This case was last updated from Alachua County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court on 02/04/2022 at 21:08:00 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA -VS- BRADLEY, LAURA

Case Summary

On 05/25/2021 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BRADLEY, LAURA. This case was filed in Alachua County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is VAN VORST, KRISTINE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1784

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Judge Details

Judge

VAN VORST, KRISTINE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA

Defendant

BRADLEY, LAURA

Gainesville, FL 32601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DEBSKI, MICHAEL THIEL

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

Attorney At Law, Po Box 47718

Jacksonville, FL 32247

EIKNER ESQ, CLAUDIA R

Po Box 47718

Jacksonville, FL 32247

 

Court Documents

PRETRIAL RESULTS - ALL PARTIES PRESENT

11/12/2021: PRETRIAL RESULTS - ALL PARTIES PRESENT

ORDER VACATING FINAL JUDGMENT ; ENTERED NOVEMBER 1, 2021

11/04/2021: ORDER VACATING FINAL JUDGMENT ; ENTERED NOVEMBER 1, 2021

DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT (SC) (CLOSES)

11/01/2021: DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT (SC) (CLOSES)

NOTICE TO APPEAR REMOTELY FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE / MEDIATION - 11/12/2021 @ 9:30 AM (FILED BY THE COURT)

10/07/2021: NOTICE TO APPEAR REMOTELY FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE / MEDIATION - 11/12/2021 @ 9:30 AM (FILED BY THE COURT)

CERTIFICATION OF PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY

10/06/2021: CERTIFICATION OF PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY

NOTICE OF FILING PLAINTIFF'S AFFIDAVIT (ATTACHED)

10/06/2021: NOTICE OF FILING PLAINTIFF'S AFFIDAVIT (ATTACHED)

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

10/06/2021: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT(REOPEN)

10/06/2021: MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT(REOPEN)

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL ; INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

10/06/2021: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL ; INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

(FAXED)LETTER FILED BY SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT (SRL) LAURA BRADLEY (DEFENDANT)

09/21/2021: (FAXED)LETTER FILED BY SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT (SRL) LAURA BRADLEY (DEFENDANT)

ENTRY OF DEFAULT (SMALL CLAIMS RULES); ; ENTRY OF DEFAULT; Sent on: 09/17/2021 14:47:52.21

09/17/2021: ENTRY OF DEFAULT (SMALL CLAIMS RULES); ; ENTRY OF DEFAULT; Sent on: 09/17/2021 14:47:52.21

PRETRIAL RESULTS -PLAINTIFF PRESENT/DEFENDANT(S) NO SHOW. DEFAULT/ATTY TO FILE AFFIDAVIT AND PROPOSED ORDER

09/17/2021: PRETRIAL RESULTS -PLAINTIFF PRESENT/DEFENDANT(S) NO SHOW. DEFAULT/ATTY TO FILE AFFIDAVIT AND PROPOSED ORDER

PRETRIAL SET FOR - (ISSUED) ALIAS SUMMONS; MAILED TO PL'S ATTY/ DEFENDANT 07/2021-MJP)

07/20/2021: PRETRIAL SET FOR - (ISSUED) ALIAS SUMMONS; MAILED TO PL'S ATTY/ DEFENDANT 07/2021-MJP)

PRETRIAL RESULTS - ALL PARTIES PRESENT. CONT FOR STIPULATION/SETTLEMENT- FRIDAY, SEPTEMBER 17, 2021 AT 9:30 .M.

07/16/2021: PRETRIAL RESULTS - ALL PARTIES PRESENT. CONT FOR STIPULATION/SETTLEMENT- FRIDAY, SEPTEMBER 17, 2021 AT 9:30 .M.

NOTICE OF LIMITED APPEARANCE

07/01/2021: NOTICE OF LIMITED APPEARANCE

SHERIFF'S RETURN SUMMONS - SERVED 6/10/2021; LAURA BRADLEY (DEFENDANT);

07/01/2021: SHERIFF'S RETURN SUMMONS - SERVED 6/10/2021; LAURA BRADLEY (DEFENDANT);

ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

05/27/2021: ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL ; INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

05/25/2021: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL ; INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2021
  • HearingSMALL CLAIMS PRETRIALS - NO IMAGE; Judge: VAN VORST, KRISTINE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL RESULTS - ALL PARTIES PRESENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER VACATING FINAL JUDGMENT ; ENTERED NOVEMBER 1, 2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTE: DO NOT CLOSE CASE. A FINAL JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED; HOWEVER A NEW PRETRIAL DATE HAS BEEN SET FOR 11/12/2021. CLERK TO FOLLOW UP WITH JUDICIAL ASSISTANT. - CMW 11/3/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT (SC) (CLOSES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET - (NO IMAGE AVAILABLE); Event: SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIALS - NO IMAGE ; Date: 11/12/2021 Time: 9:30 am ; Judge: VAN VORST - DIV V, KRISTINE Location: COURTROOM 2-B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR REMOTELY FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE / MEDIATION - 11/12/2021 @ 9:30 AM (FILED BY THE COURT)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATION OF PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING PLAINTIFF'S AFFIDAVIT (ATTACHED)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN SUMMONS - SERVED 6/10/2021; LAURA BRADLEY (DEFENDANT);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • FinancialReceipt # 470246; Paid: $310.00; Applied: $310.00; Refunded: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET - (NO IMAGE AVAILABLE); Event: SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIALS - NO IMAGE ; Date: 07/16/2021 Time: 9:30 am ; Judge: VAN VORST - DIV V, KRISTINE Location: COURTROOM 2-B; ; Result: HELD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $310.00; Total Fee Paid: $310.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL ; INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL; Receipt: 470246 Date: 05/26/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(E-REDACTED) STATEMENT OF CLAIM - ($2500.01 - $8000) ; Receipt: 470246 Date: 05/26/2021; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Eikner, Claudia R

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Debski, Michael Thiel