasia Blvd Suite A

St Augustine, FL 32080

Defendant Attorneys

ORGA, LISA M

901 N Lake Destiny Rd Suite 105

Maitland, FL 32751

AZOTEA ESQ, DAVID J

Law Office Of Terryl Blackman Walker, 901 N Lake Destiny Rd Ste 105

Maitland, FL 32751

 

Court Documents

ORDER CANCELING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

03/14/2019: ORDER CANCELING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION

02/28/2019: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION

AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

02/04/2019: AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

01/31/2019: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF NON-OBJECTION AND REQUEST FOR ELECTRONIC COPIES

01/29/2019: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF NON-OBJECTION AND REQUEST FOR ELECTRONIC COPIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF, VICKY L CURRY'S INITIAL INTERROGATORIES

12/28/2018: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF, VICKY L CURRY'S INITIAL INTERROGATORIES

PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS REQUEST TO PRODUCE

11/29/2018: PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

11/28/2018: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT

11/13/2018: PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST INTERROGATORIES

11/13/2018: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF MOTOR VEHICLE NEGLIGENCE INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF VICKY L CURRY

10/30/2018: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF MOTOR VEHICLE NEGLIGENCE INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF VICKY L CURRY

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLAINTIFF VICKY L CURRY

10/30/2018: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLAINTIFF VICKY L CURRY

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

10/30/2018: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

10/30/2018: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

SHERIFF'S RETURN ON 20-DAY SUMMONS - SERVED; BRANDEN ALENE SMITH (DEFENDANT);

10/16/2018: SHERIFF'S RETURN ON 20-DAY SUMMONS - SERVED; BRANDEN ALENE SMITH (DEFENDANT);

SUMMONS - ISSUED; DESTINY ALENE JOUVENAS (DEFENDANT);

10/05/2018: SUMMONS - ISSUED; DESTINY ALENE JOUVENAS (DEFENDANT);

SUMMONS UNISSUED - WITH FEE (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE. INCORRECT SUMMONS Receipt: 426554 Date: 10/01/2018; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

10/01/2018: SUMMONS UNISSUED - WITH FEE (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE. INCORRECT SUMMONS Receipt: 426554 Date: 10/01/2018; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

SUMMONS UNISSUED - WITH FEE (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE. INCORRECT SUMMONS) Receipt: 426554 Date: 10/01/2018; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

10/01/2018: SUMMONS UNISSUED - WITH FEE (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE. INCORRECT SUMMONS) Receipt: 426554 Date: 10/01/2018; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2019
  • DispositionAUTO NEGLIGENCE; Status: CLOSED; Status Date: 10/01/2018; Disposition: B. HRG/SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (CLOSES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER CANCELING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S CORRECTED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION (COURT REPORTER'S ADDRESS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN ON 20-DAY SUMMONS - SERVED; DESTINY ALENE JOUVENAS (DEFENDANT);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN ON 20-DAY SUMMONS - SERVED; BRANDEN ALENE SMITH (DEFENDANT);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; DESTINY ALENE JOUVENAS (DEFENDANT);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS - ISSUED; BRANDEN ALENE SMITH (DEFENDANT);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $420.00; Total Fee Paid: $420.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • FinancialReceipt # 426554; Paid: $420.00; Applied: $420.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS UNISSUED - WITH FEE (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE. INCORRECT SUMMONS Receipt: 426554 Date: 10/01/2018; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS UNISSUED - WITH FEE (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE. INCORRECT SUMMONS) Receipt: 426554 Date: 10/01/2018; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT Receipt: 426554 Date: 10/01/2018; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer COOK ROB T