This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 03/16/2023 at 05:19:09 (UTC).

CAIN, WALLACE R - VS - UNKNOWN HEIRS DEVISEES GRANTEES ASSIGNEES LIENORS et al

Case Summary

On 10/31/2022 CAIN, WALLACE R - filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against - UNKNOWN HEIRS DEVISEES GRANTEES ASSIGNEES LIENORS. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FLOYD, KATHERINE L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3453

  • Filing Date:

    10/31/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FLOYD, KATHERINE L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAIN, WALLACE R

Defendants

UNKNOWN HEIRS DEVISEES GRANTEES ASSIGNEES LIENORS

GRAHAM, LOUIS

Cordova, TN 38018

NUSBAUM, BETSY

Chillicothe, OH 45601

GRAHAM, KARL

Columbus, IN 47201

GRAHAM, C PHILLIP DECEASED THE KNOWN HEIRS OF

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STEVENS, RONALD W

P.O. Box 1444

Bronson, FL 32621

Defendant Attorney

LANDER ESQ, LINDSEY

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

Attorney At Law, 330 Sw 1St Ave

Trenton, FL 32693

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY COVER LETTER

03/07/2023: PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY COVER LETTER

ORIGIANAL ASSIGNMENT OF MORTGAGE; ORIGINAL MORTGAGE NOTE; ORIGINAL MORTGAGE DEED; MORTGAGE NOTE AND ORIGINAL MORTGAGE MODIFICATION ON MORTGAGE - PAPER-INK VERSION

03/07/2023: ORIGIANAL ASSIGNMENT OF MORTGAGE; ORIGINAL MORTGAGE NOTE; ORIGINAL MORTGAGE DEED; MORTGAGE NOTE AND ORIGINAL MORTGAGE MODIFICATION ON MORTGAGE - PAPER-INK VERSION

ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE, ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, AND HEARING ON PENDING MOTIONS

01/18/2023: ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE, ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, AND HEARING ON PENDING MOTIONS

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

01/09/2023: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

AFFIDAVIT OF ACTUAL ATTORNEYS FEES

01/09/2023: AFFIDAVIT OF ACTUAL ATTORNEYS FEES

ATTORNEYS AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS

01/09/2023: ATTORNEYS AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS

AFFIDAVIT OF DISINTERESTED ATTORNEY AS TO FEES

01/09/2023: AFFIDAVIT OF DISINTERESTED ATTORNEY AS TO FEES

AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

01/09/2023: AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

PROOF OF PUBLICATION - NOTICE OF ACTION

01/03/2023: PROOF OF PUBLICATION - NOTICE OF ACTION

ANSWER OF ATTORNEY AD LITEM

12/22/2022: ANSWER OF ATTORNEY AD LITEM

ORDER APPOINTING ATTORNEY AD LITEM

12/20/2022: ORDER APPOINTING ATTORNEY AD LITEM

DEFAULT ISSUED BY CLERK AS TO LOUIS GRAHAM 12/14/22 KCA

12/13/2022: DEFAULT ISSUED BY CLERK AS TO LOUIS GRAHAM 12/14/22 KCA

MOTION FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT

12/13/2022: MOTION FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT

SHERIFF'S RETURN ON SUMMONS - SERVED ON 11/22/22 AS TO LOUIS GRAHAM (DEFENDANT);

12/13/2022: SHERIFF'S RETURN ON SUMMONS - SERVED ON 11/22/22 AS TO LOUIS GRAHAM (DEFENDANT);

NOTICE OF ACTION - ISSUED 12162022 MT (NO MAILINGS REQUIRED AS NO ADDRESSES PROVIDED)

12/07/2022: NOTICE OF ACTION - ISSUED 12162022 MT (NO MAILINGS REQUIRED AS NO ADDRESSES PROVIDED)

MOTION TO APPOINTMENT OF ATTORNEY AD LITEM

12/07/2022: MOTION TO APPOINTMENT OF ATTORNEY AD LITEM

AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY

12/07/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2023
  • HearingFORECLOSURE HEARING GM; Judge: FLOYD, KATHERINE L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY COVER LETTER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGIANAL ASSIGNMENT OF MORTGAGE; ORIGINAL MORTGAGE NOTE; ORIGINAL MORTGAGE DEED; MORTGAGE NOTE AND ORIGINAL MORTGAGE MODIFICATION ON MORTGAGE - PAPER-INK VERSION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET - (NO IMAGE AVAILABLE); Event: FORECLOSURE HEARING GM ; Date: 03/24/2023 Time: 9:00 am ; Judge: FLOYD, KATHERINE L Location: COURTROOM 3-C

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE, ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, AND HEARING ON PENDING MOTIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF ACTUAL ATTORNEYS FEES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketATTORNEYS AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF DISINTERESTED ATTORNEY AS TO FEES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATION OF POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL MORTGAGE AND NOTE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES FOR SERVICE OF DOCUMENTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketJUDICIAL SALE FEE Receipt: 492830 Date: 11/02/2022; Amount: $70.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE; BETSY NUSBAUM (DEFENDANT); Receipt: 492830 Date: 11/02/2022; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE; LOUIS GRAHAM (DEFENDANT); Receipt: 492830 Date: 11/02/2022; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE; KARL GRAHAM (DEFENDANT); Receipt: 492830 Date: 11/02/2022; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER PER A.O. 3.09

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT TO FORECLOSURE A MORTGAGE AND NOTE (>$50,000.01 < $250.000.) Receipt: 492830 Date: 11/02/2022; Amount: $905.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less