Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 02/11/2020 at 00:48:48 (UTC).

CRESCENT BANK AND TRUST -vs- RIVERS, JERRELL A

Case Summary

On 07/24/2018 CRESCENT BANK AND TRUST filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against RIVERS, JERRELL A. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2655

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CRESCENT BANK AND TRUST

Defendant

RIVERS, JERRELL A

Gainesville, FL 32608

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PALMA ESQ, JORGE L

815 Nw 57 Ave Ste 401

Miami, FL 33126

 

Court Documents

CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; (RED LOBSTER RESTAURANTS, LLC; GARNISHEE #1)

01/09/2020: CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; (RED LOBSTER RESTAURANTS, LLC; GARNISHEE #1)

MOTION FOR CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT (REOPEN) ; (RED LOBSTER RESTAURANTS, LLC; GARNISHEE #1); Receipt: 441900 Date: 07/30/2019; Amount: $85.00; Amount Due: $0.00

07/30/2019: MOTION FOR CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT (REOPEN) ; (RED LOBSTER RESTAURANTS, LLC; GARNISHEE #1); Receipt: 441900 Date: 07/30/2019; Amount: $85.00; Amount Due: $0.00

DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT (CLOSES)

11/19/2018: DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT (CLOSES)

MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

11/07/2018: MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT (ATTACHED)

11/07/2018: NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT (ATTACHED)

SUPPLEMENTAL NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

11/07/2018: SUPPLEMENTAL NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

11/07/2018: AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

10/25/2018: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

DEFAULT- ENTERED 10/25/2018 AS TO: JERRELL A RIVERS (DEFENDANT);

10/25/2018: DEFAULT- ENTERED 10/25/2018 AS TO: JERRELL A RIVERS (DEFENDANT);

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

10/25/2018: MOTION FOR DEFAULT

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE- SUBSTITUTE SERVED 9/7/2018; JERRELL A RIVERS (DEFENDANT);

09/10/2018: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE- SUBSTITUTE SERVED 9/7/2018; JERRELL A RIVERS (DEFENDANT);

ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

08/15/2018: ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

EX PARTE MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

07/24/2018: EX PARTE MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO: JERRELL A RIVERS; Receipt: 422991 Date: 07/24/2018; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

07/24/2018: 20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO: JERRELL A RIVERS; Receipt: 422991 Date: 07/24/2018; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

07/24/2018: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

(E-REDACTED) COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES; Receipt: 422991 Date: 07/24/2018; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

07/24/2018: (E-REDACTED) COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES; Receipt: 422991 Date: 07/24/2018; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2020
  • DispositionCONTRACT AND INDEBTEDNESS $5,000.01 TO $15,000.00; Status: 99 CLOSED; Status Date: 07/30/2019; Disposition: 99CLOSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • Docket99 CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; (RED LOBSTER RESTAURANTS, LLC; GARNISHEE #1)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • FinancialReceipt # 441900; Paid: $85.00; Applied: $85.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT (REOPEN) ; (RED LOBSTER RESTAURANTS, LLC; GARNISHEE #1); Receipt: 441900 Date: 07/30/2019; Amount: $85.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • DocketCase Reopened this date

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • DispositionCONTRACT AND INDEBTEDNESS $5,000.01 TO $15,000.00; Status: CLOSED; Status Date: 07/24/2018; Disposition: DE03 - DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT (CLOSES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 10/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT- ENTERED 10/25/2018 AS TO: JERRELL A RIVERS (DEFENDANT);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE- SUBSTITUTE SERVED 9/7/2018; JERRELL A RIVERS (DEFENDANT);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $395.00; Total Fee Paid: $395.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • FinancialReceipt # 422991; Paid: $310.00; Applied: $310.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEX PARTE MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO: JERRELL A RIVERS; Receipt: 422991 Date: 07/24/2018; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(E-REDACTED) COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES; Receipt: 422991 Date: 07/24/2018; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Crescent Bank and Trust is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Palma, Jorge L, ESQ.