This case was last updated from Alachua County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court on 02/08/2020 at 15:28:06 (UTC).

BROOKSIDE PARTNERS LTD -vs- SHOWERS, CHANETTA et al

Case Summary

On 03/05/2018 BROOKSIDE PARTNERS LTD filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against SHOWERS, CHANETTA. This case was filed in Alachua County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0753

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BROOKSIDE PARTNERS LTD

BROOKSIDE APARTMENTS

Defendants

SHOWERS, CHANETTA

Newberry, FL 32669

LANE, CHANTERIA

Newberry, FL 32669

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WOLK ESQ, BRIAN P

P.O. Box 2514

Ft Myers Beach, FL 33932

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT (FOR TENANT EVICTION); Receipt: 415563 Date: 03/06/2018; Amount: $185.00; Amount Due: $0.00

03/05/2018: COMPLAINT (FOR TENANT EVICTION); Receipt: 415563 Date: 03/06/2018; Amount: $185.00; Amount Due: $0.00

CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

03/05/2018: CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

03/05/2018: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

5/20 SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO: CHANETTA SHOWERS; Receipt: 415563 Date: 03/06/2018; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

03/05/2018: 5/20 SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO: CHANETTA SHOWERS; Receipt: 415563 Date: 03/06/2018; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

5/20 SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO: CHANTERIA LANE; Receipt: 415563 Date: 03/06/2018; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

03/05/2018: 5/20 SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO: CHANTERIA LANE; Receipt: 415563 Date: 03/06/2018; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

COVER LETTER

03/07/2018: COVER LETTER

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; (SUMMONSES & COMPLAINT TO BOTH DEFENDANTS)

03/07/2018: CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; (SUMMONSES & COMPLAINT TO BOTH DEFENDANTS)

SHERIFF'S RETURN ON 5/20 SUMMONS - POSTED 3/9/2018; CHANETTA SHOWERS

03/13/2018: SHERIFF'S RETURN ON 5/20 SUMMONS - POSTED 3/9/2018; CHANETTA SHOWERS

SHERIFF'S RETURN ON 5/20 SUMMONS - POSTED 3/9/2018; CHANTERIA LANE

03/13/2018: SHERIFF'S RETURN ON 5/20 SUMMONS - POSTED 3/9/2018; CHANTERIA LANE

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION (NONPAYMENT)

03/19/2018: MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION (NONPAYMENT)

MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND (PROPOSED) DEFAULT ( 3/19/2018 CLERK ENTERED DEFAULT AS TO EVCITION AGAINST CHANETTA SHOWERS (DEFENDANT); CHANTERIA LANE (DEFENDANT); / SCS

03/19/2018: MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND (PROPOSED) DEFAULT ( 3/19/2018 CLERK ENTERED DEFAULT AS TO EVCITION AGAINST CHANETTA SHOWERS (DEFENDANT); CHANTERIA LANE (DEFENDANT); / SCS

VERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE

03/19/2018: VERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE

FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION (CLOSES)

03/22/2018: FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION (CLOSES)

WRIT OF POSSESSION -ISSUED 3/23/2018

03/23/2018: WRIT OF POSSESSION -ISSUED 3/23/2018

SHERIFF'S RETURN ON WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED EXECUTED

03/30/2018: SHERIFF'S RETURN ON WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED EXECUTED

MAIL RETURNED; CHANTERIA LANE

05/22/2018: MAIL RETURNED; CHANTERIA LANE

MAIL RETURNED; CHANETTA SHOWERS

05/22/2018: MAIL RETURNED; CHANETTA SHOWERS

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMAIL RETURNED; CHANETTA SHOWERS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMAIL RETURNED; CHANTERIA LANE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN ON WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED EXECUTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION -ISSUED 3/23/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • DispositionEVICTION DELINQUENT TENANT; Status: CLOSED; Status Date: 03/05/2018; Disposition: DE03 - DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION (CLOSES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT AND (PROPOSED) DEFAULT ( 3/19/2018 CLERK ENTERED DEFAULT AS TO EVCITION AGAINST CHANETTA SHOWERS (DEFENDANT); CHANTERIA LANE (DEFENDANT); / SCS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION (NONPAYMENT)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN ON 5/20 SUMMONS - POSTED 3/9/2018; CHANETTA SHOWERS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; (SUMMONSES & COMPLAINT TO BOTH DEFENDANTS)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER LETTER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • FinancialReceipt # 415563; Paid: $205.00; Applied: $205.00; Refunded: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $205.00; Total Fee Paid: $205.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket5/20 SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO: CHANTERIA LANE; Receipt: 415563 Date: 03/06/2018; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket5/20 SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO: CHANETTA SHOWERS; Receipt: 415563 Date: 03/06/2018; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT (FOR TENANT EVICTION); Receipt: 415563 Date: 03/06/2018; Amount: $185.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BROOKSIDE APARTMENTS is a litigant

Latest cases where BROOKSIDE PARTNERS LTD is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brian P Wolk