Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 02/12/2020 at 02:46:53 (UTC).

CRESCENT BANK AND TRUST -vs- REDMON, ROSA L

Case Summary

On 07/31/2018 CRESCENT BANK AND TRUST filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against REDMON, ROSA L. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2819

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CRESCENT BANK AND TRUST

Defendant

REDMON, ROSA L

Gainesville, FL 32606

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PALMA ESQ, JORGE L

815 Nw 57 Ave Ste 401

Miami, FL 33126

 

Court Documents

SUPPLEMENTAL NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

05/24/2019: SUPPLEMENTAL NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

ORDER VACATING FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT

05/21/2019: ORDER VACATING FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT

ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION ; FOR REHEARING AND SCHEDULING HEARING

05/21/2019: ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION ; FOR REHEARING AND SCHEDULING HEARING

ORDER ALLOWING PLAINTIFF TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY

04/30/2019: ORDER ALLOWING PLAINTIFF TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY

ORDER SCHEDULING HEARING - 5/9/2019 @ 1:30 PM; ROOM 202; ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR REHEARING

03/28/2019: ORDER SCHEDULING HEARING - 5/9/2019 @ 1:30 PM; ROOM 202; ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR REHEARING

JUDGE'S HEARING NOTES

12/21/2018: JUDGE'S HEARING NOTES

FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT (CLOSES)

12/21/2018: FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT (CLOSES)

MOTION FOR / TO REHEARING; ROSA L REDMON; (EMAILED J.A. 12/4/2018 / CMW)

12/04/2018: MOTION FOR / TO REHEARING; ROSA L REDMON; (EMAILED J.A. 12/4/2018 / CMW)

SUPPLEMENTAL NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

11/21/2018: SUPPLEMENTAL NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEYS FEES

11/21/2018: AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEYS FEES

MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE BY COUNSEL AT HEARING

11/05/2018: MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE BY COUNSEL AT HEARING

(E-REDACTED) MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

10/18/2018: (E-REDACTED) MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

10/18/2018: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

10/18/2018: AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS

10/03/2018: PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS

RETURN OF SERVICE ON 20 DAY SUMMONS - SUBSTITUTE SERVED 9/12/2018; ROSA L REDMON

09/17/2018: RETURN OF SERVICE ON 20 DAY SUMMONS - SUBSTITUTE SERVED 9/12/2018; ROSA L REDMON

ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

08/29/2018: ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

(E-REDACTED) COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES; Receipt: 423472 Date: 07/31/2018; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

07/31/2018: (E-REDACTED) COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES; Receipt: 423472 Date: 07/31/2018; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT (CLOSES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUPPLEMENTAL NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER VACATING FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION ; FOR REHEARING AND SCHEDULING HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • DispositionCONTRACT AND INDEBTEDNESS $5,000.01 TO $15,000.00; Status: 99 CLOSED; Status Date: 04/02/2019; Disposition: 99CLOSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Docket99 CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ALLOWING PLAINTIFF TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE BY COUNSEL AT HEARING (REOPEN)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketCase Reopened this date

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; ROSA L REDMON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON 20 DAY SUMMONS - SUBSTITUTE SERVED 9/12/2018; ROSA L REDMON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $310.00; Total Fee Paid: $310.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • FinancialReceipt # 423472; Paid: $310.00; Applied: $310.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEX PARTE MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO: ROSA L REDMON; Receipt: 423472 Date: 07/31/2018; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(E-REDACTED) COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES; Receipt: 423472 Date: 07/31/2018; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Crescent Bank and Trust is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Palma, Jorge L, ESQ.