This case was last updated from Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County on 10/07/2021 at 16:11:53 (UTC).

CAMPUS USA CREDIT UNION -VS- CHESSER, DAVID EARL

Case Summary

On 09/09/2021 CAMPUS USA CREDIT UNION filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CHESSER, DAVID EARL. This case was filed in Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is VAN VORST, KRISTINE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3144

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

VAN VORST, KRISTINE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAMPUS USA CREDIT UNION

Defendant

CHESSER, DAVID EARL

Citra, FL 32113

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REISS ESQ, JENNIFER L

Attorney at HIDAY & RICKE, PA

Hiday & Ricke, Pa, Po Box 550858

Jacksonville, FL 32255

 

Court Documents

ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

09/22/2021: ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

(ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL -WITH FEE Receipt: 474841 Date: 09/10/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

09/09/2021: (ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL -WITH FEE Receipt: 474841 Date: 09/10/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

09/09/2021: MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

E-MAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

09/09/2021: E-MAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER PER A.O. 3.09

09/09/2021: STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER PER A.O. 3.09

CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

09/09/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

STATEMENT OF CLAIM - ($2500.01 - $8000) Receipt: 474841 Date: 09/10/2021; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

09/09/2021: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - ($2500.01 - $8000) Receipt: 474841 Date: 09/10/2021; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2021
  • HearingSMALL CLAIMS PRETRIALS - NO IMAGE; Judge: VAN VORST, KRISTINE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • FinancialReceipt # 474841; Paid: $310.00; Applied: $310.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET - (NO IMAGE AVAILABLE); Event: SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIALS - NO IMAGE ; Date: 11/12/2021 Time: 9:30 am ; Judge: VAN VORST - DIV V, KRISTINE Location: COURTROOM 2-B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $310.00; Total Fee Paid: $310.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL -WITH FEE Receipt: 474841 Date: 09/10/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-MAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER PER A.O. 3.09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - ($2500.01 - $8000) Receipt: 474841 Date: 09/10/2021; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAMPUS USA CREDIT UNION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer REISS JENNIFER L