Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 02/13/2020 at 22:29:28 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA -vs- OZUNA, ALEXANDER B

Case Summary

On 12/31/2018 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against OZUNA, ALEXANDER B. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************4889

  • Filing Date:

    12/31/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA

Defendant

OZUNA, ALEXANDER B

Alachua, FL 32615

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FERRELL ESQ, ELIZABETH M

1315 Westbrook Plaza Drive

Winston Salem, NC 27103

 

Court Documents

ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

01/18/2019: ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

10/30/2019: MOTION FOR DEFAULT

COMPLAINT FOR CONTRACT & INDEBTEDNESS ; Receipt: 430850 Date: 12/31/2018; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

12/31/2018: COMPLAINT FOR CONTRACT & INDEBTEDNESS ; Receipt: 430850 Date: 12/31/2018; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

10/30/2019: NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAIVT OF APPEARANCE OF CO-COUNSEL ; AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; (COVERAGE COUNSEL ONLY)

01/17/2020: AFFIDAIVT OF APPEARANCE OF CO-COUNSEL ; AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; (COVERAGE COUNSEL ONLY)

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

12/05/2019: NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT IN PROOF OF COSTS

12/05/2019: AFFIDAVIT IN PROOF OF COSTS

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

12/31/2018: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO: ALEXANDER B OZUNA; Receipt: 430850 Date: 12/31/2018; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

12/31/2018: 20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO: ALEXANDER B OZUNA; Receipt: 430850 Date: 12/31/2018; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND HEARING ON ALL PENDING MOTIONS - 1/17/2020 @ 1:30 PM

12/12/2019: ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND HEARING ON ALL PENDING MOTIONS - 1/17/2020 @ 1:30 PM

VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE ON 20 DAY SUMMONS - SERVED 2/2/2019; ALEXANDER B OZUNA

02/15/2019: VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE ON 20 DAY SUMMONS - SERVED 2/2/2019; ALEXANDER B OZUNA

DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT(CLOSES)

02/12/2020: DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT(CLOSES)

MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

12/05/2019: MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

DEFAULT ENTERED 10/31/2019 AS TO ALEXANDER B OZUNA / CMW

10/30/2019: DEFAULT ENTERED 10/31/2019 AS TO ALEXANDER B OZUNA / CMW

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/12/2020
  • DispositionCONTRACT AND INDEBTEDNESS $5,000.01 TO $15,000.00; Status: CLOSED; Status Date: 12/31/2018; Disposition: DE03 - DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT(CLOSES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAIVT OF APPEARANCE OF CO-COUNSEL ; AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; (COVERAGE COUNSEL ONLY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND HEARING ON ALL PENDING MOTIONS - 1/17/2020 @ 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT IN PROOF OF COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED 10/31/2019 AS TO ALEXANDER B OZUNA / CMW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE ON 20 DAY SUMMONS - SERVED 2/2/2019; ALEXANDER B OZUNA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $310.00; Total Fee Paid: $310.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • FinancialReceipt # 430850; Paid: $310.00; Applied: $310.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO: ALEXANDER B OZUNA; Receipt: 430850 Date: 12/31/2018; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR CONTRACT & INDEBTEDNESS ; Receipt: 430850 Date: 12/31/2018; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less