Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 02/10/2020 at 00:19:00 (UTC).

CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION -vs- BLAKE, WAYNE et al

Case Summary

On 05/31/2018 CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BLAKE, WAYNE. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1879

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION

Defendants

GRANT, ANGELEK

Alachua, FL 32615

BLAKE, WAYNE

Alachua, FL 32615

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DRAGUTSKY ESQ, JASON S

7765 Sw 87 Ave, Ste 101

Miami, FL 33173

 

Court Documents

MAIL RETURNED; ANGELEK GRANT (DEFENDANT);

01/13/2020: MAIL RETURNED; ANGELEK GRANT (DEFENDANT);

MAIL RETURNED; WAYNE BLAKE (DEFENDANT);

01/13/2020: MAIL RETURNED; WAYNE BLAKE (DEFENDANT);

VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL (CLOSES)

01/08/2020: VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL (CLOSES)

ORDER OF DISMISSAL (CLOSES)

12/20/2019: ORDER OF DISMISSAL (CLOSES)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS CO-COUNSEL; (COVERAGE COUNSEL ONLY)

12/13/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS CO-COUNSEL; (COVERAGE COUNSEL ONLY)

MAIL RETURNED; ANGELEK GRANT

11/22/2019: MAIL RETURNED; ANGELEK GRANT

MAIL RETURNED; WAYNE BLAKE

11/22/2019: MAIL RETURNED; WAYNE BLAKE

NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SERVICE OF PROCESS, AND ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND HEARING ON ALL PENDING MOTIONS - 12/13/2019 @ 1:30 PM

11/13/2019: NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SERVICE OF PROCESS, AND ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND HEARING ON ALL PENDING MOTIONS - 12/13/2019 @ 1:30 PM

RETURN OF NON-SERVICE ON 20 DAY SUMMONS; WAYNE BLAKE

07/10/2018: RETURN OF NON-SERVICE ON 20 DAY SUMMONS; WAYNE BLAKE

RETURN OF NON-SERVICE ON 20 DAY SUMMONS; ANGELEK GRANT

07/10/2018: RETURN OF NON-SERVICE ON 20 DAY SUMMONS; ANGELEK GRANT

ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

06/11/2018: ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

05/31/2018: MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO: WAYNE BLAKE; Receipt: 420089 Date: 05/31/2018; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

05/31/2018: 20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO: WAYNE BLAKE; Receipt: 420089 Date: 05/31/2018; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO: ANGELEK GRANT; Receipt: 420089 Date: 05/31/2018; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

05/31/2018: 20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO: ANGELEK GRANT; Receipt: 420089 Date: 05/31/2018; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

05/31/2018: CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES; Receipt: 420089 Date: 05/31/2018; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

05/31/2018: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES; Receipt: 420089 Date: 05/31/2018; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMAIL RETURNED; ANGELEK GRANT (DEFENDANT);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMAIL RETURNED; WAYNE BLAKE (DEFENDANT);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVOLUNTARY DISMISSAL (CLOSES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DispositionCONTRACT AND INDEBTEDNESS $5,000.01 TO $15,000.00; Status: CLOSED; Status Date: 05/31/2018; Disposition: BH01- BEFORE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL (CLOSES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS CO-COUNSEL; (COVERAGE COUNSEL ONLY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMAIL RETURNED; ANGELEK GRANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMAIL RETURNED; WAYNE BLAKE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SERVICE OF PROCESS, AND ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND HEARING ON ALL PENDING MOTIONS - 12/13/2019 @ 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF NON-SERVICE ON 20 DAY SUMMONS; WAYNE BLAKE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF NON-SERVICE ON 20 DAY SUMMONS; ANGELEK GRANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $320.00; Total Fee Paid: $320.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • FinancialReceipt # 420089; Paid: $320.00; Applied: $320.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO: WAYNE BLAKE; Receipt: 420089 Date: 05/31/2018; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO: ANGELEK GRANT; Receipt: 420089 Date: 05/31/2018; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES; Receipt: 420089 Date: 05/31/2018; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Credit Acceptance Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JASON DRAGUTSKY