This case was last updated from Alachua County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court on 02/07/2020 at 14:02:04 (UTC).

CORREA, SCARLETT -VS- TAGGART, ASHLYN

Case Summary

On 01/04/2018 CORREA, SCARLETT filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against TAGGART, ASHLYN. This case was filed in Alachua County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is VAN VORST, KRISTINE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0040

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Judge Details

Judge

VAN VORST, KRISTINE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CORREA, SCARLETT

Gainesville, FL 32653

Defendant

TAGGART, ASHLYN

Gainesville, FL 32606

 

Court Documents

SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED

05/22/2019: SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED

ANSWER OF GARNISHEE TO CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; (SHANDS TEACHING HOSPTIAL AND CLINICS, INC; GARNISHEE #1)

04/19/2019: ANSWER OF GARNISHEE TO CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; (SHANDS TEACHING HOSPTIAL AND CLINICS, INC; GARNISHEE #1)

SHERIFF'S RETURN ON CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT - SERVED 03/08/2019 AS TO: UF HEALTH SHANDS, GARNISHEE #1

03/12/2019: SHERIFF'S RETURN ON CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT - SERVED 03/08/2019 AS TO: UF HEALTH SHANDS, GARNISHEE #1

CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; (UF HEALTH SHANDS; GARNISHEE #1)

02/25/2019: CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; (UF HEALTH SHANDS; GARNISHEE #1)

(PROPOSED) WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; (EMAILED TO J.A. 1/28/2019/CMW)

01/28/2019: (PROPOSED) WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; (EMAILED TO J.A. 1/28/2019/CMW)

ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; (UF HEALTH SHANDS; GARNISHEE #1)

01/25/2019: ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; (UF HEALTH SHANDS; GARNISHEE #1)

APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS / CLERK'S DETERMINATION (INDIGENT)

01/14/2019: APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS / CLERK'S DETERMINATION (INDIGENT)

LETTER (BILLING NOTICE FOR GARNISHMENT FILING FEE); (MAILED TO PLAINTIFF 1/10/2019/CMW); (UF HEALTH SHANDS; GARNISHEE #1)

01/09/2019: LETTER (BILLING NOTICE FOR GARNISHMENT FILING FEE); (MAILED TO PLAINTIFF 1/10/2019/CMW); (UF HEALTH SHANDS; GARNISHEE #1)

MOTION FOR / TO A CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT (REOPEN); (UF HEALTH SHANDS; GARNISHEE #1) (EMAILED J.A. 1/10/2019/CMW); Amount: $85.00; Amount Due: $0.00

01/09/2019: MOTION FOR / TO A CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT (REOPEN); (UF HEALTH SHANDS; GARNISHEE #1) (EMAILED J.A. 1/10/2019/CMW); Amount: $85.00; Amount Due: $0.00

APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS - UNDETERMINED (SECTIONS LEFT BLANK AND ANSWERS TO QUESTIONS NOT CIRCLED)

01/09/2019: APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS - UNDETERMINED (SECTIONS LEFT BLANK AND ANSWERS TO QUESTIONS NOT CIRCLED)

ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL

12/05/2018: ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL

JUDGE'S HEARING NOTES

12/05/2018: JUDGE'S HEARING NOTES

COPY OF TEXT MESSAGES

12/05/2018: COPY OF TEXT MESSAGES

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS; ASHLYN TAGGART (DEFENDANT)

12/05/2018: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS; ASHLYN TAGGART (DEFENDANT)

(FAX) MOTION TO DISMISS EVIDENCE HEARING; ASHLYN TAGGART, (DEFENDANT); (EMAILED TO J.A. 11/26/2018 - MJP)

11/26/2018: (FAX) MOTION TO DISMISS EVIDENCE HEARING; ASHLYN TAGGART, (DEFENDANT); (EMAILED TO J.A. 11/26/2018 - MJP)

(FAX) LETTER TO THE JUDGE; ASHLYN TAGGART, (DEFENDANT); (EMAILED TO JA 11/26/2018 - MJP)

11/26/2018: (FAX) LETTER TO THE JUDGE; ASHLYN TAGGART, (DEFENDANT); (EMAILED TO JA 11/26/2018 - MJP)

(FAX) MOTION TO DISMISS EVIDENCE HEARING ON 12/3; ASHLYN TAGGART (PLAINTIFF) ; (IMAGE NOT AVAILABLE DOCKETED IN ERROR)

11/26/2018: (FAX) MOTION TO DISMISS EVIDENCE HEARING ON 12/3; ASHLYN TAGGART (PLAINTIFF) ; (IMAGE NOT AVAILABLE DOCKETED IN ERROR)

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE; SCARLETT CORREA (PLAINTIFF)

11/26/2018: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE; SCARLETT CORREA (PLAINTIFF)

49 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER OF GARNISHEE TO CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; (SHANDS TEACHING HOSPTIAL AND CLINICS, INC; GARNISHEE #1)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN ON CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT - SERVED 03/08/2019 AS TO: UF HEALTH SHANDS, GARNISHEE #1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • DispositionMONEY DAMAGES CLAIM $500.01 TO $2500.00; Status: 99 CLOSED; Status Date: 01/09/2019; Disposition: 99CLOSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • Docket99 CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; (UF HEALTH SHANDS; GARNISHEE #1)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(PROPOSED) WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; (EMAILED TO J.A. 1/28/2019/CMW)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; (UF HEALTH SHANDS; GARNISHEE #1)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • DocketALERT ISSUED; INDIGENT issued on: 01/11/2019 ; For: CORREA, SCARLETT ; Bond Amt: ; Bond Type:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS / CLERK'S DETERMINATION (INDIGENT)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
67 More Docket Entries
  • 01/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT - CLAIMED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SET FOR - SUMMONS; Event: SMALL CLAIM PRETRIALS ; Date: 02/23/2018 Time: 10:00 am ; Judge: JAWORSKI - DIV V, THOMAS M Location: COURTROOM 2-B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPERMISSION TO USE E-MAIL; SCARLETT CORREA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $362.59; Total Fee Paid: $192.59; Total Fee Dismissed: $170.00; Total Fee Due: ($0.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • FinancialReceipt # 412396; Paid: $6.59; Applied: $6.59; Refunded: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • FinancialReceipt # 412395; Paid: $186.00; Applied: $186.00; Refunded: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • DocketPOSTAGE ; Receipt: 412396 Date: 01/04/2018; Amount: $6.59; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS FEE (34.041(1)(d) COUNTY CIVIL) ; Receipt: 412395 Date: 01/04/2018; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • DocketCOPIES (CASE RECEIPTING) ; Receipt: 412395 Date: 01/04/2018; Amount: $1.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM ($500.01 - $2500.00) ; Receipt: 412395 Date: 01/04/2018; Amount: $175.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less