This case was last updated from Alachua County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court on 02/03/2022 at 21:54:13 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA -VS- ERMLICH, AARON

Case Summary

On 05/27/2021 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ERMLICH, AARON. This case was filed in Alachua County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is VAN VORST, KRISTINE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1812

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Judge Details

Judge

VAN VORST, KRISTINE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA

Defendant

ERMLICH, AARON

Gainesville, FL 32601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SPINOZZA ESQ, KEVIN

806 Douglas Rd Ste 200

Coral Gables, FL 33134

 

Court Documents

(E-REDACTED) STATEMENT OF CLAIM - ($2500.01 - $8000) ; Receipt: 470319 Date: 05/27/2021; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

05/26/2021: (E-REDACTED) STATEMENT OF CLAIM - ($2500.01 - $8000) ; Receipt: 470319 Date: 05/27/2021; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

05/26/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

05/26/2021: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL ; INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

05/26/2021: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL ; INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

05/26/2021: NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

(ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL; Receipt: 470319 Date: 05/27/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

05/26/2021: (ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL; Receipt: 470319 Date: 05/27/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

05/26/2021: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

05/28/2021: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

06/01/2021: ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - 6/9/2021

06/10/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - 6/9/2021

PRETRIAL RESULTS - ALL PARTIES PRESENT. CONT FOR STIPULATION/SETTLEMENT- FRIDAY, SEPTEMBER 17, 2021 AT 9:30 .M.

07/16/2021: PRETRIAL RESULTS - ALL PARTIES PRESENT. CONT FOR STIPULATION/SETTLEMENT- FRIDAY, SEPTEMBER 17, 2021 AT 9:30 .M.

PRETRIAL SET FOR - (ISSUED) ALIAS SUMMONS; MAILED TO PL'S ATTY/ DEFENDANT 07/2021-MJP)

07/20/2021: PRETRIAL SET FOR - (ISSUED) ALIAS SUMMONS; MAILED TO PL'S ATTY/ DEFENDANT 07/2021-MJP)

STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT AND ORDER FOR DISMISSAL

08/02/2021: STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT AND ORDER FOR DISMISSAL

ORDER ADOPTING STIPULATION AND DISMISSING ACTION (CLOSED)

08/12/2021: ORDER ADOPTING STIPULATION AND DISMISSING ACTION (CLOSED)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2021
  • HearingSMALL CLAIMS PRETRIALS - NO IMAGE; Judge: VAN VORST, KRISTINE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DispositionSMALL CLAIM $5,001 TO $8,000; Status: CLOSED; Status Date: 05/27/2021; Disposition: HH01 - AFTER HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ADOPTING STIPULATION AND DISMISSING ACTION (CLOSED)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT AND ORDER FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SET FOR - (ISSUED) ALIAS SUMMONS; MAILED TO PL'S ATTY/ DEFENDANT 07/2021-MJP)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • HearingSMALL CLAIMS PRETRIALS - NO IMAGE; Judge: VAN VORST, KRISTINE; Result: HELD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET - (NO IMAGE AVAILABLE); Event: SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIALS - NO IMAGE ; Date: 09/17/2021 Time: 9:30 am ; Judge: VAN VORST - DIV V, KRISTINE Location: COURTROOM 2-B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL RESULTS - ALL PARTIES PRESENT. CONT FOR STIPULATION/SETTLEMENT- FRIDAY, SEPTEMBER 17, 2021 AT 9:30 .M.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - 6/9/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 05/27/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $310.00; Total Fee Paid: $310.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • FinancialReceipt # 470319; Paid: $310.00; Applied: $310.00; Refunded: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL; Receipt: 470319 Date: 05/27/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET - (NO IMAGE AVAILABLE); Event: SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIALS - NO IMAGE ; Date: 07/16/2021 Time: 9:30 am ; Judge: VAN VORST - DIV V, KRISTINE Location: COURTROOM 2-B; ; Result: HELD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL ; INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(E-REDACTED) STATEMENT OF CLAIM - ($2500.01 - $8000) ; Receipt: 470319 Date: 05/27/2021; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Spinozza, Kevin