This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 03/16/2022 at 15:09:09 (UTC).

CADLES OF WEST VIRGINIA LLC - VS - ROBERTS, ALBERT E et al

Case Summary

On 03/01/2022 CADLES OF WEST VIRGINIA LLC - filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against - ROBERTS, ALBERT E. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0614

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CADLES OF WEST VIRGINIA LLC

CADLES OF GRASSY MEADOWS II LLC

AMERICAN HOMEOWNER PRESERVATION TRUST

KONDAUR CAPITAL CORPORATION AS SEPARATE TRUSTEE OF

CITIMORTGAGE INC

CITIFINANCIAL MORTGAGE COMPANY FL LLC

Defendants

ROBERT, SHERRY ANN

ROBERTS, ALBERT E

ROBERTS, SHERRY A

CITY OF GAINESVILLE

DOE JOHN

DOE JANE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHERWIN ESQ, RACHEL E

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO APPOINT ELISORS

03/10/2022: PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO APPOINT ELISORS

SUMMONS- UNISSUED; (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE AS INDEXING FEE IS STILL DUE)

03/10/2022: SUMMONS- UNISSUED; (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE AS INDEXING FEE IS STILL DUE)

SUMMONS - UNISSUED; (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE AS INDEXING FEE IS STILL DUE)

03/10/2022: SUMMONS - UNISSUED; (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE AS INDEXING FEE IS STILL DUE)

SUMMONS - UNISSUED; (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE AS INDEXING FEE IS STILL DUE)

03/10/2022: SUMMONS - UNISSUED; (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE AS INDEXING FEE IS STILL DUE)

SUMMONS UNISSUED - WITH FEE (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE:a summons to an unknown person as a John Doe complaint does not commence an action against the real party per Grantham v. Blount, 683 So. 2d 538 (2d DCA 1996); JANE DOE Receipt: 482045 Date: 03/03/20

02/28/2022: SUMMONS UNISSUED - WITH FEE (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE:a summons to an unknown person as a John Doe complaint does not commence an action against the real party per Grantham v. Blount, 683 So. 2d 538 (2d DCA 1996); JANE DOE Receipt: 482045 Date: 03/03/20

SUMMONS UNISSUED - WITH FEE (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE: a summons to an unknown person as a John Doe complaint does not commence an action against the real party per Grantham v. Blount, 683 So. 2d 538 (2d DCA 1996); JOHN DOE Receipt: 482045 Date: 03/03/2

02/28/2022: SUMMONS UNISSUED - WITH FEE (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE: a summons to an unknown person as a John Doe complaint does not commence an action against the real party per Grantham v. Blount, 683 So. 2d 538 (2d DCA 1996); JOHN DOE Receipt: 482045 Date: 03/03/2

SUMMONS UNISSUED - WITH FEE (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE: INDEXING FEE OWED; CITY OF GAINESVILLE Receipt: 482045 Date: 03/03/2022; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

02/28/2022: SUMMONS UNISSUED - WITH FEE (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE: INDEXING FEE OWED; CITY OF GAINESVILLE Receipt: 482045 Date: 03/03/2022; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

SUMMONS UNISSUED - WITH FEE (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE: SUMMONS DOES NOT COMPLY WITH FORM 1.902(B), FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL ; PROCEDURE, (INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS); ALSO INDEXING FEE OWED ; ALBERT E ROBERTS Receipt: 482045 Date: 03/03/2022; Amount: $10.00; Amou

02/28/2022: SUMMONS UNISSUED - WITH FEE (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE: SUMMONS DOES NOT COMPLY WITH FORM 1.902(B), FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL ; PROCEDURE, (INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS); ALSO INDEXING FEE OWED ; ALBERT E ROBERTS Receipt: 482045 Date: 03/03/2022; Amount: $10.00; Amou

SUMMONS UNISSUED - WITH FEE (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE: SUMMONS DOES NOT COMPLY WITH FORM 1.902(B), FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL ; PROCEDURE, (INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS); ALSO INDEXING FEE OWED ; SHERRY ANN ROBERTS AKA SHERRY A ROBERTS Receipt: 482045 Date: 03/03/202

02/28/2022: SUMMONS UNISSUED - WITH FEE (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE: SUMMONS DOES NOT COMPLY WITH FORM 1.902(B), FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL ; PROCEDURE, (INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS); ALSO INDEXING FEE OWED ; SHERRY ANN ROBERTS AKA SHERRY A ROBERTS Receipt: 482045 Date: 03/03/202

COMPLAINT FOR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE (>$50,000.01 < $250.000.) Receipt: 482045 Date: 03/03/2022; Amount: $905.00; Amount Due: $0.00

02/28/2022: COMPLAINT FOR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE (>$50,000.01 < $250.000.) Receipt: 482045 Date: 03/03/2022; Amount: $905.00; Amount Due: $0.00

VALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

02/28/2022: VALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

02/28/2022: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

CERTIFICATION OF COMPLIANCE WITH SECTION 702.015, FLORIDA STATUTES (2021)

02/28/2022: CERTIFICATION OF COMPLIANCE WITH SECTION 702.015, FLORIDA STATUTES (2021)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2022
  • FinancialReceipt #: 482397; Paid: 482397; Applied: $2.00; Refunded: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS MOTION TO APPOINT ELISORS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS- UNISSUED; (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE AS INDEXING FEE IS STILL DUE)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS - UNISSUED; (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE AS INDEXING FEE IS STILL DUE)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS - UNISSUED; (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE AS INDEXING FEE IS STILL DUE)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • FinancialReceipt #: 482045; Paid: 482045; Applied: $1,034.00; Refunded: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $1,041.00; Total Fee Paid: $1,036.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS UNISSUED - WITH FEE (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE:a summons to an unknown person as a John Doe complaint does not commence an action against the real party per Grantham v. Blount, 683 So. 2d 538 (2d DCA 1996); JANE DOE Receipt: 482045 Date: 03/03/2022; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS UNISSUED - WITH FEE (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE: a summons to an unknown person as a John Doe complaint does not commence an action against the real party per Grantham v. Blount, 683 So. 2d 538 (2d DCA 1996); JOHN DOE Receipt: 482045 Date: 03/03/2022; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS UNISSUED - WITH FEE (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE: INDEXING FEE OWED; CITY OF GAINESVILLE Receipt: 482045 Date: 03/03/2022; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketINDEX FEE FOR LIS PENDENS OVER 4 PARTIES Receipt: 482397 Date: 03/11/2022; Amount: $7.00; Amount Due: $5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketRECORDING FEE FOR ADDITIONAL PAGES OF LIS PENDENS Receipt: 482045 Date: 03/03/2022; Amount: $4.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketRECORDING FEE - FIRST PAGE OF LIS PENDENS Receipt: 482045 Date: 03/03/2022; Amount: $5.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketJUDICIAL SALE FEE Receipt: 482045 Date: 03/03/2022; Amount: $70.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATION OF COMPLIANCE WITH SECTION 702.015, FLORIDA STATUTES (2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER PER A.O. 3.09

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE (>$50,000.01 < $250.000.) Receipt: 482045 Date: 03/03/2022; Amount: $905.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less