Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 02/13/2020 at 22:06:16 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA -vs- PIERRE, CARLOS

Case Summary

On 12/31/2018 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PIERRE, CARLOS. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************4890

  • Filing Date:

    12/31/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA

Defendant

PIERRE, CARLOS

Gainesville, FL 32607

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FERRELL ESQ, ELIZABETH M

1315 Westbrook Plaza Drive

Winston Salem, NC 27103

 

Court Documents

MAIL RETURNED; CARLOS PIERRE (DEFENDANT);

01/09/2020: MAIL RETURNED; CARLOS PIERRE (DEFENDANT);

VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE (CLOSES)

12/16/2019: VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE (CLOSES)

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

12/16/2019: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SERVICE OF PROCESS, AND ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND HEARING ON ALL PENDING MOTIONS - 1/17/2020 @ 1:30 PM

12/12/2019: NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SERVICE OF PROCESS, AND ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND HEARING ON ALL PENDING MOTIONS - 1/17/2020 @ 1:30 PM

VERIFIED RETURN OF NON-SERVICE ON 20 DAY SUMMONS; CARLOS PIERRE

03/05/2019: VERIFIED RETURN OF NON-SERVICE ON 20 DAY SUMMONS; CARLOS PIERRE

ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

01/18/2019: ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

12/31/2018: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO: CARLOS PIERRE ; Receipt: 430851 Date: 12/31/2018; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

12/31/2018: 20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO: CARLOS PIERRE ; Receipt: 430851 Date: 12/31/2018; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

COMPLAINT FOR CONTRACT & INDEBTEDNESS ; Receipt: 430851 Date: 12/31/2018; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

12/31/2018: COMPLAINT FOR CONTRACT & INDEBTEDNESS ; Receipt: 430851 Date: 12/31/2018; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMAIL RETURNED; CARLOS PIERRE (DEFENDANT);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DispositionCONTRACT AND INDEBTEDNESS $5,000.01 TO $15,000.00; Status: CLOSED; Status Date: 12/31/2018; Disposition: BH01- BEFORE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE (CLOSES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SERVICE OF PROCESS, AND ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND HEARING ON ALL PENDING MOTIONS - 1/17/2020 @ 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVERIFIED RETURN OF NON-SERVICE ON 20 DAY SUMMONS; CARLOS PIERRE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $310.00; Total Fee Paid: $310.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • FinancialReceipt # 430851; Paid: $310.00; Applied: $310.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO: CARLOS PIERRE ; Receipt: 430851 Date: 12/31/2018; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR CONTRACT & INDEBTEDNESS ; Receipt: 430851 Date: 12/31/2018; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FERRELL, ELIZABETH MURANTE