Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 04/15/2021 at 16:08:32 (UTC).

BUTLER, JOANNE -VS- KONISH, JAMES

Case Summary

On 03/17/2021 BUTLER, JOANNE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against KONISH, JAMES. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RAWLS, MESHON T. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0958

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RAWLS, MESHON T

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BUTLER, JOANNE

Gainesville, FL 32627

Defendant

KONISH, JAMES

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

PRETRIAL SET FOR - SUMMONS ISSUED; Event: SMALL CLAIM PRETRIALS ; Date: 05/21/2021 Time: 9:00 am ; Judge: RAWLS - DIV IV, MESHON T Location: COURTROOM 2-B

04/12/2021: PRETRIAL SET FOR - SUMMONS ISSUED; Event: SMALL CLAIM PRETRIALS ; Date: 05/21/2021 Time: 9:00 am ; Judge: RAWLS - DIV IV, MESHON T Location: COURTROOM 2-B

COPY OF CLERK'S LETTER TO PLAINTIFF

04/08/2021: COPY OF CLERK'S LETTER TO PLAINTIFF

AMENDED STATEMENT OF CLAIM; (AS TO DEFENDANT'S NAME)

04/08/2021: AMENDED STATEMENT OF CLAIM; (AS TO DEFENDANT'S NAME)

LETTER UNABLE TO SCHEDULE PRETRIAL - DEF'S NAME IN BODY & STYLE MUST MATCH PL. TO FILE AMENDED CLAIM; ; LTR-DEF'S NAME IN BODY/STYLE DOES NOT MATCH; Sent on: 03/23/2021 15:24:54.39

03/23/2021: LETTER UNABLE TO SCHEDULE PRETRIAL - DEF'S NAME IN BODY & STYLE MUST MATCH PL. TO FILE AMENDED CLAIM; ; LTR-DEF'S NAME IN BODY/STYLE DOES NOT MATCH; Sent on: 03/23/2021 15:24:54.39

STATEMENT OF CLAIM - ($2500.01 - $8000) Receipt: 467462 Date: 03/17/2021; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

03/17/2021: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - ($2500.01 - $8000) Receipt: 467462 Date: 03/17/2021; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2021
  • HearingSMALL CLAIM PRETRIALS; Judge: RAWLS, MESHON T

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SET FOR - SUMMONS ISSUED; Event: SMALL CLAIM PRETRIALS ; Date: 05/21/2021 Time: 9:00 am ; Judge: RAWLS - DIV IV, MESHON T Location: COURTROOM 2-B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOPY OF CLERK'S LETTER TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED STATEMENT OF CLAIM; (AS TO DEFENDANT'S NAME)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER UNABLE TO SCHEDULE PRETRIAL - DEF'S NAME IN BODY & STYLE MUST MATCH PL. TO FILE AMENDED CLAIM; ; LTR-DEF'S NAME IN BODY/STYLE DOES NOT MATCH; Sent on: 03/23/2021 15:24:54.39

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $310.75; Total Fee Paid: $310.75; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • FinancialReceipt # 467462; Paid: $310.75; Applied: $310.75; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketCOPIES FEE -(CASE RECEIPTING) NON COURT DOCUMENT Receipt: 467462 Date: 03/17/2021; Amount: $0.75; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS FEE (34.041(1)(d) COUNTY CIVIL) Receipt: 467462 Date: 03/17/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - ($2500.01 - $8000) Receipt: 467462 Date: 03/17/2021; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less