Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 04/14/2021 at 16:07:23 (UTC).

CAMPUS USA CREDIT UNION -vs- MAGBRE LLC et al

Case Summary

On 03/17/2021 CAMPUS USA CREDIT UNION filed an Other lawsuit against MAGBRE LLC. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0968

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAMPUS USA CREDIT UNION

Defendants

KEARNEY, KEVIN WILLIAM

Gainesville, FL 32606

KEARNEY, MARIA VIRGINIA

Gainesville, FL 32606

MAGBRE LLC

Co Kevin Kearney Ra, 1148 Nw 120Th Way

Gainesville, FL 32606

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REISS ESQ., JENNIFER L.

Po Box 550858

Jacksonville, FL 32255

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF SUBSTITUTE PROCESS SERVED ON 4/7/21; KEVIN WILLIAM KEARNEY (DEFENDANT);

04/09/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF SUBSTITUTE PROCESS SERVED ON 4/7/21; KEVIN WILLIAM KEARNEY (DEFENDANT);

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF SUBSTITUTE PROCESS SERVED ON 4/7/21; MAGBRE LLC (DEFENDANT);

04/09/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF SUBSTITUTE PROCESS SERVED ON 4/7/21; MAGBRE LLC (DEFENDANT);

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE- 4/07/2021; MARIA VIRGINIA KEARNEY (DEFENDANT);

04/09/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE- 4/07/2021; MARIA VIRGINIA KEARNEY (DEFENDANT);

ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

04/06/2021: ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED ON 3/19/2021; KEVIN WILLIAM KEARNEY (DEFENDANT); Receipt: 467515 Date: 03/19/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

03/17/2021: 20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED ON 3/19/2021; KEVIN WILLIAM KEARNEY (DEFENDANT); Receipt: 467515 Date: 03/19/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED ON 3/19/2021; MAGBRE LLC (DEFENDANT); Receipt: 467515 Date: 03/19/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

03/17/2021: 20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED ON 3/19/2021; MAGBRE LLC (DEFENDANT); Receipt: 467515 Date: 03/19/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED ON 3/19/2021; MARIA VIRGINIA KEARNEY (DEFENDANT); Receipt: 467515 Date: 03/19/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

03/17/2021: 20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED ON 3/19/2021; MARIA VIRGINIA KEARNEY (DEFENDANT); Receipt: 467515 Date: 03/19/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

03/17/2021: MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

E-MAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

03/17/2021: E-MAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

03/17/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

COMPLAINT FOR MONEY DAMAGES UP TO $15,000 Receipt: 467515 Date: 03/19/2021; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

03/17/2021: COMPLAINT FOR MONEY DAMAGES UP TO $15,000 Receipt: 467515 Date: 03/19/2021; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF SUBSTITUTE PROCESS SERVED ON 4/7/21; KEVIN WILLIAM KEARNEY (DEFENDANT);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF SUBSTITUTE PROCESS SERVED ON 4/7/21; MAGBRE LLC (DEFENDANT);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE- 4/07/2021; MARIA VIRGINIA KEARNEY (DEFENDANT);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • FinancialReceipt # 467515; Paid: $330.00; Applied: $330.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $330.00; Total Fee Paid: $330.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED ON 3/19/2021; KEVIN WILLIAM KEARNEY (DEFENDANT); Receipt: 467515 Date: 03/19/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED ON 3/19/2021; MAGBRE LLC (DEFENDANT); Receipt: 467515 Date: 03/19/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED ON 3/19/2021; MARIA VIRGINIA KEARNEY (DEFENDANT); Receipt: 467515 Date: 03/19/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-MAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR MONEY DAMAGES UP TO $15,000 Receipt: 467515 Date: 03/19/2021; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAMPUS USA CREDIT UNION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer REISS JENNIFER L