This case was last updated from Alachua County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court on 02/04/2022 at 19:16:29 (UTC).

CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC -VS- PARKER, SAMANTHA

Case Summary

On 05/20/2021 CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PARKER, SAMANTHA. This case was filed in Alachua County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is VAN VORST, KRISTINE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1706

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Judge Details

Judge

VAN VORST, KRISTINE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC

Defendant

PARKER, SAMANTHA

Gainesville, FL 32607

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MELANSON ESQ, KYLE

1515 South Federal Highway Suite 100

Boca Raton, FL 33432

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF CLAIM - ($2500.01 - $8000) Receipt: 470021 Date: 05/21/2021; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

05/20/2021: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - ($2500.01 - $8000) Receipt: 470021 Date: 05/21/2021; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

05/20/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

05/20/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

E-MAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

05/20/2021: E-MAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

05/20/2021: MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

(ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL -WITH FEE Receipt: 470021 Date: 05/21/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

05/21/2021: (ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL -WITH FEE Receipt: 470021 Date: 05/21/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

SHERIFF'S RETURN (SC) - SERVED 06/22/2021

06/23/2021: SHERIFF'S RETURN (SC) - SERVED 06/22/2021

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - SERVED ON 6/22/2021 AT 10:21 AM; SAMANTHA PARKER (DEFENDANT);

07/13/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - SERVED ON 6/22/2021 AT 10:21 AM; SAMANTHA PARKER (DEFENDANT);

PRETRIAL RESULTS - ALL PARTIES PRESENT. CONT FOR STIPULATION/SETTLEMENT- FRIDAY, SEPTEMBER 17, 2021 AT 9:30 .M.

07/16/2021: PRETRIAL RESULTS - ALL PARTIES PRESENT. CONT FOR STIPULATION/SETTLEMENT- FRIDAY, SEPTEMBER 17, 2021 AT 9:30 .M.

PRETRIAL SET FOR - (ISSUED) ALIAS SUMMONS; MAILED TO PL'S ATTY/ DEFENDANT 07/2021-MJP)

07/20/2021: PRETRIAL SET FOR - (ISSUED) ALIAS SUMMONS; MAILED TO PL'S ATTY/ DEFENDANT 07/2021-MJP)

MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

08/13/2021: MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL VERIFIED STATEMENT OF COST

08/13/2021: PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL VERIFIED STATEMENT OF COST

VERIFIED STATEMENT AS TO MILITARY STATUS

08/13/2021: VERIFIED STATEMENT AS TO MILITARY STATUS

AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

08/13/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

PRETRIAL RESULTS -PLAINTIFF PRESENT/DEFENDANT(S) NO SHOW. DEFAULT/ATTY TO FILE AFFIDAVIT AND PROPOSED ORDER

09/17/2021: PRETRIAL RESULTS -PLAINTIFF PRESENT/DEFENDANT(S) NO SHOW. DEFAULT/ATTY TO FILE AFFIDAVIT AND PROPOSED ORDER

ENTRY OF DEFAULT (SMALL CLAIMS RULES); ; ENTRY OF DEFAULT; Sent on: 09/17/2021 13:27:42.90

09/17/2021: ENTRY OF DEFAULT (SMALL CLAIMS RULES); ; ENTRY OF DEFAULT; Sent on: 09/17/2021 13:27:42.90

FINAL JUDGMENT (SC) (CLOSES)

09/28/2021: FINAL JUDGMENT (SC) (CLOSES)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2021
  • DispositionSMALL CLAIM $2,500.01 TO 5,000.00; Status: CLOSED; Status Date: 05/20/2021; Disposition: DE03 - DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT (SC) (CLOSES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • HearingSMALL CLAIMS PRETRIALS - NO IMAGE; Judge: VAN VORST, KRISTINE; Result: HELD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF DEFAULT (SMALL CLAIMS RULES); ; ENTRY OF DEFAULT; Sent on: 09/17/2021 13:27:42.90

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL RESULTS -PLAINTIFF PRESENT/DEFENDANT(S) NO SHOW. DEFAULT/ATTY TO FILE AFFIDAVIT AND PROPOSED ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVERIFIED STATEMENT AS TO MILITARY STATUS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL VERIFIED STATEMENT OF COST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN (SC) - SERVED 06/22/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • FinancialReceipt # 470021; Paid: $310.00; Applied: $310.00; Refunded: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET - (NO IMAGE AVAILABLE); Event: SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIALS - NO IMAGE ; Date: 07/16/2021 Time: 9:30 am ; Judge: VAN VORST - DIV V, KRISTINE Location: COURTROOM 2-B; ; Result: HELD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL -WITH FEE Receipt: 470021 Date: 05/21/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $310.00; Total Fee Paid: $310.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-MAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - ($2500.01 - $8000) Receipt: 470021 Date: 05/21/2021; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Crown Asset Management LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MELANSON , KYLE