Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 02/04/2020 at 17:11:30 (UTC).

CAMPUS USA CREDIT UNION -vs- SABAGHAMIRKHIZI, KAMERON

Case Summary

On 07/13/2017 CAMPUS USA CREDIT UNION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SABAGHAMIRKHIZI, KAMERON. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2171

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CAMPUS USA CREDIT UNION

YOUR CAMPUS FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

Defendant

SABAGHAMIRKHIZI, KAMERON

Gainesville, FL 32607

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BECKER ESQ., JEFFREY R.

Po Box 550858

Jacksonville, FL 32255

REISS ESQ., JENNIFER L.

Po Box 550858

Jacksonville, FL 32255

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ON CFL PIZZA, LLC (99CLOSE); (CFL PIZZA, LLC; GARNISHEE #1)

04/16/2019: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ON CFL PIZZA, LLC (99CLOSE); (CFL PIZZA, LLC; GARNISHEE #1)

AFFIDAVIT IN PROOF OF CLAIM; (CFL PIZZA, LLC; GARNISHEE #1)

07/23/2018: AFFIDAVIT IN PROOF OF CLAIM; (CFL PIZZA, LLC; GARNISHEE #1)

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; (CFL PIZZA, LLC; GARNISHEE #1); (APPEARS TO BE A DUPLICATE)

06/26/2018: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; (CFL PIZZA, LLC; GARNISHEE #1); (APPEARS TO BE A DUPLICATE)

NOTICE TO PRODUCE; (CFL PIZZA, LLC; GARNISHEE #1); (APPEARS TO BE A DUPLICATE)

06/26/2018: NOTICE TO PRODUCE; (CFL PIZZA, LLC; GARNISHEE #1); (APPEARS TO BE A DUPLICATE)

NOTICE OF GARNISHMENT; (CFL PIZZA, LLC; GARNISHEE #1); (APPEARS TO BE A DUPLICATE)

06/26/2018: NOTICE OF GARNISHMENT; (CFL PIZZA, LLC; GARNISHEE #1); (APPEARS TO BE A DUPLICATE)

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; (CFL PIZZA, LLC; GARNISHEE #1)

06/25/2018: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; (CFL PIZZA, LLC; GARNISHEE #1)

NOTICE OF GARNISHMENT; (CFL PIZZA, LLC; GARNISHEE #1)

06/25/2018: NOTICE OF GARNISHMENT; (CFL PIZZA, LLC; GARNISHEE #1)

NOTICE TO DEFENDANT OF RIGHT AGAINST GARNISHMENT OF WAGES, MONEY, AND OTHER PROPERTY; (CFL PIZZA, LLC; GARNISHEE #1)

06/01/2018: NOTICE TO DEFENDANT OF RIGHT AGAINST GARNISHMENT OF WAGES, MONEY, AND OTHER PROPERTY; (CFL PIZZA, LLC; GARNISHEE #1)

CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AGAINST SALARY OR WAGES; (CFL PIZZA, LLC; GARNISHEE #1)

05/22/2018: CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AGAINST SALARY OR WAGES; (CFL PIZZA, LLC; GARNISHEE #1)

NOTICE

01/17/2018: NOTICE

FINAL JUDGMENT (CLOSES)

10/11/2017: FINAL JUDGMENT (CLOSES)

BLANK FACT INFORMATION SHEET

10/11/2017: BLANK FACT INFORMATION SHEET

AFFIDAVIT IN PROOF OF CLAIM

09/28/2017: AFFIDAVIT IN PROOF OF CLAIM

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

09/28/2017: MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

DEFAULT ENTERED 8/28/2017/CMW AS TO:; KAMERON SABAGHAMIRKHIZI

08/28/2017: DEFAULT ENTERED 8/28/2017/CMW AS TO:; KAMERON SABAGHAMIRKHIZI

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

08/28/2017: MOTION FOR DEFAULT

SHERIFF'S RETURN ON 20-DAY SUMMONS - SUB.SERVED 7/24/2017; KAMERON SABAGHAMIRKHIZI

07/24/2017: SHERIFF'S RETURN ON 20-DAY SUMMONS - SUB.SERVED 7/24/2017; KAMERON SABAGHAMIRKHIZI

CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

07/13/2017: CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ON CFL PIZZA, LLC (99CLOSE); (CFL PIZZA, LLC; GARNISHEE #1)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DispositionCONTRACT AND INDEBTEDNESS $5,000.01 TO $15,000.00; Status: 99 CLOSED; Status Date: 07/23/2018; Disposition: 99CLOSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • Docket99 CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT IN GARNISHMENT FOR SALARY OR WAGES; (CFL PIZZA, LLC; GARNISHEE #1)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT IN GARNISHMENT FOR WAGES (REOPEN); (CFL PIZZA, LLC; GARNISHEE #1)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT IN PROOF OF CLAIM; (CFL PIZZA, LLC; GARNISHEE #1)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • DocketCase Reopened this date

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF GARNISHMENT; (CFL PIZZA, LLC; GARNISHEE #1)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; (CFL PIZZA, LLC; GARNISHEE #1); (APPEARS TO BE A DUPLICATE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PRODUCE; (CFL PIZZA, LLC; GARNISHEE #1); (APPEARS TO BE A DUPLICATE)

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 08/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN ON 20-DAY SUMMONS - SUB.SERVED 7/24/2017; KAMERON SABAGHAMIRKHIZI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN ON 20-DAY SUMMONS - SUB.SERVED 7/24/2017; KAMERON SABAGHAMIRKHIZI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $395.00; Total Fee Paid: $395.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • FinancialReceipt # 404631; Paid: $310.00; Applied: $310.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket20-DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO: KAMERON SABAGHAMIRKHIZI; Receipt: 404631 Date: 07/13/2017; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHIDAY & RICKE, P.A.'S DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR CONTRACT & INDEBTEDNESS ; Receipt: 404631 Date: 07/13/2017; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAMPUS USA CREDIT UNION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BECKER, JEFFREY RANDOLPH

Latest cases represented by Lawyer REISS JENNIFER L