This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 01/26/2023 at 13:21:13 (UTC).

CAMPUS USA CREDIT UNION -VS- HOWARD, RUSSELL SEAN

Case Summary

On 12/14/2022 CAMPUS USA CREDIT UNION filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HOWARD, RUSSELL SEAN. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RAWLS, MESHON T. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************4616

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RAWLS, MESHON T

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAMPUS USA CREDIT UNION

Defendant

HOWARD, RUSSELL SEAN

Gainesville, FL 32606

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REISS ESQ., JENNIFER L.

Po Box 550858

Jacksonville, FL 32255

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

12/13/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER PER A.O. 3.09

12/13/2022: STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER PER A.O. 3.09

MOTION APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

12/13/2022: MOTION APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

(ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL; Receipt: 494572 Date: 12/14/2022; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

12/13/2022: (ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL; Receipt: 494572 Date: 12/14/2022; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

HIDAY & RICKE, P.A.'S DESIGNATION ; OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS

12/13/2022: HIDAY & RICKE, P.A.'S DESIGNATION ; OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS

ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

12/28/2022: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

STATEMENT OF CLAIM; Receipt: 494572 Date: 12/14/2022; Amount: $175.00; Amount Due: $0.00

12/13/2022: STATEMENT OF CLAIM; Receipt: 494572 Date: 12/14/2022; Amount: $175.00; Amount Due: $0.00

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2023
  • HearingSMALL CLAIMS PRETRIALS - NO IMAGE; Judge: RAWLS, MESHON T

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $185.00; Total Fee Paid: $185.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • FinancialReceipt #: 494572; Paid: 494572; Applied: $185.00; Refunded: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET - (NO IMAGE AVAILABLE); Event: SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIALS - NO IMAGE ; Date: 02/10/2023 Time: 9:30 am ; Judge: RAWLS - DIV IV, MESHON T Location: COURTROOM 2-B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHIDAY & RICKE, P.A.'S DESIGNATION ; OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL; Receipt: 494572 Date: 12/14/2022; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER PER A.O. 3.09

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Receipt: 494572 Date: 12/14/2022; Amount: $175.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less