This case was last updated from Alachua County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court on 02/13/2020 at 22:25:44 (UTC).

BW AVIARA LLC -vs- GILLIARD, NATALIE et al

Case Summary

On 12/31/2018 BW AVIARA LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against GILLIARD, NATALIE. This case was filed in Alachua County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************4881

  • Filing Date:

    12/31/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BW AVIARA LLC

AVIARA APARTMENTS

Defendants

GILLIARD, NATALIE

Gainesville, FL 32601

GILLIARD, RENICK

Gainesville, FL 32601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WEISSE ESQ, DAVID

Po Box 62884

Fort Myers, FL 33906

 

Court Documents

MAIL RETURNED; NATALIE GILLIARD

07/23/2019: MAIL RETURNED; NATALIE GILLIARD

MAIL RETURNED; RENICK GILLIARD

07/23/2019: MAIL RETURNED; RENICK GILLIARD

MAIL RETURNED; NATALIE GILLIARD

05/01/2019: MAIL RETURNED; NATALIE GILLIARD

MAIL RETURNED; RENICK GILLIARD

05/01/2019: MAIL RETURNED; RENICK GILLIARD

SHERIFF'S RETURN ON WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED EXECUTED

01/28/2019: SHERIFF'S RETURN ON WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED EXECUTED

WRIT OF POSSESSION - ISSUED 1/18/2019 / CMW

01/17/2019: WRIT OF POSSESSION - ISSUED 1/18/2019 / CMW

FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION (CLOSES)

01/15/2019: FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION (CLOSES)

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION; (NONPAYMENT)

01/14/2019: MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION; (NONPAYMENT)

MOTION FOR DEFAULT (EVICTION) & DEFAULT ENTERED 1/14/2019 AS TO:; NATALIE GILLIARD & RENICK GILLIARD / CMW

01/14/2019: MOTION FOR DEFAULT (EVICTION) & DEFAULT ENTERED 1/14/2019 AS TO:; NATALIE GILLIARD & RENICK GILLIARD / CMW

VERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE

01/14/2019: VERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE

SHERIFF'S RETURN ON 5/20 SUMMONS - POSTED 1/4/2019; RENICK GILLIARD

01/04/2019: SHERIFF'S RETURN ON 5/20 SUMMONS - POSTED 1/4/2019; RENICK GILLIARD

SHERIFF'S RETURN ON 5/20 SUMMONS - POSTED 1/4/2019; NATALIE GILLIARD

01/04/2019: SHERIFF'S RETURN ON 5/20 SUMMONS - POSTED 1/4/2019; NATALIE GILLIARD

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; (SUMMONS & COMPLAINT); AS TO RENICK GILLIARD

01/04/2019: CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; (SUMMONS & COMPLAINT); AS TO RENICK GILLIARD

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; (SUMMONS & COMPLAINT); AS TO NATALIE GILLIARD

01/04/2019: CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; (SUMMONS & COMPLAINT); AS TO NATALIE GILLIARD

COVER LETTER

01/03/2019: COVER LETTER

5/20 SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO: NATALIE GILLIARD; Receipt: 430839 Date: 12/31/2018; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

12/31/2018: 5/20 SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO: NATALIE GILLIARD; Receipt: 430839 Date: 12/31/2018; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

5/20 SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO: RENICK GILLIARD; Receipt: 430839 Date: 12/31/2018; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

12/31/2018: 5/20 SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO: RENICK GILLIARD; Receipt: 430839 Date: 12/31/2018; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

12/31/2018: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMAIL RETURNED; NATALIE GILLIARD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMAIL RETURNED; RENICK GILLIARD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMAIL RETURNED; NATALIE GILLIARD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMAIL RETURNED; RENICK GILLIARD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN ON WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED EXECUTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION - ISSUED 1/18/2019 / CMW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • DispositionEVICTION DELINQUENT TENANT; Status: CLOSED; Status Date: 12/31/2018; Disposition: DE03 - DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION (CLOSES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION; (NONPAYMENT)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; (SUMMONS & COMPLAINT); AS TO RENICK GILLIARD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; (SUMMONS & COMPLAINT); AS TO NATALIE GILLIARD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER LETTER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $205.00; Total Fee Paid: $205.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • FinancialReceipt # 430839; Paid: $205.00; Applied: $205.00; Refunded: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket5/20 SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO: NATALIE GILLIARD; Receipt: 430839 Date: 12/31/2018; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket5/20 SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO: RENICK GILLIARD; Receipt: 430839 Date: 12/31/2018; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ; (FOR TENANT EVICTION); Receipt: 430839 Date: 12/31/2018; Amount: $185.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BW AVIARA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAVID WEISSE