This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 01/29/2023 at 15:21:14 (UTC).

CAMPUS CREST GAINESVILLE LLC -vs- NADAL, JORGE

Case Summary

On 01/13/2023 CAMPUS CREST GAINESVILLE LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against NADAL, JORGE. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0155

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CAMPUS CREST GAINESVILLE LLC

VARSITY HOUSE GAINESVILLE

Defendant

NADAL, JORGE

Gainesville, FL 32607

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CRUIKSHANK ESQ, ELIZABETH

6065 Roswell Rd Ste 680

Atlanta, GA 30328

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION ; Receipt: 495823 Date: 01/13/2023; Amount: $185.00; Amount Due: $0.00

01/12/2023: COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION ; Receipt: 495823 Date: 01/13/2023; Amount: $185.00; Amount Due: $0.00

CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

01/12/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

SUMMONS SUMMONS (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE: IN THE BODY OF THE SUMMONS THE PLAINTIFF'S NAME LISTS "CAMPUS CREST GAINESVILLE,LLC D/B/A JORGE NADAL"); RESUBMIT AS A "CORRECTED SUMMONS" AS THE $10 FEE HAS ALREADY BEEN PAID); ; ; Receipt: 495823 Date: 01/13/

01/12/2023: SUMMONS SUMMONS (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE: IN THE BODY OF THE SUMMONS THE PLAINTIFF'S NAME LISTS "CAMPUS CREST GAINESVILLE,LLC D/B/A JORGE NADAL"); RESUBMIT AS A "CORRECTED SUMMONS" AS THE $10 FEE HAS ALREADY BEEN PAID); ; ; Receipt: 495823 Date: 01/13/

SUMMONS (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE: IN THE BODY OF THE SUMMONS THE PLAINTIFF'S NAME LISTS "CAMPUS CREST GAINESVILLE,LLC D/B/A JORGE NADAL"); RESUBMIT AS A "CORRECTED SUMMONS" AS THE $10 FEE HAS ALREADY BEEN PAID/ MJP

01/17/2023: SUMMONS (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE: IN THE BODY OF THE SUMMONS THE PLAINTIFF'S NAME LISTS "CAMPUS CREST GAINESVILLE,LLC D/B/A JORGE NADAL"); RESUBMIT AS A "CORRECTED SUMMONS" AS THE $10 FEE HAS ALREADY BEEN PAID/ MJP

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

01/17/2023: MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

5 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED TO JORGE NADAL

01/25/2023: 5 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED TO JORGE NADAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket5 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED TO JORGE NADAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE: IN THE BODY OF THE SUMMONS THE PLAINTIFF'S NAME LISTS "CAMPUS CREST GAINESVILLE,LLC D/B/A JORGE NADAL"); RESUBMIT AS A "CORRECTED SUMMONS" AS THE $10 FEE HAS ALREADY BEEN PAID/ MJP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $195.00; Total Fee Paid: $195.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • FinancialReceipt #: 495823; Paid: 495823; Applied: $195.00; Refunded: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SUMMONS (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE: IN THE BODY OF THE SUMMONS THE PLAINTIFF'S NAME LISTS "CAMPUS CREST GAINESVILLE,LLC D/B/A JORGE NADAL"); RESUBMIT AS A "CORRECTED SUMMONS" AS THE $10 FEE HAS ALREADY BEEN PAID); ; ; Receipt: 495823 Date: 01/13/2023; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR EVICTION ; Receipt: 495823 Date: 01/13/2023; Amount: $185.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less