Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County on 02/08/2020 at 01:16:12 (UTC).

BRAZIL, ANGERIE V -VS- BOUTWELL, SANDRA MARIE et al

Case Summary

On 12/15/2017 BRAZIL, ANGERIE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against -VS- BOUTWELL, SANDRA MARIE. This case was filed in Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************4160

  • Filing Date:

    12/15/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRAZIL, ANGERIE V

Defendants

NIEDERKORH, KATHRYN ALICIA

Newberry, FL 32669

BOUTWELL, SANDRA MARIE

Gainesville, FL 32607

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BAGEN ESQ, KYLE J

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

Attorney At Law, Po Box 5757

Gainesville, FL 32627

Defendant Attorney

MARTIN ESQUIRE, BRADLEY D

901 N Lake Destiny Rd Suite 220

Maitland, FL 32751

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - SERVED

08/02/2018: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - SERVED

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - SERVED

08/02/2018: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - SERVED

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - SERVED

08/02/2018: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - SERVED

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SERVED 6/18/18 AS TO NORTH FLORIDA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER RECORD CUSTODIAN

07/02/2018: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SERVED 6/18/18 AS TO NORTH FLORIDA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER RECORD CUSTODIAN

AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

05/25/2018: AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

05/25/2018: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

ORDER SCHEDULING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND JURY TRIAL

05/24/2018: ORDER SCHEDULING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND JURY TRIAL

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES PROPOUNDED BY PLAINTIFF

03/08/2018: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES PROPOUNDED BY PLAINTIFF

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF COMPLETION AND RETURN OF DEFENDANTS COLLISON AND AVOIDANCE INTERROGATORIES

02/22/2018: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF COMPLETION AND RETURN OF DEFENDANTS COLLISON AND AVOIDANCE INTERROGATORIES

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF COMPLETION AND RETURN OF DEFENDANTS MOTOR VEHICLE NEGLIGENCE INTERROGATORIES

02/22/2018: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF COMPLETION AND RETURN OF DEFENDANTS MOTOR VEHICLE NEGLIGENCE INTERROGATORIES

DEFENDANT'S RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

01/19/2018: DEFENDANT'S RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF COLLISION AVOIDANCE INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF, ANGERIE V BRAZIL

01/17/2018: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF COLLISION AVOIDANCE INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF, ANGERIE V BRAZIL

SHERIFF'S RETURN ON 20-DAY SUMMONS - SERVED; KATHRYN ALICIA NIEDERKORH (DEFENDANT);

12/28/2017: SHERIFF'S RETURN ON 20-DAY SUMMONS - SERVED; KATHRYN ALICIA NIEDERKORH (DEFENDANT);

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT, KATHRYN ALICIA NIEDERKORH

12/15/2017: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT, KATHRYN ALICIA NIEDERKORH

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

12/15/2017: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

12/15/2017: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

12/15/2017: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

COMPLAINT Receipt: 411639 Date: 12/15/2017; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $0.00

12/15/2017: COMPLAINT Receipt: 411639 Date: 12/15/2017; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $0.00

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2018
  • DispositionAUTO NEGLIGENCE; Status: CLOSED; Status Date: 12/15/2017; Disposition: OT01 - OTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (CLOSES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SERVED 6/18/18 AS TO NORTH FLORIDA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER RECORD CUSTODIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 12/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS (20 DAY) ISSUED - AS TO: SANDRA MARIE BOUTWELL (DEFENDANT);; WITH FEE Receipt: 411639 Date: 12/15/2017; ; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT, KATHRYN ALICIA NIEDERKORH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-MAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT, SANDRA MARIE BOUTWELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT Receipt: 411639 Date: 12/15/2017; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BAGEN ESQ, KYLE J