Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County on 02/05/2020 at 23:12:09 (UTC).

CANTERBURY SHOWPLACE, INC A FLORIDA PROFIT et al -VS- READ, NANNET HANDROS et al

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 CANTERBURY SHOWPLACE, INC A FLORIDA PROFIT filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against READ, NANNET HANDROS. This case was filed in Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3397

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CANTERBURY SHOWPLACE, INC A FLORIDA PROFIT

SHOW YOUR HORSE, LLC

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

EVANS, CARLIE

Newberry, FL 32669

READ, NANNET HANDROS

Newberry, FL 32699

CANTERBURY SHOWPLACE, INC

Counter Defendant

CANTERBURY SHOWPLACE, INC.

Defendant, Counter Plaintiff and Cross Plaintiff

READ, NANNET HANDROS

Newberry, FL 32699

Defendant and Cross Defendant

EVANS, CARLIE

Newberry, FL 32669

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant, Counter Plaintiff, Cross Plaintiff and Plaintiff Attorneys

MCNEAL ESQ, KELLY R

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

Attorney At Law, 2830 Nw 41St St Suite L

Gainesville, FL 32606

FLORES ESQ, KATHRYN C

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

Attorney At Law, 1 Se 1 Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

STINSON, KIRSTIN J

1 Se 1 Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

Defendant, Cross Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Plaintiff Attorneys

HAYTER ESQ, JOHN F

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

Attorney At Law, 1418 Nw 6 St

Gainesville, FL 32601

MCNEAL ESQ, KELLY R

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

Attorney At Law, 2830 Nw 41St St Suite L

Gainesville, FL 32606

FLORES ESQ, KATHRYN C

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

Attorney At Law, 1 Se 1 Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

STINSON ESQ., KIRSTIN J.

1 Se 1 Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

Defendant, Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

FLORES ESQ, KATHRYN C

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

Attorney At Law, 1 Se 1 Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

STINSON ESQ., KIRSTIN J.

1 Se 1 Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorney

HAYTER ESQ, JOHN F

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

Attorney At Law, 1418 Nw 6 St

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF HEARING -02/12/20 9:00AM

10/31/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING -02/12/20 9:00AM

ORDER SCHEDULING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND NON-JURY TRIAL; 3/17/2020 @ 3PM; 3/31/2020 @ 9AM

09/25/2019: ORDER SCHEDULING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND NON-JURY TRIAL; 3/17/2020 @ 3PM; 3/31/2020 @ 9AM

NOTICE OF HEARING - 9/24/19 @ 8:30AM

09/19/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING - 9/24/19 @ 8:30AM

ANSWER AND AFFERMATIVE DEFENSES OF CARLIE EVANS TO CROSS-CLAIM OF NANNET HANDROS READ AND MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT OF OR FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT BY SHOW YOUR HORSE LLC

09/16/2019: ANSWER AND AFFERMATIVE DEFENSES OF CARLIE EVANS TO CROSS-CLAIM OF NANNET HANDROS READ AND MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT OF OR FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT BY SHOW YOUR HORSE LLC

FIRST AMENDED ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR CIVIL THEFT AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, COUNTERCLAIM, CROSS CLAIMS OF DEFENDANT/COUNTER-PLAINTIFF/ CROSS-PLAINTIFF, NANNET HANDROS READ, AND COMPLAINT BY PLAINTIFF, SHOW YOUR HORSE, LLC

08/29/2019: FIRST AMENDED ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR CIVIL THEFT AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, COUNTERCLAIM, CROSS CLAIMS OF DEFENDANT/COUNTER-PLAINTIFF/ CROSS-PLAINTIFF, NANNET HANDROS READ, AND COMPLAINT BY PLAINTIFF, SHOW YOUR HORSE, LLC

DEFENDANT/CROSS PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

04/26/2019: DEFENDANT/CROSS PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

CARLIE EVANS' OBJECTION TO ISSUANCE OF THIRD PARTY SUBPOENA

04/08/2019: CARLIE EVANS' OBJECTION TO ISSUANCE OF THIRD PARTY SUBPOENA

ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ANSWER

01/29/2019: ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ANSWER

DEFENDANTS EXPERT WITNESS LIST

01/11/2019: DEFENDANTS EXPERT WITNESS LIST

DEFENDANTS MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

12/14/2018: DEFENDANTS MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

PLAINTIFFS SECOND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT NANNET HANDROS READ

12/14/2018: PLAINTIFFS SECOND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT NANNET HANDROS READ

ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND NON-JURY TRIAL; APRIL 11, 2019 AT 12:30PM ; APRIL 25, 2019 AT 9:00AM

10/18/2018: ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND NON-JURY TRIAL; APRIL 11, 2019 AT 12:30PM ; APRIL 25, 2019 AT 9:00AM

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF CO-COUNSEL AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

10/11/2018: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF CO-COUNSEL AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT OF PLAINTIFFS CANTERBURY SHOWPLACE INC FLORIDA PROFIT

05/30/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT OF PLAINTIFFS CANTERBURY SHOWPLACE INC FLORIDA PROFIT

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFEMDAMTS AMENDED ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST INTERROGATORIES

04/12/2018: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFEMDAMTS AMENDED ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST INTERROGATORIES

SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM FOR DEPOSITION

04/09/2018: SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM FOR DEPOSITION

PLAINTIFFS AVOIDANCE OF DEFENDANTS AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE

12/13/2017: PLAINTIFFS AVOIDANCE OF DEFENDANTS AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE

CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

10/10/2017: CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

193 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS VERIFIED MOTION TO STRIKE CROSS-PLAINTIFF/COUNTER PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF SPECIFIC PARAGRAPHS OF THE COUNTERCLAIM AND CROSS CLAIMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUBPOENA SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S AMENDED EXPERT WITNESS LIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUBPOENA SERVED 12/03/19; AS TO KIMBERLEY ALDRICH-FARRELL, FOX LEA FARM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT/CROSS PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED EXPERT WITNESS LIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCROSS-PLAINTIFF/COUNTER-PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO CARLIE EVANS ONLY (CLOSES); CARLIE EVANS (CROSS DEFENDANT);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION OF KIMBERLY FERRELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT/CROSS PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF/COUNTER-DEFENDANT, GARY WESEMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
189 More Docket Entries
  • 12/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN ON 20-DAY SUMMONS - SERVED 11/17/2017; NANNET HANDROS READ (DEFENDANT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN ON 20-DAY SUMMONS - UNSERVED; NANNET HANDROS READ (DEFENDANT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • FinancialReceipt # 408734; Paid: $410.00; Applied: $410.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $1,210.00; Total Fee Paid: $1,210.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AS TO: NANNET HANDROS READ (DEFENDANT); Receipt: 408734 Date: 10/11/2017; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR CIVIL THEFT ; Receipt: 408734 Date: 10/11/2017; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer STINSON ESQ., KIRSTIN J.